Tangent Board of Trade (Corporation# 9717) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is February 6, 1957.
Corporation ID | 9717 |
Corporation Name | Tangent Board of Trade |
Registered Office Address |
Box 44 101-3rd Avenue Tangent AB T0H 3J0 |
Incorporation Date | 1957-02-06 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 12 - 12 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Matt Stone | Box 23, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
ALEXIS LAURIN | -, BOX 102, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
TRAVIS HENRY | 7317-93 Street, Grande Prairie AB T8V 6E9, Canada |
Connie Geherman | Box 721, Spirit River AB T0H 3G0, Canada |
Angie LaFlamme-Deveau | Box 23, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
MACKANZIE LAURIN | 7021-93 Street, Grande-Prairie AB T8V 6E9, Canada |
ALAN COULSON | -, BOX 22, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
KATHERINE SIMONSON | RR #1, SPIRIT RIVER AB T0H 3G0, Canada |
MARTINE PIEBIAK | BOX 97, EAGLESHAM AB T0H 1H0, Canada |
DANIELLE LAURIN | 7317-93 Street, GRANDE PRAIRIE AB T8V 6E9, Canada |
LYNNE LAURIN | -, BOX 102, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
Michelle Tremblay | Box 41, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
GLORIA COULSON | -, B0X 22, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
ALEX LAURIN | -, BOX 102, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1957-02-06 | current |
Boards of Trade Act - Part II (BOTA - Part II) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie II (LCH - Partie II) |
Act | 1957-02-05 | 1957-02-06 |
Boards of Trade Act - Part II (BOTA - Part II) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie II (LCH - Partie II) |
Address | 2020-10-13 | current | Box 44, 101-3rd Avenue, Tangent, AB T0H 3J0 |
Address | 2019-05-15 | current | Box 44, Tangent, AB T0H 3J0 |
Address | 2019-05-15 | 2020-10-13 | Box 44, Tangent, AB T0H 3J0 |
Address | 1957-02-06 | 2019-05-15 | Box 44, Tangent, AB TOH 3J0 |
Name | 1957-02-06 | current | Tangent Board of Trade |
Status | 1957-02-06 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1957-02-06 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-02-21 | |
2019 | 2019-03-04 | |
2018 | 2018-02-17 | |
2017 | 2017-02-25 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Happy Hobbit Curios Inc. | 79136 Rge Rd 130, Box 131, Se12-079-13-w6m, Bay Tree, AB T0H 0A0 | 2016-07-31 |
Cagee Oilfield Ltd. | 906 5th Ave, Baeverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2020-03-16 |
11534122 Canada Inc. | #22 600-14th Street, Box 2023, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2019-07-24 |
9638903 Canada Corporation | Rr1 Site7 Box7, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2016-02-21 |
9554114 Canada Corporation | Rr1 Site7, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2015-12-17 |
8500231 Canada Ltd. | 724 Oak Drive, Box 1107, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2013-04-19 |
Dark Mass Productions Inc. | 1110 Stacy Drive, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2013-02-11 |
Heritage Farm Nursery Ltd. | 100042-twp Rd 722, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2011-06-02 |
7632193 Canada Inc. | 101 1001 6th Avenue, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2010-08-26 |
6602151 Canada Ltd. | Box 1812, Beaverlodge, AB T0H 0C0 | 2006-07-21 |
Find all corporations in postal code T0H |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Matt Stone | Box 23, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
ALEXIS LAURIN | -, BOX 102, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
TRAVIS HENRY | 7317-93 Street, Grande Prairie AB T8V 6E9, Canada |
Connie Geherman | Box 721, Spirit River AB T0H 3G0, Canada |
Angie LaFlamme-Deveau | Box 23, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
MACKANZIE LAURIN | 7021-93 Street, Grande-Prairie AB T8V 6E9, Canada |
ALAN COULSON | -, BOX 22, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
KATHERINE SIMONSON | RR #1, SPIRIT RIVER AB T0H 3G0, Canada |
MARTINE PIEBIAK | BOX 97, EAGLESHAM AB T0H 1H0, Canada |
DANIELLE LAURIN | 7317-93 Street, GRANDE PRAIRIE AB T8V 6E9, Canada |
LYNNE LAURIN | -, BOX 102, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
Michelle Tremblay | Box 41, Tangent AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
GLORIA COULSON | -, B0X 22, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
ALEX LAURIN | -, BOX 102, TANGENT AB T0H 3J0, Canada |
City | TANGENT |
Post Code | T0H 3J0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
The Toronto Region Board of Trade | 77 Adelaide Street West, Toronto Region Board of Trade Tower, Toronto, ON M5X 1C1 | 1845-02-10 |
Investissement Tangent Ltee | 1102 Graham Boul., Mount-royal, QC H3P 3G4 | 1975-05-16 |
Charlo Board of Trade | Charlo Board of Trade, Upper Charlo, NB | 1963-01-23 |
The Board of Trade for Baddeck | Box 265, Baddick, NS B0E 1B0 | 1905-11-28 |
The Lancaster Board of Trade | Fairville, NB E2E 3H8 | 1942-01-28 |
Fundy Board of Trade | Freeport, NS | 1938-12-08 |
The King's County Board of Trade | Montague, PE | 1936-12-29 |
The North Queens Board of Trade | P.o. Box: 189, Caledonia, NS B0T 1B0 | 1906-12-18 |
Western Kings Board of Trade | P O Box 664, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 1899-04-19 |
Canso & District Board of Trade | R R 2, Guyborough, NS BOH 1N0 | 1921-07-12 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Tangent Board of Trade.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.