Western Kings Board of Trade (Corporation# 1767) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is April 19, 1899.
Corporation ID | 1767 |
Corporation Name | Western Kings Board of Trade |
Registered Office Address |
P O Box 664 Berwick NS B0P 1E0 |
Incorporation Date | 1899-04-19 |
Dissolution Date | 2012-04-05 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 15 - 15 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
TERRI GAIL | 1542 SARCH DRIVE, COLDBROOK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
GAVIN BREWSTER | 1222 CUMBERLAND DRIVE, COLDBROOK NS B4R 1A4, Canada |
ASHLEY LOGIE | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
POLLY SCOTT | 156 BROWN ST, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
BRUCE RAFUSE | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
SANDRA GRIMMER | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
KENT JOHNSON | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
BRYAN ABERNETHY | 2001 AALDERS AVENUE, NEWMINAS NS B4N 4L2, Canada |
GREG WILSON | 1121 CLEVELAND RD, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
DEBORAH LONERGAN-FREALCE | 879 CLEVELAND RD, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
JENNY MCCOY | 183 COMMERCIAL ST, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
HARTT MACKINLAY | 268 LAWRENCE RD, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
SARA KEDDY | 204 BUCHAM RD, RR1, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
HOWARD HALL | 157 BROWN ST, BOX 55, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
ALLAN CHASE | 138 CONAN AVE, KENTVILLE NS B4N 2A9, Canada |
DON CLARKE | 10 HORSBOURGH DRIVE, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1899-04-19 | current |
Boards of Trade Act - Part I (BOTA - Part I) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie I (LCH - Partie I) |
Act | 1899-04-18 | 1899-04-19 |
Boards of Trade Act - Part I (BOTA - Part I) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie I (LCH - Partie I) |
Address | 2004-03-31 | current | P O Box 664, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 |
Address | 2000-06-15 | 2004-03-31 | P O Box 664, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 |
Address | 1899-04-19 | 2000-06-15 | P O Box 664, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 |
Name | 2006-04-28 | current | Western Kings Board of Trade |
Name | 1899-04-19 | 2006-04-28 | BERWICK BOARD OF TRADE |
Status | 2012-04-05 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1899-04-19 | 2012-04-05 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Dissolution | |
2006-04-28 | Amendment / Modification | |
2004-11-17 | Ordinary By-Laws Filing / DГ©pГґt de rГЁglement ordinaire | |
1899-04-19 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2008 | 2008-02-19 | |
2007 | 2007-02-06 | |
2004 | 2003-02-26 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
11259148 Canada Inc. | 4765 Highway 1, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2019-02-19 |
11140132 Canada Limited | 197 Commercial Street, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2018-12-11 |
10501484 Canada Limited | 4954 Hwy 221, Grafton, NS B0P 1E0 | 2017-11-21 |
Tantry Foods Inc. | 5 Bezanson Dr. Rr3, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2014-03-06 |
Walking Forward Development Corporation | 261 Main Street, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2013-11-27 |
Aps Asset Protection Services Limited | 158 Commercial Street, C/o Morse Brewster Lake, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2012-09-03 |
Yazmina Ltd. | 174 South St., P.o. Box 487, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2006-06-05 |
Atlantic Healing Hemp Incorporated | 119 Beattie Lane East Dalhousie, P.o> Box 188, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2003-03-07 |
Canadian Home Arranger Incorporated | 188 Commercial Street, Berwick, NS B0P 1E0 | 2002-11-06 |
Textalchemy Inc. | 436 Shaw Rd, Berwick North, NS B0P 1E0 | 1998-07-28 |
Find all corporations in postal code B0P 1E0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
TERRI GAIL | 1542 SARCH DRIVE, COLDBROOK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
GAVIN BREWSTER | 1222 CUMBERLAND DRIVE, COLDBROOK NS B4R 1A4, Canada |
ASHLEY LOGIE | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
POLLY SCOTT | 156 BROWN ST, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
BRUCE RAFUSE | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
SANDRA GRIMMER | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
KENT JOHNSON | -, PO BOX 664, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
BRYAN ABERNETHY | 2001 AALDERS AVENUE, NEWMINAS NS B4N 4L2, Canada |
GREG WILSON | 1121 CLEVELAND RD, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
DEBORAH LONERGAN-FREALCE | 879 CLEVELAND RD, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
JENNY MCCOY | 183 COMMERCIAL ST, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
HARTT MACKINLAY | 268 LAWRENCE RD, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
SARA KEDDY | 204 BUCHAM RD, RR1, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
HOWARD HALL | 157 BROWN ST, BOX 55, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
ALLAN CHASE | 138 CONAN AVE, KENTVILLE NS B4N 2A9, Canada |
DON CLARKE | 10 HORSBOURGH DRIVE, BERWICK NS B0P 1E0, Canada |
City | BERWICK |
Post Code | B0P 1E0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
The Toronto Region Board of Trade | 77 Adelaide Street West, Toronto Region Board of Trade Tower, Toronto, ON M5X 1C1 | 1845-02-10 |
Kings of Kings Publishing Inc. | 8912 Boul. Langelier, Montreal, QC H1P 3C8 | 1995-04-04 |
Charlo Board of Trade | Charlo Board of Trade, Upper Charlo, NB | 1963-01-23 |
The Lancaster Board of Trade | Fairville, NB E2E 3H8 | 1942-01-28 |
The Board of Trade for Baddeck | Box 265, Baddick, NS B0E 1B0 | 1905-11-28 |
Fundy Board of Trade | Freeport, NS | 1938-12-08 |
Western Xperts Incorporated | 1019 Kings Heights Road Southeast, Airdrie, AB T4A 0M5 | 2019-05-03 |
Canso & District Board of Trade | R R 2, Guyborough, NS BOH 1N0 | 1921-07-12 |
Westside Board of Trade | Noaddressline, Westmount, NS | 1959-06-09 |
The King's County Board of Trade | Montague, PE | 1936-12-29 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Western Kings Board of Trade.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.