ARAG Services Corporation (Corporation# 9453326) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 25, 2015.
Corporation ID | 9453326 |
Business Number | 804232122 |
Corporation Name | ARAG Services Corporation |
Registered Office Address |
20 Adelaide St E Suite 1105 Toronto ON M5C 2T6 |
Incorporation Date | 2015-09-25 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Barbara Haynes | 80 Front Street East, Suite 414, Toronto ON M5E 1T4, Canada |
Anthony Buss | 9 Whiteladies Road, Clifton, Bristol BS8 1NN, United Kingdom |
Charles Scott Williams | 111 Noah's Farm Trail, Whitchurch-Stouffville ON L4A 4N9, Canada |
DR MATTHIAS MASLATON | HENRI-DUNANT-STRABE 3b, MOERS D-47447, Germany |
DR RENKO DIRKSEN | GRUNSTRABE 35, MEERBUSCH D-40667, Germany |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2015-09-25 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2020-01-16 | current | 20 Adelaide St E, Suite 1105, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 |
Address | 2018-06-29 | 2020-01-16 | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2425, Toronto, ON M5J 2T3 |
Address | 2017-03-10 | 2018-06-29 | 2275 Lake Shore Boulevard West, Suite 202, Toronto, ON M8V 3Y3 |
Address | 2017-03-10 | 2017-03-10 | 2275 Lake Shore Boulevard West, Suote 202, Toronto, ON M8V 3Y3 |
Address | 2015-12-03 | 2017-03-10 | 2275 Lakeshore Blvd West, Suite 225, Toronto, ON M8V 3Y3 |
Address | 2015-09-25 | 2015-12-03 | 480 University Avenue, Suite 1500, Toronto, ON M5G 1V2 |
Name | 2015-09-25 | current | ARAG Services Corporation |
Status | 2015-09-25 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-09-28 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2019 | 2019-03-19 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2018 | 2018-04-23 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2017 | 2017-02-20 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Uif 5 Gp Inc. | Suite 800, 20 Adelaid Street East, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2019-11-05 |
Faan Advisors Group Inc. | 920-20 Adelaide St. E., Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2012-10-01 |
6949541 Canada Inc. | 20 Adelaide Stree East, Suite 200, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2008-03-31 |
6125808 Canada Inc. | Suite 400, 20 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2003-08-07 |
Perkeo Investments Corporation | #400, 20 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2003-02-04 |
Foresters Financial Investment Management Company of Canada Inc. | 20 Adelaide Street Suite 1500, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2002-01-04 |
Axis Investment Fund Inc. | 20 Adelaide Street East, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2001-10-29 |
Axis Capital Corporation | 20 Adelaide Street E., Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2000-02-08 |
Zwaig Associates Inc. | 20 Adelaide St. E., Sutie 801, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 1998-08-11 |
Howden Alphair Ventilating Systems Inc. | 20 Adelaide Street. East, Suite 202, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | |
Find all corporations in postal code M5C 2T6 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Barbara Haynes | 80 Front Street East, Suite 414, Toronto ON M5E 1T4, Canada |
Anthony Buss | 9 Whiteladies Road, Clifton, Bristol BS8 1NN, United Kingdom |
Charles Scott Williams | 111 Noah's Farm Trail, Whitchurch-Stouffville ON L4A 4N9, Canada |
DR MATTHIAS MASLATON | HENRI-DUNANT-STRABE 3b, MOERS D-47447, Germany |
DR RENKO DIRKSEN | GRUNSTRABE 35, MEERBUSCH D-40667, Germany |
City | Toronto |
Post Code | M5C 2T6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Arag | 1105 - 215 Nepean St., Ottawa, ON K2P 2K5 | 2007-03-21 |
E.m.i. Corporation De Services D'ingenierie | 630 Dorchester Blvd. West, Suite 2500, Montreal, QC H3B 1W2 | 1982-01-21 |
Corporation Nationale Des Services AГ©roportuaires | 181 Bay Street, Suite 1800, Toronto, ON M5J 2T9 | 1992-04-21 |
Cba Financial Services Corporation | 5 Park Home Avenue, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M2N 6L4 | 2002-09-16 |
Cga Online Services Corporation | 1333 West Broadway, #410, Vancouver, BC V6H 4C1 | 2002-08-21 |
Corporation De Services Financiers Tay-lin Inc. | 3425 Melrose Ave, Montreal, QC H4A 2R9 | 1977-09-27 |
Corporation De Services Financiers Forvest | 175 Bloor Street East, Suite 1316, North Tower, Toronto, ON M4W 3R8 | 1988-10-14 |
Corporation De Services Financiers Qecc | 1010 Sherbrooke Street West, Suite 2210, Montreal, QC H3A 2R7 | 1988-03-21 |
Services Puissance Turbine Vanimex Corporation | 37 King St. East, Suite 294, Toronto, ON M5C 1E9 | 1976-06-07 |
Corporation Des Services Financiers Guardall | 3397 American Drive, Unit 22, Mississauga, ON L4V 1T8 | 1984-04-24 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on ARAG Services Corporation.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.