FORESTERS FINANCIAL INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY OF CANADA INC. (Corporation# 3995861) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is January 4, 2002.
Corporation ID | 3995861 |
Business Number | 869707117 |
Corporation Name |
FORESTERS FINANCIAL INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY OF CANADA INC. SOCIÉTÉ DE GESTION DE PLACEMENTS FINANCIERS CANADIENS FORESTERS INC. |
Registered Office Address |
20 Adelaide Street Suite 1500 Toronto ON M5C 2T6 |
Incorporation Date | 2002-01-04 |
Corporation Status | Inactive - Amalgamated / Inactif - FusionnГ©e |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
R. GREGORY ROSS | 5000 YONGE STREET, SUITE 800, TORONTO ON M2N 7J8, Canada |
PAUL D. REABURN | 789 Don Mills Road, TORONTO ON M3C 1T9, Canada |
PAMELA R. BRENMAN | 20 Adelaide Street East, Suite 1500, Toronto ON M5C 2T6, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2002-01-04 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2017-08-03 | current | 20 Adelaide Street Suite 1500, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 |
Address | 2004-04-02 | 2017-08-03 | 5000 Yonge Street, Toronto, ON M2N 7J8 |
Address | 2002-01-04 | 2004-04-02 | 300 Consilium Place, 14th Floor, Scarborough, ON M1H 3G2 |
Name | 2016-05-04 | current | FORESTERS FINANCIAL INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY OF CANADA INC. |
Name | 2016-05-04 | current | SOCIÉTÉ DE GESTION DE PLACEMENTS FINANCIERS CANADIENS FORESTERS INC. |
Name | 2002-01-04 | 2016-05-04 | AEGON FUND MANAGEMENT INC. |
Name | 2002-01-04 | 2016-05-04 | AEGON GESTION DE FONDS INC. |
Status | 2018-01-01 | current | Inactive - Amalgamated / Inactif - FusionnГ©e |
Status | 2002-01-04 | 2018-01-01 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Amendment / Modification |
Name Changed. Section: 178 |
2002-06-12 | Amendment / Modification | Directors Limits Changed. |
2002-01-04 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2017 | 2016-06-24 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2016 | 2015-04-15 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2015 | 2014-05-26 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Uif 5 Gp Inc. | Suite 800, 20 Adelaid Street East, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2019-11-05 |
Arag Services Corporation | 20 Adelaide St E, Suite 1105, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2015-09-25 |
Faan Advisors Group Inc. | 920-20 Adelaide St. E., Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2012-10-01 |
6949541 Canada Inc. | 20 Adelaide Stree East, Suite 200, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2008-03-31 |
6125808 Canada Inc. | Suite 400, 20 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2003-08-07 |
Perkeo Investments Corporation | #400, 20 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2003-02-04 |
Axis Investment Fund Inc. | 20 Adelaide Street East, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2001-10-29 |
Axis Capital Corporation | 20 Adelaide Street E., Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2000-02-08 |
Zwaig Associates Inc. | 20 Adelaide St. E., Sutie 801, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 1998-08-11 |
Howden Alphair Ventilating Systems Inc. | 20 Adelaide Street. East, Suite 202, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | |
Find all corporations in postal code M5C 2T6 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
R. GREGORY ROSS | 5000 YONGE STREET, SUITE 800, TORONTO ON M2N 7J8, Canada |
PAUL D. REABURN | 789 Don Mills Road, TORONTO ON M3C 1T9, Canada |
PAMELA R. BRENMAN | 20 Adelaide Street East, Suite 1500, Toronto ON M5C 2T6, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5C 2T6 |
Category | investment |
Category + City | investment + TORONTO |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Foresters Asset Management Inc. | 20 Adelaide Street East, Suite 1500, Toronto, ON M5C 2T6 | 2001-01-18 |
Iof Foresters Investment Management Inc. | 789 Don Mills Rd, Don Mills, ON M3C 1T9 | 1992-04-22 |
Forestiers Canadiens Societe D'assurance-vie | 84 Market St, P.o.box 850, Brantford, ON N3T 5S3 | 1879-12-01 |
Foresters Investment Services Limited | 789 Don Mills Road, Don Mills, ON M3C 1T9 | 1997-11-07 |
Foresters Financial Services Limited | 789 Don Mills Rd, Don Mills, ON M3C 1T9 | 1997-09-19 |
177210 Canada Ltd. | 422 Broome Rd., P.o. Box 59, Foresters Falls, ON K0J 1V0 | 1981-12-16 |
Foresters Securities (canada) Inc. | 789 Don Mills Road, Toronto, ON M3C 1T9 | 2001-03-22 |
L'ordre Independant Des Forestiers | Forester House, Don Mills, ON | 1974-03-07 |
Ottawa River Class Vii River Runners Ltd. | Foresters Falls, ON K0J 1V0 | 1983-05-30 |
I.g. Investment Management, Ltd. | 447 Portage Avenue, Winnipeg, MB R3C 3B6 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on FORESTERS FINANCIAL INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY OF CANADA INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.