FIRST TO LAST HOSIERY CO. LTD. (Corporation# 929701) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 30, 1975.
Corporation ID | 929701 |
Business Number | 874984065 |
Corporation Name | FIRST TO LAST HOSIERY CO. LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
181 University Ave Suite 1718 Toronto ON M5H 3M7 |
Incorporation Date | 1975-07-30 |
Dissolution Date | 1989-08-31 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
LARRY NOWACIN | 401 NORTH TAYLOR MILLS DRIVE, RICHMOND HILLS ON L4C 2V1, Canada |
DONNA NOWACIN | 401 NORTH TAYLOR MILLS DRIVE, RICHMOND HILLS ON L4C 2V1, Canada |
EVA GRUENWALD | 5059 PONSARD AVE, MONTREAL QC H3W 2A6, Canada |
HERMAN GRUENWALD | 5059 PONSARD AVE, MONTREAL QC H3W 2A6, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1980-12-11 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1980-12-10 | 1980-12-11 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1975-07-30 | 1980-12-10 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 1975-07-30 | current | 181 University Ave, Suite 1718, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 |
Name | 1975-07-30 | current | FIRST TO LAST HOSIERY CO. LTD. |
Status | 1989-08-31 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1987-04-04 | 1989-08-31 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1980-12-11 | 1987-04-04 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1989-08-31 | Dissolution | |
1980-12-11 | Continuance (Act) / Prorogation (Loi) | |
1975-07-30 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
La Societe D'analyse Des Investissements Pirbeck Ltee | 181 University Ave, Suite 1202, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1967-09-28 |
Dean Witter Reynolds (canada) Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1969-12-01 |
Banro Resource Corporation | 181 University Ave, Suite 2100, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1994-05-03 |
Lindt & Sprungli (canada), Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 900, Toronto, ON M8X 2C9 | 1994-12-28 |
Air Oshawa The Gateway To Durham Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1812, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1995-04-12 |
Symons-proulx Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1101 Box 11, Toronto, QC M5H 3M7 | 1982-04-08 |
Les Gerants De Souscription Symons Ltee | 181 University Ave, Suite 1101 Box 11, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Gre Financial Ltd. | 181 University Ave, Suite 700, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1984-11-05 |
137171 Canada Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1101 Box 11, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1984-11-23 |
156996 Canada Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1316, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1985-04-11 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Commerce Capital Financial Services (1977) Limited | 181 University Ave., Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1976-12-13 |
Budget Rent A Car of Canada Limited | 118 University Avenue, Suite 1810, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Quality Care Nursing Services Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1979-10-17 |
L'institut D'engagement Politique | 181 University Avenue, Suite 1202, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1977-01-26 |
Guy Lam & Co. Ltd. | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1991-08-23 |
Meditest Canada, Inc. | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1990-12-31 |
Quality Care Nursing Services Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Indoor Ski Trac Canada Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2100, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1991-12-23 |
Care-master Nursing Agency Inc. | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Quality Care Nursing Services Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Find all corporations in postal code M5H3M7 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
LARRY NOWACIN | 401 NORTH TAYLOR MILLS DRIVE, RICHMOND HILLS ON L4C 2V1, Canada |
DONNA NOWACIN | 401 NORTH TAYLOR MILLS DRIVE, RICHMOND HILLS ON L4C 2V1, Canada |
EVA GRUENWALD | 5059 PONSARD AVE, MONTREAL QC H3W 2A6, Canada |
HERMAN GRUENWALD | 5059 PONSARD AVE, MONTREAL QC H3W 2A6, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5H3M7 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Iberville Hosiery Inc. | 144 Rue Laurier, St-jean, QC | 1980-03-21 |
Hommage Fine Hosiery Ltd. | 385 Bernard St, Apt 3, Beloeuil, QC | 1975-09-29 |
Bas PCp Inc. | 110 Bloor St. W., Suite 305, Toronto, ON M5S 2W7 | 1962-03-15 |
Nylona Hosiery Inc. | 1 Dempster St., Scarborough, ON M1T 2T3 | 1985-01-30 |
Ultraknit Hosiery Ltd. | 7701 17th Ave, St Michel, QC | 1970-06-16 |
Progress Hosiery Ltd. | 8785 Park Ave, Montreal, QC H2N 1Y7 | 1969-11-12 |
Caprice Hosiery Limited | 9475 Meilleur St, Montreal, QC | 1970-04-17 |
Esko Hosiery Ltd. | 1610 Sismet Road, Mississauga, ON | 1970-06-05 |
Erger Hosiery Sales Ltd. | 10560 R Garon, Montreal, QC | 1971-09-13 |
Great Northern Hosiery Distributors Ltd. | 263 Ave Champlain, Rouyn-noranda, QC J9X 1K2 | 1978-02-14 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on FIRST TO LAST HOSIERY CO. LTD..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.