DEAN WITTER REYNOLDS (CANADA) INC. (Corporation# 320960) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is December 1, 1969.
Corporation ID | 320960 |
Business Number | 871165684 |
Corporation Name | DEAN WITTER REYNOLDS (CANADA) INC. |
Registered Office Address |
181 University Ave Suite 200 Toronto ON M5H 3M7 |
Incorporation Date | 1969-12-01 |
Corporation Status | Inactive - Amalgamated / Inactif - FusionnГ©e |
Number of Directors | 1 - 20 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
JAMES E. GIROUX | 38 BURNT LOG CRESCENT, ETOBICOKE ON , Canada |
MORRIS GERALD | 15 DALEBERRY PLACE, DON MILLS ON , Canada |
STEPHEN L. SANDLER | 306 GLENCAIRN AVENUE, TORONTO ON , Canada |
BRUCE A. GORDON | 349 CASTELFIELD AVENUE, TORONTO ON , Canada |
BRIAN R. MORRIS | 4825 ST-CATHERINE ST WEST, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
THOMAS M. DODGE | 77 GERRARD ST WEST SUITE 902, TORONTO ON , Canada |
KENNETH J. LISSAMAN | 96 CRESWELL DRIVE, BEACONSFIELD QC , Canada |
HUGH G.W. WILMER | RR 1, GRAFTON ON , Canada |
DENNIS YURKIWSKY | 172 INDIAN GROVE, TORONTO ON , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1977-06-27 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1977-06-26 | 1977-06-27 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1969-12-01 | 1977-06-26 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 1969-12-01 | current | 181 University Ave, Suite 200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 |
Name | 1980-09-24 | current | DEAN WITTER REYNOLDS (CANADA) INC. |
Name | 1977-06-27 | 1980-09-24 | REYNOLDS SECURITIES (CANADA) LTD. |
Name | 1969-12-01 | 1977-06-27 | BAKER, WEEKS OF CANADA LTD. |
Status | 1986-01-24 | current | Inactive - Amalgamated / Inactif - FusionnГ©e |
Status | 1977-06-27 | 1986-01-24 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1977-06-27 | Continuance (Act) / Prorogation (Loi) | |
1969-12-01 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1985 | 1984-11-22 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1984 | 1984-11-22 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1983 | 1984-11-22 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Dean Witter Reynolds (canada) Inc. | 40 King St W, Suite 3300, Toronto, ON M5H 1B5 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
La Societe D'analyse Des Investissements Pirbeck Ltee | 181 University Ave, Suite 1202, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1967-09-28 |
First To Last Hosiery Co. Ltd. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1718, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1975-07-30 |
Banro Resource Corporation | 181 University Ave, Suite 2100, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1994-05-03 |
Lindt & Sprungli (canada), Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 900, Toronto, ON M8X 2C9 | 1994-12-28 |
Air Oshawa The Gateway To Durham Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1812, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1995-04-12 |
Symons-proulx Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1101 Box 11, Toronto, QC M5H 3M7 | 1982-04-08 |
Les Gerants De Souscription Symons Ltee | 181 University Ave, Suite 1101 Box 11, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Gre Financial Ltd. | 181 University Ave, Suite 700, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1984-11-05 |
137171 Canada Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1101 Box 11, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1984-11-23 |
156996 Canada Inc. | 181 University Ave, Suite 1316, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1985-04-11 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Commerce Capital Financial Services (1977) Limited | 181 University Ave., Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1976-12-13 |
Budget Rent A Car of Canada Limited | 118 University Avenue, Suite 1810, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Quality Care Nursing Services Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1979-10-17 |
L'institut D'engagement Politique | 181 University Avenue, Suite 1202, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1977-01-26 |
Guy Lam & Co. Ltd. | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1991-08-23 |
Meditest Canada, Inc. | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1990-12-31 |
Quality Care Nursing Services Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Indoor Ski Trac Canada Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2100, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | 1991-12-23 |
Care-master Nursing Agency Inc. | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Quality Care Nursing Services Limited | 181 University Avenue, Suite 2200, Toronto, ON M5H 3M7 | |
Find all corporations in postal code M5H3M7 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
JAMES E. GIROUX | 38 BURNT LOG CRESCENT, ETOBICOKE ON , Canada |
MORRIS GERALD | 15 DALEBERRY PLACE, DON MILLS ON , Canada |
STEPHEN L. SANDLER | 306 GLENCAIRN AVENUE, TORONTO ON , Canada |
BRUCE A. GORDON | 349 CASTELFIELD AVENUE, TORONTO ON , Canada |
BRIAN R. MORRIS | 4825 ST-CATHERINE ST WEST, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
THOMAS M. DODGE | 77 GERRARD ST WEST SUITE 902, TORONTO ON , Canada |
KENNETH J. LISSAMAN | 96 CRESWELL DRIVE, BEACONSFIELD QC , Canada |
HUGH G.W. WILMER | RR 1, GRAFTON ON , Canada |
DENNIS YURKIWSKY | 172 INDIAN GROVE, TORONTO ON , Canada |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on DEAN WITTER REYNOLDS (CANADA) INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.