Richter Management Ltd. (Corporation# 829595) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is March 14, 1979.
Corporation ID | 829595 |
Business Number | 104525555 |
Corporation Name |
Richter Management Ltd. Gestion Richter LtГ©e |
Registered Office Address |
1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge 12e Г©tage Montreal QC H3A 0G6 |
Incorporation Date | 1979-03-14 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 15 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
TASSO LAGIOS | 2911 GAETAN-LABRÈCHE, VILLE SAINT-LAURENT QC H4R 2W5, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1979-03-14 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1979-03-13 | 1979-03-14 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2012-06-28 | current | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 |
Address | 2000-05-01 | 2012-06-28 | 2 Place Alexis Nihon, Suite 1950, Montreal, QC H3Z 3C2 |
Address | 1979-03-14 | 2000-05-01 | 2 Place Alexis Nihon, Suite 2100, Montreal, QC H3Z 3C2 |
Name | 2012-12-12 | current | Richter Management Ltd. |
Name | 2012-12-12 | current | Gestion Richter LtГ©e |
Name | 2006-03-14 | 2012-12-12 | RSM RICHTER MANAGEMENT LTD. |
Name | 2006-03-14 | 2012-12-12 | GESTION RSM RICHTER LTÉE |
Name | 1979-03-14 | 2006-03-14 | GESTION RICHTER LTEE |
Name | 1979-03-14 | 2006-03-14 | RICHTER MANAGEMENT LTD.- |
Status | 2003-04-30 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2003-03-04 | 2003-04-30 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1996-08-13 | 2003-03-04 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1996-07-01 | 1996-08-13 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | Amendment / Modification |
Name Changed. Section: 178 |
2006-03-14 | Amendment / Modification | Name Changed. |
1979-03-14 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2019-05-21 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2019 | 2018-06-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2016 | 2015-03-23 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Richter Family Office Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 1998-10-27 |
Richter Consulting Canada Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 1999-05-17 |
Richter Advisory Group Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 1978-09-22 |
Richter Wealth Holdings Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2010-12-16 |
Richter Assets Ltd. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 0G6 | 2012-03-30 |
147755 Canada Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 0G6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
10648817 Canada Inc. | 1981 Avenue Mcgill College, Suite 1200, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 0G6 | 2018-02-23 |
Relang On The Wiz Inc. | 1981 Ave Mcgill College, 11e Г©tage, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 0G6 | 2011-04-27 |
7257171 Canada Inc. | 1981, Mcgill College, 12th Floor, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2009-10-09 |
7257350 Canada Inc. | 1981 Avenue Mcgill College 12th Floor, C/o Eric Barbieri, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 0G6 | 2009-10-09 |
7257368 Canada Inc. | 1981, Mcgill College Avenue, 11th Floor, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2009-10-09 |
4330641 Canada Inc. | 1981, Mcgill College Avenue, 12th Floor, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2005-12-15 |
6458459 Canada Inc. | 1981, Mcgill College Ave, 12th Floor, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2005-10-05 |
6440100 Canada Inc. | 1981, Mcgill College Ave., 12th Floor, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2005-08-26 |
Alybooboo Holdings Inc. | 1100-1981 Mcgill College Avenue, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2003-01-29 |
3719669 Canada Inc. | 1100, 1981, Avenue Mcgill College, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 0G6 | 2000-02-07 |
Find all corporations in postal code H3A 0G6 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
TASSO LAGIOS | 2911 GAETAN-LABRÈCHE, VILLE SAINT-LAURENT QC H4R 2W5, Canada |
City | MONTREAL |
Post Code | H3A 0G6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Richter Management (toronto) Ltd. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 3510, Bay Wellington Tower, Toronto, ON M5J 2T3 | 2012-11-07 |
Richter & Richter Human Resources Consultants Inc. | 401 Marble Point Road, ., Marmora, ON K0K 2M0 | 1998-05-08 |
Richter Assets Ltd. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 0G6 | 2012-03-30 |
Richter Security Inc. | 2 Place Alexis Nihon, Suite 1950, Montreal, QC H3Z 3C2 | 2000-05-18 |
Richter Advisory Group Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 1978-09-22 |
Richter Family Office Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 1998-10-27 |
Richter Wealth Holdings Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 2010-12-16 |
The Richter Charitable Foundation | 1981 Mcgill College Avenue, 11th Floor, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 1990-11-26 |
Richter Retail Consulting Canada Inc. | 2 Alexis Nihon Plaza, Suite 1820, Montreal, QC H3Z 3C2 | 2003-06-20 |
Richter Consulting Canada Inc. | 1981, Avenue Mcgill CollГЁge, 12e Г©tage, Montreal, QC H3A 0G6 | 1999-05-17 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Richter Management Ltd..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.