Orca Voyages Inc. (Corporation# 6845851) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 25, 2007.
Corporation ID | 6845851 |
Business Number | 842941213 |
Corporation Name | Orca Voyages Inc. |
Registered Office Address |
38a Ossington Ottawa ON K1S 3B4 |
Incorporation Date | 2007-09-25 |
Dissolution Date | 2008-10-03 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 7 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
NORMAND COLLETTE | 5-885 DE L'OASIS, GATINEAU QC J8R 3W4, Canada |
CAROLE GOBEIL | 38A OSSINGTON, OTTAWA ON K1S 3B4, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2007-09-25 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2008-03-17 | current | 38a Ossington, Ottawa, ON K1S 3B4 |
Address | 2008-01-08 | 2008-03-17 | 344 Preston Street, Suite 200, Ottawa, ON K1S 4M6 |
Address | 2007-09-25 | 2008-01-08 | 228 Dalhousie, Ottawa, ON K1N 7E2 |
Name | 2008-01-28 | current | Orca Voyages Inc. |
Name | 2007-09-25 | 2008-01-28 | Voyages Carole Gobeil Inc. |
Name | 2007-09-25 | 2008-01-28 | Carole Gobeil Travel Inc. |
Status | 2008-10-03 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2007-09-25 | 2008-10-03 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2008-10-03 | Dissolution | Section: 210 |
2008-01-28 | Amendment / Modification | Name Changed. |
2007-09-25 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
11411683 Canada Inc. | 28 Ossington Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1S 3B4 | 2019-05-15 |
Multipro I.t. Service Inc. | 4445e-108 Third Ave, Ottawa, ON K1S 3B4 | 2008-09-11 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
6602614 Canada Inc. | 13 Montcalm St, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A2 | 2006-07-24 |
4052315 Canada Inc. | 11 Montcalm Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A2 | 2002-04-25 |
Jim Patrick & Associates Inc. | 11 Montcalm Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A2 | 2017-11-27 |
B Free Productions Inc. | 18-30 Montcalm Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A3 | 2020-03-09 |
Every Acton Inc. | Unit 24 - 30 Montcalm Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A3 | 2018-06-02 |
Devamo Inc. | 30 Montcalm St, Unit 21, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A3 | 2014-06-10 |
Ironactive Inc. | 22-30 Montcalm Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A3 | 2002-10-02 |
Havelock Consulting Inc. | 69 Havelock Street, Unit #1, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A4 | 2019-07-30 |
Millantria Corporation | 59 Havelock Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A4 | 2007-11-13 |
7126883 Canada Inc. | 51 Havelock Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 0A4 | 2009-02-19 |
Find all corporations in postal code K1S |
Name | Address |
---|---|
NORMAND COLLETTE | 5-885 DE L'OASIS, GATINEAU QC J8R 3W4, Canada |
CAROLE GOBEIL | 38A OSSINGTON, OTTAWA ON K1S 3B4, Canada |
City | Ottawa |
Post Code | K1S 3B4 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Orca Boats Inc. / Bateaux Orca Inc. | 19895 County Road #2, Lancaster, ON K0C 2E0 | 2004-11-23 |
Orca Power Corp. | 1201 - 700 West Pender St., Vancouver, BC V6C 1G8 | |
Orca Road Safety Consultants Ltd. | 25 Silverthorn Court, Ottawa, ON K2J 4Y2 | |
Voyages Sidlami Voyages Inc. | 70 Avenue Dahlia, Dorval, QC H9S 3N2 | 1992-01-10 |
Les Voyages Fleur De Lys Ltee | 1259 Rue Berri, Bureau 630, Montreal, QC H2L 4C7 | 1974-05-10 |
Solidair Voyages Ltd. | 3430 St. Denis, Montreal, QC | 1972-09-05 |
Miracle Voyages Inc. | 644 Sainte-croix, Saint-laurent, QC H4L 3Y2 | 2004-09-02 |
Orca Imc Gp Inc. | 750 Pandora Avenue, Victoria, BC V8W 0E4 | 2018-04-25 |
Orca Lcd Inc. | 58 Inniscross Crescent, Toronto, ON M1V 2S9 | 2018-11-16 |
Invigo Meridian Massage Inc. | 18 Orca Dr., Markham, ON L6E 0R6 | 2017-04-18 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Orca Voyages Inc..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.