LES AGENCES PRESVINS INC. (Corporation# 479071) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is March 24, 1980.
Corporation ID | 479071 |
Corporation Name |
LES AGENCES PRESVINS INC. PRESVINS AGENCIES INC. |
Registered Office Address |
4 Place Ville Marie Suite 512 Montreal QC H3B 2E7 |
Incorporation Date | 1980-03-24 |
Dissolution Date | 1987-08-31 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 5 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
GORDON R SHONIKER | 84 RICHMOND ST. E, SUITE 210, TORONTO ON M5C 1P1, Canada |
FRANCIS J COSTANZO | 2572 BROOK ROAD, ST. LAZARE QC J0P 1V0, Canada |
MICHEL F MARENTETTE | 65 KIRKLAND BOULEVARD, KIRKLAND QC H9J 1N5, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1980-03-24 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1980-03-23 | 1980-03-24 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1980-03-24 | current | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 |
Name | 1980-10-15 | current | LES AGENCES PRESVINS INC. |
Name | 1980-10-15 | current | PRESVINS AGENCIES INC. |
Name | 1980-06-17 | 1980-10-15 | LES VINS ET SPIRITUEUX PRESTIGE INC. |
Name | 1980-06-17 | 1980-10-15 | PRESTIGE VINTAGES & SPIRITS INC. |
Name | 1980-06-17 | 1980-10-15 | PRESTIGE VINTAGES ; SPIRITS INC. |
Name | 1980-03-24 | 1980-06-17 | 97532 CANADA INC. |
Status | 1987-08-31 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1985-07-06 | 1987-08-31 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1980-03-24 | 1985-07-06 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1987-08-31 | Dissolution | |
1980-03-24 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1983 | 1981-04-30 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
94135 Canada Ltee Ltd. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1979-09-18 |
The Lucky Star Productions Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 411, Montreal, QC | 1979-10-05 |
94962 Canada Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 413, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1979-11-21 |
Salus Corporation Limited | 4 Place Ville Marie, Montreal 2, QC | 1954-10-29 |
Domicare Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1977-03-24 |
Cinepop (valleyfield) Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1978-03-09 |
Gestion Giren Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC | 1978-03-08 |
Calmont Construction Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 600, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1993-05-17 |
Cinepop (rigaud) Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1979-08-08 |
94320 Canada Ltee. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Bur 512, Montreal, QC H3B 3K9 | 1979-09-26 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
93499 Canada Ltee/ltd. | 4 Place Ville-marie, Bureau 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1979-08-08 |
Foxstep Investments Ltd. | 4 Place Ville- Marie, Ste 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1974-09-23 |
La Baie De L'est - Exploration D'auriferes Limitee | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 403, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1927-10-31 |
81809 Canada Ltee | 4 Place Ville Marie, Bureau 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1977-06-28 |
Chilis International Ltd. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Bureau 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1977-08-26 |
Cinemanagement (montreal) Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1977-08-26 |
85308 Canada Ltd./ltee | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1977-11-24 |
Unelectric Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1978-01-09 |
Trans Continental Granite Inc. | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal, QC H3B 2E7 | 1978-02-22 |
Aviaco Traders Limited | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 512, Montreal 113, QC H3B 2E7 | 1969-11-05 |
Find all corporations in postal code H3B2E7 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
GORDON R SHONIKER | 84 RICHMOND ST. E, SUITE 210, TORONTO ON M5C 1P1, Canada |
FRANCIS J COSTANZO | 2572 BROOK ROAD, ST. LAZARE QC J0P 1V0, Canada |
MICHEL F MARENTETTE | 65 KIRKLAND BOULEVARD, KIRKLAND QC H9J 1N5, Canada |
City | MONTREAL |
Post Code | H3B2E7 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Agences Nor-rep Inc. | 902-88 Broadway Ave., Toronto, ON M4P 0A5 | 1978-01-12 |
H.a.d. Agencies Inc. | 321 Rue Concordia, Chateauguay, QC | 1980-01-11 |
Do-it Do-it Agencies Inc. | 95 Gince Street, St-laurent, QC H4N 1J7 | 2004-08-26 |
A.v.r. Agencies Inc. | 156-55 6eme Ave, St-georges, Beauce, QC | 1979-01-25 |
Les Agences D.o.s. Inc. | 22 Gironde, Candiac, QC J5R 4B1 | 1986-08-27 |
Co-rep Agencies Inc. | 12422 Richer, Pierrefonds, QC H8Z 1K6 | 1976-12-13 |
Agences Maritimes S.c.l. Inc. | 127 Rue St-pierre, Montreal, QC H2Y 2L6 | 1982-05-19 |
Les Agences J.f. Travers Agencies Inc. | 25 Allenbrooke, Dollard Des Ormeaux, QC H9A 2S6 | 1985-02-21 |
J.a.z.z. (sales Agencies) Inc. | 159 Ch. Legault, St-sauveur Des Monts, QC J0R 1R7 | 2000-11-17 |
Mrg Agencies Ltd. | 1852 Gagnon, Lachine, QC H8T 9Z7 | 1979-08-28 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LES AGENCES PRESVINS INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.