INTERNATIONAL CARBONIC (CANADA) LTD. (Corporation# 993824) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 12, 1976.
Corporation ID | 993824 |
Corporation Name | INTERNATIONAL CARBONIC (CANADA) LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
1955 Notre Dame De Fatima Duvernay, Laval QC |
Incorporation Date | 1976-07-12 |
Dissolution Date | 1985-08-31 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 15 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
RANDY ROBBINS | 13 MIRECOURT, LORRAINE QC , Canada |
JEAN L. TRUDEAU | 184 MARQUIS DE TRACY, BOUCHERVILLE QC , Canada |
ROGER LACHAPELLE | 11807 DEMEULLES, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
JEAN CLAUDE HEBERT | 2 WESTMOUNT SQUARE, WESTMOUNT QC , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1976-07-12 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1976-07-11 | 1976-07-12 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1976-07-12 | current | 1955 Notre Dame De Fatima, Duvernay, Laval, QC |
Name | 1978-03-20 | current | INTERNATIONAL CARBONIC (CANADA) LTD. |
Name | 1976-07-12 | 1978-03-20 | LES SERVICES DE CHLORINATION ET DE MECANIQUE C.M.S. LTEE |
Name | 1976-07-12 | 1978-03-20 | C.M.S. CHLORINATION & MECHANICAL SERVICES LTD. |
Name | 1976-07-12 | 1978-03-20 | C.M.S. CHLORINATION ; MECHANICAL SERVICES LTD. |
Status | 1985-08-31 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1983-06-03 | 1985-08-31 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1976-07-12 | 1983-06-03 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1985-08-31 | Dissolution | |
1976-07-12 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Address | 1955 NOTRE DAME DE FATIMA |
City | DUVERNAY, LAVAL |
Province | QC |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Vins Agostino Inc. | 3020 Boul. Levesque, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 2P1 | 2007-07-27 |
Centak Management Consultants Inc. | 3944 Du Commissaire, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 5H4 | 2007-01-25 |
Ivan Stecko Holding Inc. | 2330 Parent Street, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 1C5 | 2003-12-04 |
National Consolidated Trading System Inc. | 1175 Jolicoeur, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 1A9 | 2003-01-03 |
Meubles Semeon Inc. | 2355 Boul De La Concorde Est, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 2A9 | 2001-06-22 |
3871720 Canada Inc. | 3884 De L`intendant, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 5H9 | 2001-03-05 |
Gianmajor Inc. | 3099 Ave Des Gouverneurs, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 5J3 | 2000-01-28 |
3650367 Canada Inc. | 3025 Croissant Giffard, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 4Y9 | 1999-08-13 |
3587606 Canada Inc. | 3180 Sauterne, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 1W7 | 1999-05-03 |
3526551 Canada Inc. | 1715 Rue Charette, Duvernay, Laval, QC H7E 4L8 | 1998-08-28 |
Find all corporations in DUVERNAY, LAVAL |
Name | Address |
---|---|
RANDY ROBBINS | 13 MIRECOURT, LORRAINE QC , Canada |
JEAN L. TRUDEAU | 184 MARQUIS DE TRACY, BOUCHERVILLE QC , Canada |
ROGER LACHAPELLE | 11807 DEMEULLES, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
JEAN CLAUDE HEBERT | 2 WESTMOUNT SQUARE, WESTMOUNT QC , Canada |
City | DUVERNAY, LAVAL |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on INTERNATIONAL CARBONIC (CANADA) LTD..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.