Bikers Battling Cancer (Corporation# 9846387) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 27, 2016.
Corporation ID | 9846387 |
Business Number | 758183925 |
Corporation Name | Bikers Battling Cancer |
Registered Office Address |
44 Bayview Dr # 1 Powassan ON P0A 1Z0 |
Incorporation Date | 2016-07-27 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 3 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Paul Stephan Berlinguette | 727 Roosevelt ave 2, Ottawa ON K2A 2A8, Canada |
Daryl Anthony Chester | 1729 Dondale st, Gloucester ON K1B 5H7, Canada |
Donald James Smith | 2881 Richmond Rd 313, Ottawa ON K2B 8J5, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2016-07-27 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Address | 2018-12-02 | current | 44 Bayview Dr # 1, Powassan, ON P0A 1Z0 |
Address | 2017-07-06 | 2018-12-02 | 4p Crystal Beach Dr, Ottawa, ON K2B 5M5 |
Address | 2016-07-27 | 2017-07-06 | 2881 Richmond Rd 313, Ottawa, ON K2B 8J5 |
Name | 2016-07-27 | current | Bikers Battling Cancer |
Status | 2016-07-27 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Greater Limpopo Carnivore Program | 2536 Pevensey Road, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2018-01-29 |
Big Secret Film Company Inc. | 4180 Boundary Road, Rural-route 2, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2018-01-01 |
9804323 Canada Corp. | 204 Forest Lake Road, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2016-06-22 |
Nayo-earthgen Partners Corporation | 77 Main Street Unit 122, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2015-11-16 |
Indigenous Standards Authority for Corporate Ethicacy Isa Incorporated | 77 Main St, Unit 122, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2015-09-23 |
Payuk Energy Solutions Inc. | 122-77 Main Street, Box 70, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2015-07-13 |
9361219 Canada Inc. | 40 Queen Street, P O Box 1124, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2015-07-08 |
Anishinabek Solutrean Metis Indigenous Nation Management Corporation | 80 Main St, Box 220, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2015-03-13 |
8962111 Canada Inc. | 61 Rue Paget (po Box 571), Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2014-07-23 |
8935068 Canada Inc. | 61 Paget Street, Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0 | 2014-07-01 |
Find all corporations in postal code P0A 1Z0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Paul Stephan Berlinguette | 727 Roosevelt ave 2, Ottawa ON K2A 2A8, Canada |
Daryl Anthony Chester | 1729 Dondale st, Gloucester ON K1B 5H7, Canada |
Donald James Smith | 2881 Richmond Rd 313, Ottawa ON K2B 8J5, Canada |
City | Powassan |
Post Code | P0A 1Z0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Bikers Rights Organization (ontario) Inc | 687 Fairview Road, Fort Erie, ON L2J 1Y9 | |
Fondation Afrique Cancer | 2-2601 Boulevard PÈre LeliÈvre, QuÉbec, QC G1P 2X9 | 2020-05-01 |
Beauty Against Cancer | 2033 Sherbrooke E, Montreal, QC H2K 1C1 | 2016-11-29 |
Ministeres De Cancer Internationaux | 525 Bouchard Street, Hemmingford, QC J0L 1H0 | 1997-06-05 |
Cancer Care West Africa | 48 Carling St #3, Hamilton, ON L8S 1M9 | 2015-11-27 |
Breast Cancer Action | 1130 St Emmanuel Terrace, Orleans, ON K1C 2J7 | 1993-02-09 |
Canadian Cancer Society | 55 St. Clair Avenue West, Suite 300, Toronto, ON M4V 2Y7 | |
Canadian Cancer Society | 55 St. Clair Avenue West, Suite 300, Toronto, ON M4V 2Y7 | |
Societe Canadienne Du Cancer | 55, St.clair Avenue West, Suite 300, Toronto, ON M4V 2Y7 | 1938-03-28 |
Fondation Donespoir Cancer | 4891 Saint-charles Blvd., Pierrefonds, QC H9H 3E4 | 2015-01-28 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Bikers Battling Cancer.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.