TERRACE AND DISTRICT BOARD OF TRADE (Corporation# 9750) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 23, 1927.
Corporation ID | 9750 |
Corporation Name | TERRACE AND DISTRICT BOARD OF TRADE |
Registered Office Address |
3224 Kalum St. Terrace BC V8G 2N1 |
Incorporation Date | 1927-09-23 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 12 - 12 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
THOMAS KELLER | 3838 Dejong Crescent, Terrace BC V8G 4W6, Canada |
Bruce Champion | 4718 Walsh Avenue, Terrace BC V8G 1Y6, Canada |
Matt Berube | 4901 Straum Avenue, Terrace BC V8G 2C9, Canada |
ROD COX | 4705 Graham Avenue, Terrace BC V8G 1A6, Canada |
Scott Pearson | 2605 Skeena Street, Terrace BC V8G 3K2, Canada |
Mike Jones | 2045 Churchhill Drive, Terrace BC V8G 0E8, Canada |
Joshua Papke | 2314 Cramer St., Terrace BC V8G 2K7, Canada |
LORALIE THOMSON | 2507 Skeena Street, Terrace BC V8G 3K2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1927-09-23 | current |
Boards of Trade Act - Part II (BOTA - Part II) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie II (LCH - Partie II) |
Act | 1927-09-22 | 1927-09-23 |
Boards of Trade Act - Part II (BOTA - Part II) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie II (LCH - Partie II) |
Address | 2016-03-31 | current | 3224 Kalum St., Terrace, BC V8G 2N1 |
Address | 2015-05-25 | 2016-03-31 | #202-4554 Lazelle Ave., Terrace, BC V8G 1S2 |
Address | 2006-03-31 | 2015-05-25 | 4511 Keith Avenue, Terrace, BC V8G 1K1 |
Address | 1927-09-23 | 2006-03-31 | 4511 Keith Avenue, Terrace, BC V8G 1S6 |
Name | 1927-09-23 | current | TERRACE AND DISTRICT BOARD OF TRADE |
Status | 1927-09-23 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1927-09-23 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2019-06-19 | |
2019 | 2018-06-14 | |
2018 | 2017-05-17 | |
2016 | 2015-05-20 | |
2015 | 2014-05-15 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Kraai International | 3567 Gyiik Rd, Terrace, BC V8G 0C8 | 2018-04-19 |
Blue Otter Investments Inc. | 909 Robin Rd., Terrace, BC V8G 0E5 | 2014-01-03 |
6977634 Canada Inc. | 634 Matson Road, Terrace, BC V8G 0E7 | 2008-05-16 |
Action Shooting Canada Ltd. | 505 Old Lakelse Lake Drive, Terrace, BC V8G 0G5 | 2018-02-15 |
Brilliance Global Mission | 3339 Old Lakelse Lake Drive, Terrace, BC V8G 0G6 | 2015-01-23 |
Vector Instructional Services Incorporated | 34 Curtis Drive, Terrace, BC V8G 0G8 | 2010-03-14 |
Skeena Inc. | 5027 Medeek Ave, Terrace, BC V8G 1C9 | 2015-01-31 |
Ipower Consulting Limited | 15319 Victoria Avenue, White Rock, BC V8G 1G9 | 2002-02-11 |
Monumental Design Company Ltd. | 100 - 4426 Legion Ave, Terrace, BC V8G 1N6 | 2018-06-05 |
Spirit Stones Ltd. | 101-4426 Legion Ave, Terrace, BC V8G 1N6 | 2011-10-24 |
Find all corporations in postal code V8G |
Name | Address |
---|---|
THOMAS KELLER | 3838 Dejong Crescent, Terrace BC V8G 4W6, Canada |
Bruce Champion | 4718 Walsh Avenue, Terrace BC V8G 1Y6, Canada |
Matt Berube | 4901 Straum Avenue, Terrace BC V8G 2C9, Canada |
ROD COX | 4705 Graham Avenue, Terrace BC V8G 1A6, Canada |
Scott Pearson | 2605 Skeena Street, Terrace BC V8G 3K2, Canada |
Mike Jones | 2045 Churchhill Drive, Terrace BC V8G 0E8, Canada |
Joshua Papke | 2314 Cramer St., Terrace BC V8G 2K7, Canada |
LORALIE THOMSON | 2507 Skeena Street, Terrace BC V8G 3K2, Canada |
City | TERRACE |
Post Code | V8G 2N1 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Canso & District Board of Trade | R R 2, Guyborough, NS BOH 1N0 | 1921-07-12 |
Grand Narrows and District Board of Trade | Rr 2, Box 55, Christmas Island, NS B0A 1C0 | 1955-11-03 |
District Board of Trade (isaac's) Harbour) | Postal Station, Goldboro, NS B0H 1L0 | 1968-03-21 |
The Richibucto-rexton District Board of Trade | Richibucto, NB | 1941-07-21 |
Marcelin & District Board of Trade | Village of Marcelin, SK S0J 1R0 | 1971-11-04 |
Wilkie and District Board of Trade | Wilkie, SK S0K 4W0 | 1949-03-28 |
The Barkerville District Board of Trade | Barkerville, BC V0K 1B0 | 1933-09-11 |
Lac La Hache District Board of Trade | 100 Millhouse, Lac La Hache, BC V0K 1T0 | 1964-04-14 |
Margo and District Board of Trade | Margo, SK | 1964-02-18 |
District of Donnelly Board of Trade | Donnelly, AB | 1927-06-21 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on TERRACE AND DISTRICT BOARD OF TRADE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.