STERLING TRUST CORPORATION (Corporation# 963836) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is May 19, 1911.
Corporation ID | 963836 |
Corporation Name | STERLING TRUST CORPORATION |
Registered Office Address |
372 Bay St Sterling Tower Toronto ON M5H 2W9 |
Incorporation Date | 1911-05-19 |
Corporation Status | Inactive - Discontinued / Inactif - Changement de rГ©gime |
Number of Directors | - |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
MAURICE JODOIN | 11 AVENUE BELOEIL, OUTREMONT QC H3V 2Z1, Canada |
MARCEL CAZAVAN | 248 RUE COROT SUITE 311, ILE DES SOEURS QC , Canada |
ANTHONY MACTIER | 1530 CALEDONIA ROAD, MOUNT ROYAL QC H3R 2W4, Canada |
FRANK M. ROLPH | 230 RUSSELL HILL ROAD, TORONTO ON M4V 2T2, Canada |
JEAN D. VINCENT | 237 ST CLAIRE, POINTE CLAIRE QC H9S 4E3, Canada |
THOMAS N. DAVIDSON | 53 FAIRWAY HEIGHTS DRIVE, THORNHILL ON L3T 3A7, Canada |
REGINALD GROOME | 3577 ATWATER AVENUE SUITE 207, MONTREAL QC H3H 2R2, Canada |
GEORGE A. WILSON | 33 HILLHURST BOULEVARD, TORONTO ON M5N 1N5, Canada |
GUY P. FRENCH | 139 TEDDINGTON PARK AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4N 2C7, Canada |
IAN D. MAIR | 945 CALEDONIA ROAD, MOUNT ROYAL QC H3R 2V5, Canada |
J. ALEX WILSON | 51 BRANT STREET EAST, ORILLIA ON L3V 1Z1, Canada |
GEORGE L. BOWIE | 16 LINKSGATE ROAD, LONDON ON N6G 2A7, Canada |
BERNARD NESS | 30 WELLINGTON ST EAST SUITE 802, TORONTO ON M5E 1S3, Canada |
MAURICE MYRAND | 1215 MOUNT ROYAL BOULEVARD, OUTREMONT QC H2V 2H7, Canada |
ALASTAIR FERNIE | 1550 DR. PENFIELD SUITE 603, MONTREAL QC H3G 1C2, Canada |
MICHAEL A. MEIGHEN | 80 WOODLAWN AVENUE WEST, TORONTO ON M4V 1G7, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1911-05-19 | current |
More than 1 Act Applicable Plus d'une loi applicable |
Act | 1911-05-18 | 1911-05-19 |
More than 1 Act Applicable Plus d'une loi applicable |
Address | 1911-05-19 | current | 372 Bay St Sterling Tower, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 |
Name | 1911-05-19 | current | STERLING TRUST CORPORATION |
Status | 1987-09-25 | current | Inactive - Discontinued / Inactif - Changement de rГ©gime |
Status | 1911-05-19 | 1987-09-25 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1987-09-25 | Discontinuance / Changement de rГ©gime | Jurisdiction: Trust and Loans Companies Act / Loi sur les sociГ©tГ©s de fiducie et de prГЄt |
1911-05-19 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
176934 Canada Inc. | 372 Bay St, Suite 1605, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1979-12-24 |
John B. Challies Trading Inc. | 372 Bay Street, Suite 2006, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1978-01-05 |
Clthomson Express International Corporation | 372 Bay Street, Suite 601, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1991-02-28 |
VideomГ©s Career Services Inc. | 372 Bay Street, Suite 306, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1990-12-07 |
2809435 Canada Limited | 372 Bay St, Suite 1100, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1992-03-27 |
J.m.p.m. Entreprises Limitee | 372 Bay St, Suite 902, Toronto 105, ON M5H 2W9 | 1961-08-22 |
174915 Canada Inc. | 372 Bay Street, Suite 806, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1990-08-23 |
Israel Philatelic Agency of Canada Limited | 372 Bay Street, Suite 2006, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1968-10-15 |
Klear Vision Contact Lens Company of Canada, Ltd. | 372 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1957-11-04 |
Laurentian Quicksilver Corporation Limited | 372 Bay Street, Suite 1902, Toronto, ON M5H 2W9 | 1956-12-13 |
Find all corporations in postal code M5H2W9 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
MAURICE JODOIN | 11 AVENUE BELOEIL, OUTREMONT QC H3V 2Z1, Canada |
MARCEL CAZAVAN | 248 RUE COROT SUITE 311, ILE DES SOEURS QC , Canada |
ANTHONY MACTIER | 1530 CALEDONIA ROAD, MOUNT ROYAL QC H3R 2W4, Canada |
FRANK M. ROLPH | 230 RUSSELL HILL ROAD, TORONTO ON M4V 2T2, Canada |
JEAN D. VINCENT | 237 ST CLAIRE, POINTE CLAIRE QC H9S 4E3, Canada |
THOMAS N. DAVIDSON | 53 FAIRWAY HEIGHTS DRIVE, THORNHILL ON L3T 3A7, Canada |
REGINALD GROOME | 3577 ATWATER AVENUE SUITE 207, MONTREAL QC H3H 2R2, Canada |
GEORGE A. WILSON | 33 HILLHURST BOULEVARD, TORONTO ON M5N 1N5, Canada |
GUY P. FRENCH | 139 TEDDINGTON PARK AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4N 2C7, Canada |
IAN D. MAIR | 945 CALEDONIA ROAD, MOUNT ROYAL QC H3R 2V5, Canada |
J. ALEX WILSON | 51 BRANT STREET EAST, ORILLIA ON L3V 1Z1, Canada |
GEORGE L. BOWIE | 16 LINKSGATE ROAD, LONDON ON N6G 2A7, Canada |
BERNARD NESS | 30 WELLINGTON ST EAST SUITE 802, TORONTO ON M5E 1S3, Canada |
MAURICE MYRAND | 1215 MOUNT ROYAL BOULEVARD, OUTREMONT QC H2V 2H7, Canada |
ALASTAIR FERNIE | 1550 DR. PENFIELD SUITE 603, MONTREAL QC H3G 1C2, Canada |
MICHAEL A. MEIGHEN | 80 WOODLAWN AVENUE WEST, TORONTO ON M4V 1G7, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5H2W9 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Zenda Sterling Mall Holdings Corporation | 1 Holiday Avenue - East Tower, Suite #315, Pointe-claire, QC H9R 5N3 | 2009-12-08 |
Dv Sterling Enterprises Inc. | 6801 Louis Pasteur Road, Cote St. Luc, QC H4W 2X1 | 2010-09-02 |
Images Sterling Inc. | 310 Victoria Avenue, Suite 408, Montreal, QC H3Z 2M9 | 1993-06-01 |
Sterling-first Management Inc. | 1395, Rue De L'Г‰glise, Saint-laurent, QC H4L 2H1 | 2002-12-17 |
Les Graphiques Sterling Inc. | 15 Cartier Avenue, Pointe Claire, QC | 1980-10-16 |
The Sterling Group Intimates Inc. | 9600, Meilleur, Suite 930, Montreal, QC H2N 2E3 | 2004-03-18 |
Actc Financial Corporation | 415, 10665 Jasper Avenue, Edmonton, AB T5J 3S9 | |
Sterling Universal LimitÉe | 4 King Street West, Suite 1400, Toronto, ON M5H 1B6 | 1985-12-31 |
Lainages & Soies Sterling (canada) Ltee | 9200 Park Avenue, Suite 507, Montreal, QC H2N 1Z4 | 1965-12-06 |
Imagerie Diagnostique Sterling (canada) Inc. | 40 King Street West, Suite 4400, Toronto, ON M5H 3Y4 | 1996-02-26 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on STERLING TRUST CORPORATION.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.