Les Fermes Cailles Sunrise Inc. (Corporation# 9514520) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 17, 2015.
Corporation ID | 9514520 |
Business Number | 796518892 |
Corporation Name |
Les Fermes Cailles Sunrise Inc. Sunrise Quail Farms Inc. |
Registered Office Address |
110 North Front Street A3#336 Belleville ON K8P 0A4 |
Incorporation Date | 2015-11-17 |
Dissolution Date | 2018-09-20 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 69 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Robert Moniz | 315 Place D'Youville #213, Montreal QC H2Y 0A4, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2015-11-17 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2015-11-17 | current | 110 North Front Street A3#336, Belleville, ON K8P 0A4 |
Name | 2015-11-17 | current | Les Fermes Cailles Sunrise Inc. |
Name | 2015-11-17 | current | Sunrise Quail Farms Inc. |
Status | 2018-09-20 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2018-04-23 | 2018-09-20 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2015-11-17 | 2018-04-23 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2015-11-17 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Address | 110 North Front Street A3#336 |
City | Belleville |
Province | ON |
Postal Code | K8P 0A4 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Hebrew Nutri-quail Ltd. | 110 North Front Street A3#336, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2015-08-02 |
Canadian Quail Farms Inc. | 110 North Front Street A3#336, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2015-10-22 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Murrant Electric Inc. | 16 Hayden Place, Belleville, ON K8P 0A5 | 2016-08-01 |
Tfama Tek Inc. | 8, Hayden Pl, Belleville, ON K8P 0A5 | 2016-06-20 |
Cozypac Inc. | 8 Hayden Place, Belleville, ON K8P 0A5 | 2006-02-20 |
Myer's Cave Snack Bar Ltd. | 110 North Front St A3#336, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2015-08-27 |
Capri Chesterfield Limited | 110 North Front Street - A3 Suite#336, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2014-05-03 |
8396663 Canada Ltd. | 110 North Front St - A3, Suite 317, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2013-01-03 |
Mynexco Tdr Management Ltd. | 110 North Front Street, Suite 346, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2012-02-07 |
Premergo International Inc. | 110 North Front St. - A3 # 337, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 1995-09-05 |
Personal Sovereignty League Ltd. | 110 North Front Street, Suite 346, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2012-03-05 |
Expatriate Asset Management Ltd. | 110 North Front Street, Suite 346, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2014-02-01 |
Find all corporations in postal code K8P |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Robert Moniz | 315 Place D'Youville #213, Montreal QC H2Y 0A4, Canada |
City | Belleville |
Post Code | K8P 0A4 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Technologie Sunrise- Kml Inc. | 561 Avenue Orly, Dorval, QC H9P 1G1 | 1993-02-24 |
Canadian Quail Farms Inc. | 110 North Front Street A3#336, Belleville, ON K8P 0A6 | 2015-10-22 |
Construction Connexe Sunrise Ltee | 12 Jean-talon East, Suite 101, Montreal, QC | 1979-09-05 |
Foch Sunrise Investments Inc. | 6611 Boul. Thimens, Saint-laurent, QC H4S 1W2 | 2006-02-09 |
Sunrise Canercon Int'l Corporation | 1902 Rue De La Bernache, St. Lazare, QC J7T 3G8 | 2006-05-12 |
Gy Sunrise Inc. | 20 Summerlea Str, Markham, ON L3S 4H6 | 2008-07-08 |
Adavius Inc. | 177 Sunrise Court, Ridgeway, ON L0S 1N0 | 2003-03-03 |
12374480 Canada Inc. | 55 Sunrise Dr, Markham, ON L3R 1A1 | 2020-09-28 |
J. & V. Marketing Corporation | 40 Sunrise Ave., Toronto, ON | 1978-12-11 |
Condoharmony Inc. | 10 Sunrise Ave. Suite 420, Toronto, ON M4A 2R1 | 2019-08-01 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Les Fermes Cailles Sunrise Inc..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.