The Royal Ontario Museum Foundation (Corporation# 8969159) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is January 1, 1970.
Corporation ID | 8969159 |
Business Number | 136282126 |
Corporation Name |
The Royal Ontario Museum Foundation The Royal Ontario Museum Foundation |
Registered Office Address |
100 Queen's Park Toronto ON M5S 2C6 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 9 - 30 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Mary Anne Bueschkens | ABC Group, 2 Norelco Drive, Toronto ON M9L 2X6, Canada |
V PREM WATSA | Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd., 800 - 95 Wellington Street West, TORONTO ON M5J 2N7, Canada |
MICHAEL LEE-CHIN | Portland Holdings, 100 - 1375 Kerns Road, BURLINGTON ON L7P 4V7, Canada |
Dan Mishra | 623 St. Germain Avenue, Toronto ON M5M 1X6, Canada |
Jeff Willner | 2 Queen Street East, Toronto ON M5C 3G7, Canada |
ROBERT E. PIERCE | Stonegate Private Counsel, 15 York Street, 2nd Floor, TORONTO ON M5J 0A3, Canada |
LINDA HASENFRATZ | Linamar Corporation, 287 Speedvale Avenue West, GUELPH ON N1H 1C5, Canada |
W. ROBERT FARQUHARSON | AGF Management, 66 Wellington St. W., 31st Floor, TORONTO ON M5K 1E9, Canada |
GIOVANNI BIANCHINI | Hatch Limited, 2800 Speakman Drive, Mississauga ON L5K 2R7, Canada |
Barbara Hennick | 1140 Bay Street, Suite 4000, Toronto ON M5S 2B4, Canada |
Christopher Jamroz | St. George Logistics, 5 Logistics Drive, South Kearny NJ 07032, United States |
John Ruffolo | OMERS Platform Investments, 200 Bay Street, Suite 1410, South Tower, Toronto ON M5J 2J2, Canada |
Julie A. Lassonde | 20 Eglinton Ave. West, Suite 1900, Toronto ON M4R 1K8, Canada |
Jordan Sarick | 305-95 Barber Greene Road, Toronto ON M3C 3E9, Canada |
RICHARD S. WERNHAM | Soutterham Investments Limited, 5 Bridgman Avenue, TORONTO ON M5R 3V4, Canada |
CATHY SPOEL | 34 WARREN ROAD, TORONTO ON M4V 2R5, Canada |
SHREYAS AJMERA | Seenergy Foods Ltd, 121 Jevalin Drive, Woodbridge ON L4L 8A8, Canada |
Francis Shen | 59 Elgin Avenue, Toronto ON M5R 1G5, Canada |
Isabel Alves-Vettoretto | 200 Wicksteed Avenue, Toronto ON M4G 2B6, Canada |
Daniel N. Argiros | 161 Bay Street, Suite 2100, TD Canada Trust Tower, Toronto ON M5J 2S1, Canada |
Salim A. Manji | Barney River, 22 Adelaide Street West, Suite 3910, Toronto ON M5H 4E3, Canada |
Jennifer Ivey Bannock | Ivey Foundation, 51 Dawlish Road, Toronto ON M4N 1H2, Canada |
Robert H. Pitfield | 35 Blyth Hill Road, Toronto ON M4N 3L6, Canada |
ELLEN J. MOORE | Chubb Insurance Company of Canada, 199 Bay St., Suite 2500, Toronto ON M5L 1E1, Canada |
Stephen Bowman | Bennett Jones LLP, 3400 One First Canadian Place, Toronto ON M5X 1A4, Canada |
SALVATORE M. BADALI | Odgers Berndtson, 3150 - 200 Bay Street, South Tower, TORONTO ON M5J 2J3, Canada |
ROBERT A. KEILTY | HUB International HKMB Limited, 900 - 595 Bay Street, Toronto ON M5G 2E3, Canada |
JOSEPH M. TANENBAUM | Jay-M Holdings, 700 - 2 St. Clair Avenue East, TORONTO ON M4T 2T5, Canada |
JOSHUA BASSECHES | Royal Ontario Museum, 100 Queen's Park, Toronto ON M5S 2C6, Canada |
Sarah Bull | KJ Harrison Investors, 60 Bedford Road, Toronto ON M5R 2K2, Canada |
Patricia L. Olasker | 155 Wellington Street West, 37th Floor, Toronto ON M5V 3J7, Canada |
R. Browning Watt | 78 De Vere Gardens, Toronto ON M5M 3E9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-11-05 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Address | 2014-11-05 | current | 100 Queen's Park, Toronto, ON M5S 2C6 |
Name | 2014-11-05 | current | The Royal Ontario Museum Foundation |
Name | 2014-11-05 | current | The Royal Ontario Museum Foundation |
Status | 2014-11-05 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | Financial Statement / Г‰tats financiers | Statement Date: 2020-03-31. |
2019-08-15 | Financial Statement / Г‰tats financiers | Statement Date: 2019-03-31. |
2018-08-20 | Financial Statement / Г‰tats financiers | Statement Date: 2018-03-31. |
2017-12-21 | Financial Statement / Г‰tats financiers | Statement Date: 2017-03-31. |
2017-12-21 | Amendment / Modification |
Directors Limits Changed. Section: 201 |
2017-01-03 | Financial Statement / Г‰tats financiers | Statement Date: 2016-03-31. |
2015-08-13 | Financial Statement / Г‰tats financiers | Statement Date: 2015-03-31. |
2014-11-05 | Continuance (import) / Prorogation (importation) | Jurisdiction: Ontario |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-06-18 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2019 | 2019-06-20 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2018-06-27 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2017 | 2017-06-28 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Ontario College of Teachers Foundation | 101 Bloor Street West, Toronto, ON M5S 0A1 | 2003-02-21 |
University of Toronto Community Radio Inc. | 89.5 Tower Raod, Toronto, ON M5S 0A2 | 1986-09-11 |
Al-umeed Rehabilitation Association (aura) Canada | 1086 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5S 0A3 | 2019-10-07 |
K.c. Lifestyling Inc. | 59 St. Mary Street, Toronto, ON M5S 0A4 | 2018-04-27 |
Len Health Sciences Ltd. | 63 St. Mary Street, Th-7, Unit 4, Toronto, ON M5S 0A4 | |
Dingdingdang Inc. | 906-1080 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5S 0A5 | 2020-11-11 |
Unity Star Ltd. | Unit 707, 1080 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5S 0A5 | 2020-09-28 |
Long Come Way Limited | 3304-1080 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5S 0A5 | 2020-07-09 |
Talentmall Ltd. | 1609-1080 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5S 0A5 | 2020-05-27 |
12023512 Canada Inc. | 2503, 1080 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5S 0A5 | 2020-04-26 |
Find all corporations in postal code M5S |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Mary Anne Bueschkens | ABC Group, 2 Norelco Drive, Toronto ON M9L 2X6, Canada |
V PREM WATSA | Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd., 800 - 95 Wellington Street West, TORONTO ON M5J 2N7, Canada |
MICHAEL LEE-CHIN | Portland Holdings, 100 - 1375 Kerns Road, BURLINGTON ON L7P 4V7, Canada |
Dan Mishra | 623 St. Germain Avenue, Toronto ON M5M 1X6, Canada |
Jeff Willner | 2 Queen Street East, Toronto ON M5C 3G7, Canada |
ROBERT E. PIERCE | Stonegate Private Counsel, 15 York Street, 2nd Floor, TORONTO ON M5J 0A3, Canada |
LINDA HASENFRATZ | Linamar Corporation, 287 Speedvale Avenue West, GUELPH ON N1H 1C5, Canada |
W. ROBERT FARQUHARSON | AGF Management, 66 Wellington St. W., 31st Floor, TORONTO ON M5K 1E9, Canada |
GIOVANNI BIANCHINI | Hatch Limited, 2800 Speakman Drive, Mississauga ON L5K 2R7, Canada |
Barbara Hennick | 1140 Bay Street, Suite 4000, Toronto ON M5S 2B4, Canada |
Christopher Jamroz | St. George Logistics, 5 Logistics Drive, South Kearny NJ 07032, United States |
John Ruffolo | OMERS Platform Investments, 200 Bay Street, Suite 1410, South Tower, Toronto ON M5J 2J2, Canada |
Julie A. Lassonde | 20 Eglinton Ave. West, Suite 1900, Toronto ON M4R 1K8, Canada |
Jordan Sarick | 305-95 Barber Greene Road, Toronto ON M3C 3E9, Canada |
RICHARD S. WERNHAM | Soutterham Investments Limited, 5 Bridgman Avenue, TORONTO ON M5R 3V4, Canada |
CATHY SPOEL | 34 WARREN ROAD, TORONTO ON M4V 2R5, Canada |
SHREYAS AJMERA | Seenergy Foods Ltd, 121 Jevalin Drive, Woodbridge ON L4L 8A8, Canada |
Francis Shen | 59 Elgin Avenue, Toronto ON M5R 1G5, Canada |
Isabel Alves-Vettoretto | 200 Wicksteed Avenue, Toronto ON M4G 2B6, Canada |
Daniel N. Argiros | 161 Bay Street, Suite 2100, TD Canada Trust Tower, Toronto ON M5J 2S1, Canada |
Salim A. Manji | Barney River, 22 Adelaide Street West, Suite 3910, Toronto ON M5H 4E3, Canada |
Jennifer Ivey Bannock | Ivey Foundation, 51 Dawlish Road, Toronto ON M4N 1H2, Canada |
Robert H. Pitfield | 35 Blyth Hill Road, Toronto ON M4N 3L6, Canada |
ELLEN J. MOORE | Chubb Insurance Company of Canada, 199 Bay St., Suite 2500, Toronto ON M5L 1E1, Canada |
Stephen Bowman | Bennett Jones LLP, 3400 One First Canadian Place, Toronto ON M5X 1A4, Canada |
SALVATORE M. BADALI | Odgers Berndtson, 3150 - 200 Bay Street, South Tower, TORONTO ON M5J 2J3, Canada |
ROBERT A. KEILTY | HUB International HKMB Limited, 900 - 595 Bay Street, Toronto ON M5G 2E3, Canada |
JOSEPH M. TANENBAUM | Jay-M Holdings, 700 - 2 St. Clair Avenue East, TORONTO ON M4T 2T5, Canada |
JOSHUA BASSECHES | Royal Ontario Museum, 100 Queen's Park, Toronto ON M5S 2C6, Canada |
Sarah Bull | KJ Harrison Investors, 60 Bedford Road, Toronto ON M5R 2K2, Canada |
Patricia L. Olasker | 155 Wellington Street West, 37th Floor, Toronto ON M5V 3J7, Canada |
R. Browning Watt | 78 De Vere Gardens, Toronto ON M5M 3E9, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5S 2C6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
The Royal Canadian Electrical and Mechanical Engineers Heritage and Museum Foundation | 1756 Windflower Way, Ottawa, ON K1C 5Y5 | 2018-05-09 |
Ontario Steam Heritage Museum | 7192 Gore Road, Puslinch, ON N0B 2J0 | |
Photographic Museum of Ontario | 465 Wilson Avenue, Suite 301, Toronto, ON M3H 1T9 | 2009-01-08 |
Eastern Ontario Biodiversity Museum | 215 Saunders St, 2nd Floor P.o. Box: 1860, Kemptville, ON K0G 1J0 | 1998-05-28 |
Audain Art Museum Foundation | 2900-550 Burrard Street, Vancouver, BC V6A 0A3 | 2013-11-04 |
Museum, Équipement Pour ModÉlisme Inc. | 4375 Rue Beaubien, Quebec, QC G2A 3Z2 | 2004-04-29 |
The Military Communications and Electronics Museum Foundation | 95 Craftsman Blvd, Kingston, ON K7K 7B4 | 1985-06-25 |
Chinese Culture Overseas Museum Foundation | 2738 158 St, Unit 51, Surrey, BC V3Z 3K3 | 2017-04-16 |
The State Hermitage Museum Foundation of Canada | 900 Greenbank Road, Suite 616, Ottawa, ON K2J 4P6 | 1997-08-28 |
Fondation MusÉe Bytown Museum Foundation | 1 Canal Lane, P O Box 523, Station B, Ottawa, ON K1P 5P6 | 2012-03-16 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on The Royal Ontario Museum Foundation.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.