Chambre de commerce de Ville DГ©gelis (Corporation# 8869) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is April 9, 1959.
Corporation ID | 8869 |
Corporation Name | Chambre de commerce de Ville DГ©gelis |
Registered Office Address |
352 3e Avenue Ste Rose Du Degelis QC G0L 1H0 |
Incorporation Date | 1959-04-09 |
Dissolution Date | 2011-02-10 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 13 - 13 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
YVON C. DUMONT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MONIQUE OUELLET | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
SYLVAIN THERIAULT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MARTIN RAYMOND | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
DENIS PARENT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
ALAIN THERIAULT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
CHANTAL DAMBOISE | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
EDITH GRONDIN | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MARC-A. DE LAUNIERE | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
EMILIEN BEAULIEU | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MAURICE PEDNAULT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
RAYMOND PERRON | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
PIERRE MORIN | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1959-04-09 | current |
Boards of Trade Act - Part I (BOTA - Part I) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie I (LCH - Partie I) |
Act | 1959-04-08 | 1959-04-09 |
Boards of Trade Act - Part I (BOTA - Part I) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie I (LCH - Partie I) |
Address | 1959-04-09 | current | 352 3e Avenue, Ste Rose Du Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 |
Name | 1994-02-04 | current | Chambre de commerce de Ville DГ©gelis |
Name | 1959-04-09 | 1994-02-04 | LA CHAMBRE DE COMMERCE SENIOR DE STE-ROSE-DU-DEGELE |
Status | 2011-02-10 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1959-04-09 | 2011-02-10 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Dissolution | |
1959-04-09 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1997 | 1992-05-25 | |
1996 | 1992-05-25 |
Address | 352 3E AVENUE |
City | STE ROSE DU DEGELIS |
Province | QC |
Postal Code | G0L 1H0 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Encadrement New Art Framing Inc. | 8 Industriel, Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1995-09-19 |
3153177 Canada Inc. | 50 Rue Industrielle, Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1995-06-05 |
2966191 Canada Inc. | 465-b Avenue Principale, Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1993-10-25 |
CroisiÈres TÉmiwaska Inc. | 210 Route 295, C P 580, Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1992-11-20 |
P.m.p. Plastics Inc. | 1208 Route 185 Sud, Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1989-11-15 |
Lingerie Jean-guy Lachance Inc. | 465-b Rue Principale, Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1984-12-12 |
Chantiers Temis Ltee | Rang Turcotte, Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1984-05-09 |
Degelis Construction Inc. | 807 7e Rue, Degelis, Cte Temiscouata, QC G0L 1H0 | 1983-08-30 |
Les Entreprises De Liquidation Degelis Inc. | 325 Garre Beaulieu, Degelis Cte Temiscouata, QC G0L 1H0 | 1983-06-03 |
Garage Gauthier Landry Et Fils Inc. | 1207 Rte Transcanadienne, Ville Degelis, QC G0L 1H0 | 1983-04-26 |
Find all corporations in postal code G0L1H0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
YVON C. DUMONT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MONIQUE OUELLET | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
SYLVAIN THERIAULT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MARTIN RAYMOND | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
DENIS PARENT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
ALAIN THERIAULT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
CHANTAL DAMBOISE | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
EDITH GRONDIN | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MARC-A. DE LAUNIERE | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
EMILIEN BEAULIEU | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
MAURICE PEDNAULT | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
RAYMOND PERRON | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
PIERRE MORIN | 353 3E AVE., STE ROSE DU DEGELIS QC G0L 1H0, Canada |
City | STE ROSE DU DEGELIS |
Post Code | G0L1H0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Chamber of Marine Commerce | 300 Sparks Street, Suite 340, Place De Ville, Podium Building, Ottawa, ON K1R 7S3 | 1959-11-02 |
Chamber of Commerce of The Town Gatineau | Noaddressline, Nocity, QC | 1956-07-24 |
Chambre De Commerce Du TГ©miscouata | 201-3 Rue De L'hotel-de-ville, Temiscouata-sur-le-lac, QC G0L 1X0 | 1983-03-11 |
Chambre De Commerce TГ©mis-accord | 7-b Rue Des Oblats Nord, Ville-marie, QC J9V 1H9 | 1971-03-24 |
Chambre De Commerce Ville Les Saules | 1661 Carre Ader, Ville Les Saules, QC | 1966-03-23 |
Chambre De Commerce De Ville Saint-michel | 44 Boul D'argenson, Repentigny, QC J6A 3W4 | 1950-03-20 |
Chambre De Commerce De Ville St-remi | 17 Rue Prud'homme, Ville St-remi, QC | 1963-08-12 |
Chambre De Commerce Et D'industrie Royal-roussillon | 1068 Rue Union, Ville Ste-catherine, QC J5C 1B3 | 2006-10-30 |
Chambre De Commerce De Ville D'anjou | 500 Place D'armes, Bur. 3030, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1986-12-11 |
The Chamber of Commerce Town of Mont Royal | 4480 Cote De Liesse, Suite 110, Mont Royal, QC H4N 2R1 | 1990-11-02 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Chambre de commerce de Ville DГ©gelis.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.