MCF MULTI CULTURE FOODS INC. (Corporation# 8675767) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is October 28, 2013.
Corporation ID | 8675767 |
Business Number | 833024839 |
Corporation Name | MCF MULTI CULTURE FOODS INC. |
Registered Office Address |
114 Franmore Circl Vaughan ON L4J 3C1 |
Incorporation Date | 2013-10-28 |
Dissolution Date | 2016-08-27 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
ALIAKBAR SABBAGHALVANI | 114 FRANMORE CIRCLE, VAUGHAN ON L4J 3C1, Canada |
GHULAM REZA REZAPOOR | 45 MANCINI CRES, RICHMOND HILL ON L4E 0T1, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2013-10-28 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2013-10-28 | current | 114 Franmore Circl, Vaughan, ON L4J 3C1 |
Name | 2013-10-28 | current | MCF MULTI CULTURE FOODS INC. |
Status | 2016-08-27 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2016-03-30 | 2016-08-27 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2013-10-28 | 2016-03-30 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2016-08-27 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2013-10-28 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Tous On Bay Inc. | 114 Franmore Cir, Vaughan, ON L4J 3C1 | 2013-10-31 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Bhr Solutions Incorporated | 1110 - 15 North Park Road, Vaughan, ON L4J 0A1 | 2020-08-15 |
Streamline Investment Consulting and Mitigation Services Inc. | 15 North Park Rd., 815, Thornhill, ON L4J 0A1 | 2020-07-29 |
Uft Can. Inc. | 1603-15 North Park Road, Vaughan, ON L4J 0A1 | 2019-08-11 |
Dmme Inc. | 1512-7 North Park Road, Vaughan, ON L4J 0A1 | 2019-06-21 |
11238035 Canada Inc. | Ph6-15 North Park Rd., Thornhill, ON L4J 0A1 | 2019-02-06 |
10972169 Canada Ltd. | 401 - 15 North Park Rd, Thornhill, On L4j 0a1, Thornhill, ON L4J 0A1 | 2018-08-31 |
10224804 Canada Inc. | 15 North Park Rd, Thornhill, ON L4J 0A1 | 2017-05-07 |
8983895 Canada Inc. | 701-15 North Park Rd., Thornhill, ON L4J 0A1 | 2014-08-10 |
Restoration 1 York Inc. | 15 North Park Road Apt 1612, Thornhill, ON L4J 0A1 | 2013-01-14 |
In Hauss Ltd. | 15 North Park Rd 1409, Thornhill, ON L4J 0A1 | 2011-09-27 |
Find all corporations in postal code L4J |
Name | Address |
---|---|
ALIAKBAR SABBAGHALVANI | 114 FRANMORE CIRCLE, VAUGHAN ON L4J 3C1, Canada |
GHULAM REZA REZAPOOR | 45 MANCINI CRES, RICHMOND HILL ON L4E 0T1, Canada |
City | VAUGHAN |
Post Code | L4J 3C1 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Multi-nature Foods Inc. | 4310 Dobrin, St-laurent, QC H4R 2L6 | 2004-11-01 |
Multi-culture Media Group Ltd. | 616-1700 Finch Ave. E, Toronto, ON M2J 4X8 | 2016-01-27 |
Multi Culture Innovation Inc. | 7805 Bayview Avenue, Suite 604, Thornhill, ON L3T 7N1 | 2017-06-07 |
Access Multi-culture Informtion Consulting Inc. | 7400 Sherbrooke West.app712, Montreal, QC H4B 1R8 | 2002-12-11 |
Les Multi-produits Mpi Inc. | 5250 Ferrier, Suite 814, Montreal, QC H4P 2N7 | 1977-09-14 |
Multi Displays J.b. Ltd. | 1273 Island, Montreal, QC H3K 2N4 | 1979-02-19 |
L'energie Multi R.h.h. Internationale Inc. | 9 Anwoth Road, Westmount, QC H3Y 2E6 | 1987-07-21 |
Multi-draft Systems Ltd. | 79 Rue Goupil, Vimont, QC H7K 1K8 | 1990-02-14 |
Multi-brick (quebec) Inc. | 950 Rue Godin, Laprairie, QC J5R 4X2 | 1989-09-20 |
C.d.d.e.m. Multi-products Inc. | 5041 Rue Ontario Est, Montreal, QC H1V 2M8 | 1996-03-04 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on MCF MULTI CULTURE FOODS INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.