SWITCHPIC Inc. (Corporation# 8674957) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is October 26, 2013.
Corporation ID | 8674957 |
Business Number | 833636434 |
Corporation Name | SWITCHPIC Inc. |
Registered Office Address |
337 Dalewood Drive Oakville ON L6J 4P4 |
Incorporation Date | 2013-10-26 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-10-25 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Daniel Bartek | 45 Lisgar St, Toronto ON M6J 0B8, Canada |
Suneet Lawrence Saldanha | 5013 Heritage Hills Boulevard, Mississauga ON L5R 1V6, Canada |
Cameron McDonald | 337 Dalewood Drive, Oakville ON L6J 4P4, Canada |
Nathan Lapierre | 18 Redmond Rd, Head Chezzetcook NS B0J 1N0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2013-10-26 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2015-08-31 | current | 337 Dalewood Drive, Oakville, ON L6J 4P4 |
Address | 2013-10-26 | 2015-08-31 | 337 Dalewood Drive, Ontario, ON L6J 4P4 |
Name | 2013-10-26 | current | SWITCHPIC Inc. |
Status | 2015-10-25 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2013-10-26 | 2015-10-25 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-10-25 | Dissolution | Section: 210(3) |
2013-10-26 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2014 | 2014-02-27 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Blazer Business and Marketing Strategy Inc. | 325 Dalewood Dr, Oakville, ON L6J 4P4 | 2013-01-23 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Symack Capital Management (canada) Corporation | 115 George St., Suite 140, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-06-01 |
Value Bullion Inc. | 1515-115 George Street, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-05-18 |
Salesmonster Inc. | 616-115 George St, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-04-29 |
11828738 Canada Ltd. | 409 - 115 George Street, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-01-07 |
Redcup Inc. | 115 George Street, Suite 624, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2016-07-20 |
Luhvee Books Inc. | 115 George Street Suite 515, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2016-02-18 |
Drafting Star Incorporated | 115 George Street, Unit 139, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2016-01-19 |
Tettro Inc. | 108-115 George St, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2015-11-09 |
Canadian Croatian Choral Society | 115 George Street, Suite 631, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2015-03-06 |
8904502 Canada Inc. | Pmb117-115 George Street Pmb117, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2014-05-30 |
Find all corporations in postal code L6J |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Daniel Bartek | 45 Lisgar St, Toronto ON M6J 0B8, Canada |
Suneet Lawrence Saldanha | 5013 Heritage Hills Boulevard, Mississauga ON L5R 1V6, Canada |
Cameron McDonald | 337 Dalewood Drive, Oakville ON L6J 4P4, Canada |
Nathan Lapierre | 18 Redmond Rd, Head Chezzetcook NS B0J 1N0, Canada |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on SWITCHPIC Inc..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.