Tundra Bikes LTD. (Corporation# 8212970) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is June 8, 2012.
Corporation ID | 8212970 |
Business Number | 808475487 |
Corporation Name | Tundra Bikes LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
2473 Kalla Lane Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0 |
Incorporation Date | 2012-06-08 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-06-19 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Franco Sheatiapik Buscemi | 2473 Kalla Lane, Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2012-06-08 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2012-06-08 | current | 2473 Kalla Lane, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 |
Name | 2012-06-08 | current | Tundra Bikes LTD. |
Status | 2015-06-19 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-11-19 | 2015-06-19 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2012-06-08 | 2014-11-19 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2012-06-08 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Tccc Transformationalcall Inc. | Paunna Road, P. O. Box 11341, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-12-08 |
Bright Nest Inc. | 1419 Sikituuq Court, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-11-30 |
12436027 Canada Inc. | House 2437 Kalla Lane, Box 764, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-10-21 |
Eaglesvale Ventures Corporation | 5065c Unit 7, 11088 Postal Avenue, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-10-10 |
Innov'consulting.ga Inc. | 204-4104 Road To Nowhere, Box 2044, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-09-19 |
Sedna's Lair Gaf Inc. | 320 Creekside Village, Box 2408, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-09-16 |
Hud Consulting Corp. | 917 Nunavut Drive, Apt 2, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-09-12 |
Nunavut Real Estate Corporation | 1831 Kakivak Court, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-08-23 |
Nunavut Resources Konsulting Inc. | 2673 Ukaliq Street, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-08-05 |
Dr. Olivia Shen Medical Professional Corporation | 516 Station Road, Iqaluit, NU X0A 0H0 | 2020-08-02 |
Find all corporations in postal code X0A 0H0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Franco Sheatiapik Buscemi | 2473 Kalla Lane, Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0, Canada |
City | Iqaluit |
Post Code | X0A 0H0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Productions Television Tundra One Inc. | 22 St-clair Street East, Toronto, ON M4T 2S3 | 1985-07-31 |
Yum Choice Inc. | 27 Tundra Swan, Brampton, ON L6R 3L9 | 2007-07-07 |
Bpm Bikes Ltd. | #5-8466 Midtown Way, Chilliwack, BC V2P 6T4 | 2019-12-08 |
Belmonte Bikes Ltd. | 4 Upwood St., Ottawa, ON K1T 3Y6 | 2016-09-19 |
Wulf Bikes Inc. | 39 De La Brise, Hull, QC J9A 3C4 | 2001-09-10 |
Simtra Bikes Inc. | 112 De La Tire, Gatineau, QC J8V 4E2 | 2003-11-12 |
Tundra North Tours Ltd. | 28 Raven St., Inuvik, NT X0E 0T0 | 2015-05-22 |
11180371 Canada Corp. | 132 Tundra Rd, Caledon, ON L7C 4A6 | 2019-01-06 |
10851108 Canada Inc. | 25 Tundra Swan Rd, Brampton, ON L6R 3L9 | 2018-06-20 |
Tundra Swan Inc. | 33 Westholme Avenue, Toronto, ON M6P 3B9 | 1999-11-09 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Tundra Bikes LTD..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.