Francis Knowledge Share Inc. (Corporation# 8042934) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is December 1, 2011.
Corporation ID | 8042934 |
Business Number | 842712309 |
Corporation Name | Francis Knowledge Share Inc. |
Registered Office Address |
1186 Kestell Blvd. Oakville ON L6H 7M7 |
Incorporation Date | 2011-12-01 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Thomas Francis | 1186 Kestell Blvd., Oakville ON L6H 7M7, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2011-12-01 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2011-12-01 | current | 1186 Kestell Blvd., Oakville, ON L6H 7M7 |
Name | 2011-12-01 | current | Francis Knowledge Share Inc. |
Status | 2014-06-07 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2014-05-23 | 2014-06-07 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2011-12-01 | 2014-05-23 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2019 | 2019-12-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2018 | 2018-12-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2017 | 2017-12-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Bcits Canada Inc. | 1181 Milna Drive, Oakville, ON L6H 7M7 | 2018-11-14 |
Tell Me Travels Ltd. | 1173 Kestell Blvd, Oakville, ON L6H 7M7 | 2015-10-26 |
8330034 Canada Incorporated | 2276 Nena Crescent, Oakville, ON L6H 7M7 | 2012-10-19 |
Bestroute Consulting Incorporated | 2297 Nena Crescent, Oakville, ON L6H 7M7 | 2005-08-18 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Alfajrulbassem | 2509 Eighth Line, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2020-11-04 |
Gold Auto Sales Inc. | 2480 Chaplin Road, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2020-05-17 |
Royal Crown Landscaping & Renovations Inc. | 2493 Eighth Line, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2019-08-08 |
10241725 Canada Inc. | 2493,8th Line, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2017-05-18 |
9961186 Canada Inc. | 2493 Eight Line, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2016-10-27 |
C&c Bond Education and Training Consulting Ltd. | 2492 Chaplin Rd, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2016-10-06 |
Ncih Theatrical Productions Inc. | 2481 Eighth Line, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2016-08-30 |
Junke Financial Inc. | 2521 Eighth Line, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2015-11-20 |
1-844-colours Inc. | 2484 Chaplin Road, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2014-03-17 |
6981411 Canada Inc. | 2501 Eighth Line, Oakville, ON L6H 0A4 | 2008-05-23 |
Find all corporations in postal code L6H |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Thomas Francis | 1186 Kestell Blvd., Oakville ON L6H 7M7, Canada |
City | Oakville |
Post Code | L6H 7M7 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Vks Visual Knowledge Share Ltd. | 1241 Rue Des Cascades, ChГўteauguay, QC J6J 4Z2 | 2013-04-11 |
H.l. Share Management Inc. | 2700 Boul. De La CГ”te-vertu, #208, Saint-laurent, QC H4R 3G6 | 1978-07-28 |
B-share-it Holdings Inc. | 12 Radisson Street, Dollard-des-ormeaux, QC H9A 3K6 | 2013-10-31 |
SystГ€mes Zero-knowledge Inc. | 1501 Mcgill College, 26th Floor, Montreal, QC H3A 3N9 | 1997-07-03 |
Industries Share Inc. | 14 Colchester, Hampstead, QC H3X 3V9 | 1988-12-09 |
Corporation MiniГ€re Golden Share | 349, Rue De Contrecoeur, Montreal, QC H1L 3Y4 | 2007-08-07 |
Northbridge Share Option 1 Corp. | 105 Adelaide Street West, Suite 700, Toronto, ON M5H 1P9 | |
Immeubles St.francis Limitee | 21 St. Clair Ave East, Suite 1200, Toronto, QC M4T 1L9 | 1946-08-09 |
Greg Francis & AssociÉs Inc. | 4500 Promenade Paton, Suite 1106, Laval, QC H7W 4Y6 | 1989-09-26 |
Friends of St-francis of Assisi School Foundation | 163 Cleghorn, St-lambert, QC J4R 2J4 | 1995-05-05 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Francis Knowledge Share Inc..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.