Sole Responsibility (Corporation# 7936346) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 25, 2011.
Corporation ID | 7936346 |
Business Number | 842712705 |
Corporation Name | Sole Responsibility |
Registered Office Address |
181 Hinton Ave. N Ottawa ON K1Y 1A2 |
Incorporation Date | 2011-11-25 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
NELL VAN WALSUM | 11 Rue Butternut, Gatineau QC J9H 6M4, Canada |
GEORDIE MCCONNELL | 181 HINTON AVENUE, OTTAWA ON K1Y 1A2, Canada |
TRINA HARPER | 2173 Iris St, Ottawa ON K2C 1B5, Canada |
PIERRE MANDEVILLE | 110 Faraday St., Ottawa ON K1Y 3M4, Canada |
ALISON JANE WESLEY-JAMES | 254 ALVIN ROAD, OTTAWA ON K1K 4T2, Canada |
CATHIE WOOD | 132 Caroline Ave, Ottawa ON K1Y 0S9, Canada |
MIKE DAVIS | 1456 Meadow Dr., Greely ON K4P 1B1, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2011-11-25 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Address | 2016-05-03 | current | 181 Hinton Ave. N, Ottawa, ON K1Y 1A2 |
Address | 2012-08-09 | 2016-05-03 | 254 Alvin Road, Ottawa, ON K1K 4T2 |
Address | 2011-11-25 | 2012-08-09 | 13 Kilbarry Crescent, Ottawa, ON K1K 0G9 |
Name | 2011-11-25 | current | Sole Responsibility |
Status | 2011-11-25 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2017-11-02 | Amendment / Modification | Section: 201 |
2011-11-25 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2019 | 2019-12-08 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2018-12-02 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2017 | 2017-05-14 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Ottawa Fit Ltd. | 181 Hinton Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1Y 1A2 | 2013-03-11 |
Rhetorica Inc. | 185 Hinton Avenue North, Ottawa, ON K1Y 1A2 | 2003-09-26 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Partners In Access Inc. | 209 Island Park Dr, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A3 | 2008-01-09 |
6757880 Canada Ltd. | 246 Island Park Drive, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A4 | 2007-04-20 |
Webster Equestrian Ventures Inc. | 242 Island Park Drive, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A4 | 1996-12-10 |
10336742 Canada Corporation | 263 Island Park Drive, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A5 | 2017-07-25 |
Viroflow Technologies Inc. | 257 Island Park Drive, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A5 | 2016-05-03 |
Utu Consultants Inc. | 249 Island Park Drive, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A5 | 2010-10-06 |
7026552 Canada Inc. | 227 Island Park Drive, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A5 | 2008-08-13 |
Borovay Health Facility Ltd. | 239 Island Park Dr, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A5 | 1996-04-09 |
11304534 Canada Inc. | 331 Islan D Park Drive, Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A6 | 2019-03-18 |
Kevin Hayes Financial Services Inc. | 345 Island Park Dr., Ottawa, ON K1Y 0A6 | 2002-01-16 |
Find all corporations in postal code K1Y |
Name | Address |
---|---|
NELL VAN WALSUM | 11 Rue Butternut, Gatineau QC J9H 6M4, Canada |
GEORDIE MCCONNELL | 181 HINTON AVENUE, OTTAWA ON K1Y 1A2, Canada |
TRINA HARPER | 2173 Iris St, Ottawa ON K2C 1B5, Canada |
PIERRE MANDEVILLE | 110 Faraday St., Ottawa ON K1Y 3M4, Canada |
ALISON JANE WESLEY-JAMES | 254 ALVIN ROAD, OTTAWA ON K1K 4T2, Canada |
CATHIE WOOD | 132 Caroline Ave, Ottawa ON K1Y 0S9, Canada |
MIKE DAVIS | 1456 Meadow Dr., Greely ON K4P 1B1, Canada |
City | Ottawa |
Post Code | K1Y 1A2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
O Sole Mio Import and Export Ltd. | 111 Devon Rd, Baie D'urfe, QC | 1975-08-13 |
Jeffrey Sole Realties Inc. | 150 Jarry Street East, Montreal, QC H2P 1T3 | 2012-07-19 |
Corporate Responsibility Strategies Inc. | 700 Durie Street, Toronto, ON M6S 3H3 | 2007-05-17 |
Corporate Sustainability and Responsibility Canada | 101-7915 112 Avenue Nw, Edmonton, AB T5B 0E7 | 2015-07-01 |
Csr: Corporations Sharing Responsibility | 26 Wellington St. East, Suite 601, Toronto, ON M5E 1S2 | 2000-10-16 |
Corporate People Responsibility (cpr) Limited | Road 31e, Lot 73134, Box 142, Garson, MB R0E 0R0 | 2010-05-04 |
Social Responsibility for Startups Corp. | 290 King Street East, Kitchener, ON N2H 2V5 | 2020-02-08 |
Sole Marketing Inc. | 423-3390 Keele St., Toronto, ON M3J 1L6 | 2014-08-20 |
Revive Corporate Social Responsibility Solutions Inc. | 600 - 600 Gordon Baker Road, Markham, ON M2H 3B4 | 2010-01-20 |
International Network for Corporate Responsibility Inc. | 60 Portage Road, Box 426, North West River, NL A0P 1M0 | 2006-06-06 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Sole Responsibility.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.