LA MINOTERIE DES CANTONS LTEE (Corporation# 784028) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is December 1, 1978.
Corporation ID | 784028 |
Corporation Name | LA MINOTERIE DES CANTONS LTEE |
Registered Office Address |
Sutton Sutton QC J0E 2K0 |
Incorporation Date | 1978-12-01 |
Dissolution Date | 1985-08-31 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 15 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
LORNE M. GOLDMAN | 355 ST JAMES ST, EAST SUITE 503, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1978-12-01 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1978-11-30 | 1978-12-01 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1978-12-01 | current | Sutton, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 |
Name | 1979-10-31 | current | LA MINOTERIE DES CANTONS LTEE |
Name | 1978-12-01 | 1979-10-31 | QUEBARET INC. |
Status | 1985-08-31 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1983-06-03 | 1985-08-31 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1978-12-01 | 1983-06-03 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1985-08-31 | Dissolution | |
1978-12-01 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Entreprises Pelchat MoГЏse Inc. | Sutton, Quebec, QC J0E 2K0 | 1998-08-28 |
106721 Canada Inc. | Sutton, Sutton, QC | 1981-05-11 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Club Vacances Nord-sud Inc. | 110 Chemin Thibodeau, C P 938, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1997-06-02 |
Sammiches Inc. | 570 Draper Hill, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1996-10-18 |
3265315 Canada Inc. | 2612 Mont Echo Rd, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1996-05-31 |
Bresee Equipments Inc. | 322 Chemin Woodard, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1994-01-21 |
2948028 Canada Inc. | 452 Schweitzer, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1993-08-24 |
Jean-marie ChoiniГ€re Enterprises Inc. | 600 Mudgett, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1993-07-23 |
Tutti Calyx Inc. | 381-a Route 139 Nord, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1993-06-11 |
Arnold Raymond's Sugarbush & Museum Inc. | 1570 Scenic Road, Rr #2, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1993-04-30 |
Fred Korn International Marketing (1992) Inc. | 4 Quatre Vents St, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1992-11-23 |
Ambros Scientifique Inc. | 374 North Sutton Rd, Sutton, QC J0E 2K0 | 1992-11-19 |
Find all corporations in postal code J0E2K0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
LORNE M. GOLDMAN | 355 ST JAMES ST, EAST SUITE 503, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
City | SUTTON |
Post Code | J0E2K0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Laminage Des Cantons (1979) Ltee | 90 Rue Principale, Granby, QC | 1979-02-05 |
Renovation V.r.c. Des Cantons Ltee | 135 Rue Marquis, St-celestin, QC J0C 1G0 | 1978-02-27 |
Les Entreprises Industrielles Mecaniques Et Maintenance Des Cantons De L'est Ltee | Rr 1, Bromptonville, QC J0B 1H0 | 1977-02-25 |
Eurethane Cantons De L'est Ltee. | P.o.box 90, Georgeville, QC J0B 1T0 | 1973-03-21 |
Century 21: Les Immeubles Des Cantons De L'est Ltee | 1050 Rue Principale, Granby, QC J2G 8C8 | 1979-01-10 |
Jeans Des Cantons Ltee | 4361 Rue Martin, C.p. 1949, Rock Forest, QC J1N 1C4 | 1982-02-09 |
Canton Farms Ltd. | 1000-1255 Rue Peel, Montreal, QC H3B 2T9 | 1980-07-31 |
Girlbundance Inc. | 151 Minoterie Ridge, Ottawa, ON K4A 3N6 | 2019-12-05 |
3875890 Canada Inc. | 145 Cote De La Minoterie, Orleans, ON K4A 0Y5 | 2001-03-20 |
Zuhir Self Development Center Inc. | 127 Minoterie Ridge, Ottawa, ON K4A 0Y5 | 2020-08-14 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LA MINOTERIE DES CANTONS LTEE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.