LA CIE DE GESTION DERO LTEE (Corporation# 75345) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 14, 1979.
Corporation ID | 75345 |
Business Number | 102919537 |
Corporation Name | LA CIE DE GESTION DERO LTEE |
Registered Office Address |
9256 Rue Boivin Lasalle QC H8R 2E7 |
Incorporation Date | 1979-11-14 |
Dissolution Date | 2000-03-13 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
DENIS VIGEANT | 1517 RUE PERRAS, VILLE LASALLE QC , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1979-11-14 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1979-11-13 | 1979-11-14 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1979-11-14 | current | 9256 Rue Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 |
Name | 1979-11-14 | current | LA CIE DE GESTION DERO LTEE |
Status | 2000-03-13 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1997-03-01 | 2000-03-13 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1979-11-14 | 1997-03-01 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2000-03-13 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
1979-11-14 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1994 | 1993-02-05 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Instruments Pitanco (1978) Ltee | 9256 Rue Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1978-08-28 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
173264 Canada Inc. | 9216 Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1990-04-12 |
La Revue De L'outaouais Inc. | 9216 Rue Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1981-03-09 |
Alliages Internationaux Brazier Inc. | 9156 Rue Boivin, La Salle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1980-10-24 |
Cartran Ontario Inc. | 9198 Rue Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1978-12-28 |
Mediacan Circulation Management Ltd. | 9182 Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1978-09-18 |
177304 Canada Inc. | 9256 Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1975-10-20 |
Verdun Transport Inc. | 9198 Boivin Street, Ville Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1962-08-24 |
J.w. Sancton & Fils Ltee | 9216 Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1972-06-23 |
Les Entreprises Botoco Inc. | 9198 Boivin Street, Ville Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1976-03-31 |
L'hebdo De Laval Inc. | 9216 Rue Boivin, Lasalle, QC H8R 2E7 | 1983-03-11 |
Find all corporations in postal code H8R2E7 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
DENIS VIGEANT | 1517 RUE PERRAS, VILLE LASALLE QC , Canada |
City | LASALLE |
Post Code | H8R2E7 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Photo Dero Inc. | 369 Place Des Fleurs, Dollard Des Ormeaux, QC H9G 1T3 | 1984-04-10 |
Chris Dero Media Inc. | 69 Vincennes, Pointe-claire, QC H9R 4M1 | 2004-01-08 |
Transric Management Inc. | 20 Dero, Terrebonne, QC J6Y 1L5 | 1997-07-15 |
3620298 Canada Inc. | 20 Dero, Terrebonne, QC J6Y 1L5 | 1999-06-01 |
Dero Entertainment Limited | 151 Sparks St, Ottawa, QC | 1971-03-19 |
Dero's Buds Corporation Inc | 252 William, Hawkesbury, ON K6A 1X1 | 2019-10-07 |
Les Moteurs Dero Inc. | 559 Louisanne, C.p. 784, Rimouski, QC G5L 7C9 | 1979-05-11 |
Service Technique Dero Inc. | 2366, De Montsegur, Chomedey, Laval, QC H7T 2V5 | 1985-05-28 |
Dero Futbol Inc. | 51 Trailridge Crescent, Suite 1610, Scarborough, ON M1E 4S9 | 2010-03-02 |
Centre De Services Dero Inc. | 1565 Cardinal, Dorval, QC H9P 1Y3 | 1983-03-23 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LA CIE DE GESTION DERO LTEE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.