87113 CANADA LTD. (Corporation# 711250) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is June 2, 1978.
Corporation ID | 711250 |
Corporation Name | 87113 CANADA LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
511 Place D'armes Penthouse Montreal QC H2Y 2W7 |
Incorporation Date | 1978-06-02 |
Dissolution Date | 1982-10-15 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 6 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
ANTONIO RANDACCIO | 511 PLACE D'ARMES 9TH FLOOR, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
DIANE CAPUCCILLI | 339 RUE LOUISE, LONGUEUIL QC , Canada |
FLEURETTE GIBEAU | 1015 RUE VERCHERES, ST BRUNO QC , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1978-06-02 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1978-06-01 | 1978-06-02 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1978-06-02 | current | 511 Place D'armes, Penthouse, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 |
Name | 1978-06-02 | current | 87113 CANADA LTD. |
Status | 1982-10-15 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1978-06-02 | 1982-10-15 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1982-10-15 | Dissolution | |
1978-06-02 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
La Compagnie De Caoutchouc Servaas, Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 400, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1979-08-17 |
Dessins Allegra Limitee | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 201, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1979-09-20 |
Jureka Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1980-01-08 |
Spri Ltee/ltd. | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 600, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1977-11-14 |
2852586 Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Bureau 100, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1992-09-16 |
3284247 Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 201, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1996-08-06 |
3292541 Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Bureau 100, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1996-09-05 |
Canado-american Environmental Research Society Inc | 511 Place D'armes, Bureau 400, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1997-01-24 |
3390021 Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Bureau 100, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1997-07-07 |
3477487 Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Bureau 400, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1998-04-08 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Begin, Marceau, Morin Gestion Privee Inc. | 511 Paace D'armes, Bur 400, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1998-04-28 |
2845687 Canada Inc. | 7141 De La Deviniere, Suite 204, Anjou, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1992-08-20 |
Eurofours Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 300, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1991-03-06 |
Importation/exportation Viktor Sabo Inc. | 511 Pl D'armes, Suite 200, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1991-02-07 |
3488098 Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Bureau 303, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1998-05-20 |
Societe De Gestion John F. Clark Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 400, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1979-11-01 |
132779 Canada Inc. | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 600, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1980-01-10 |
Deric Technological Innovations Ltd. | 511 Place D'armes, Suite 600, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1970-07-06 |
Apexim Holdings Inc. | 511 Pl D'armes, Suite 400, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1980-05-02 |
Robson Marketing Inc. | 511 Pl D'armes, Suite 200, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W7 | 1978-11-28 |
Find all corporations in postal code H2Y2W7 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
ANTONIO RANDACCIO | 511 PLACE D'ARMES 9TH FLOOR, MONTREAL QC , Canada |
DIANE CAPUCCILLI | 339 RUE LOUISE, LONGUEUIL QC , Canada |
FLEURETTE GIBEAU | 1015 RUE VERCHERES, ST BRUNO QC , Canada |
City | MONTREAL |
Post Code | H2Y2W7 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on 87113 CANADA LTD..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.