6740952 CANADA INC. (Corporation# 6740952) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is March 22, 2007.
Corporation ID | 6740952 |
Business Number | 857124986 |
Corporation Name | 6740952 CANADA INC. |
Registered Office Address |
540 Concession 9 Ste-anne De Prescott ON K0B 1M0 |
Incorporation Date | 2007-03-22 |
Dissolution Date | 2014-01-19 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
JEAN-FRANCOIS GAREAU | 540 CONCESSION 9, STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT ON K0B 1M0, Canada |
LOUIS BRUNET | 475 CONCESSION 9, STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT ON K0B 1M0, Canada |
JOANNE BRUNET | 475 CONCESSION 9, STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT ON K0B 1M0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2007-03-22 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2007-03-22 | current | 540 Concession 9, Ste-anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 |
Name | 2007-03-22 | current | 6740952 CANADA INC. |
Status | 2014-01-19 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2013-08-22 | 2014-01-19 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2011-06-13 | 2013-08-22 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2011-05-17 | 2011-06-13 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2007-03-22 | 2011-05-17 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-01-19 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2007-03-22 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2011 | 2011-06-06 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2010 | 2010-06-14 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2009 | 2009-06-15 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Address | 540 CONCESSION 9 |
City | STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT |
Province | ON |
Postal Code | K0B 1M0 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Nuhub International Inc. | 7650 Lalonde Martineau, Ste Anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2020-10-19 |
Concession Road Cultivation Inc. | 55 Concession Road 9, Ste-anne-de-prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2020-10-16 |
11494767 Canada Inc. | 7968 Arthur Lavigne Street, Ste-anne-de-prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2019-07-03 |
8584460 Canada Inc. | 1475 Petite Quatorze #89, Ste Anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2013-07-18 |
8045500 Canada Inc. | 70, Concession 9, Sainte-anne-de-prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2011-12-05 |
Compodigestco Inc. | 75, Concession Rd 9, Ste Anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2009-12-14 |
7088710 Canada Inc. | 701 County Road 18, Po Box 1, Sainte Anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2008-12-04 |
4441184 Canada Inc. | 160 County Road 18, St-anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2007-08-28 |
Gestion Morency Management Inc. | 7979 County Road 14, C.p. 64, Ste-anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2005-10-11 |
4261437 Canada Ltd. | 841 County Rd 18, P.o. Box:12, Ste-anne De Prescott, ON K0B 1M0 | 2004-09-27 |
Find all corporations in postal code K0B 1M0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
JEAN-FRANCOIS GAREAU | 540 CONCESSION 9, STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT ON K0B 1M0, Canada |
LOUIS BRUNET | 475 CONCESSION 9, STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT ON K0B 1M0, Canada |
JOANNE BRUNET | 475 CONCESSION 9, STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT ON K0B 1M0, Canada |
City | STE-ANNE DE PRESCOTT |
Post Code | K0B 1M0 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on 6740952 CANADA INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.