GROUPE T.F. LAC-AUX-SABLES INC. (Corporation# 671274) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 11, 1980.
Corporation ID | 671274 |
Business Number | 120291976 |
Corporation Name | GROUPE T.F. LAC-AUX-SABLES INC. |
Registered Office Address |
759 St-alphonse Lac-aux-sables QC G0X 1M0 |
Incorporation Date | 1980-07-11 |
Dissolution Date | 1997-06-13 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 30 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
JACQUES ST-AMANT | 750 ST-ALPHONSE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
MICHEL DEMERS | 165 DUPONT, NOTRE-DAME DE MONTAUBAN QC G0X 1W0, Canada |
C. CHAMPAGNE | 355 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
CLAUDE PRONOVOST | 157 5E AVENUE, GRAND'MERE QC G9T 2L8, Canada |
LEGER GRONDINES | NoAddressLine, NOTRE-DAME DE MONTAUBAN QC G0X 1W0, Canada |
SERGE BEAUPRE | 890 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
CHARLES BELANGER | 109 NOTRE-DAME, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
JACQUELIN BEAUPRE | 540 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
HAROLD BEDARD | 2141 ST-JOSEPH, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
JEAN LOUIS BELAND | 391 VILLENEUVE, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
DENIS PRONOVOST | 3870 MATTAWIN, ROUTE 155 QC G0X 2C0, Canada |
PAUL ST-AMANT | 353 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
YVES ST-AMANT | 94 DES PINS, LAC-AUX-SALES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
MAURICE BEAUPRE | 891 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SALES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
JACQUES RIVARD | 361 RUE PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SALES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
DOROTHEE PRONOVOST | 3870 MATTAWIN, ROUTE 155 QC G0X 2C0, Canada |
LUCIEN TOUSIGNANT | 881 RUE ST-JACQUES, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1980-07-11 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1980-07-10 | 1980-07-11 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1980-07-11 | current | 759 St-alphonse, Lac-aux-sables, QC G0X 1M0 |
Name | 1980-07-11 | current | GROUPE T.F. LAC-AUX-SABLES INC. |
Status | 1997-06-13 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1991-11-01 | 1997-06-13 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1980-07-11 | 1991-11-01 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1997-06-13 | Dissolution | |
1980-07-11 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1989 | 1988-09-02 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Address | 759 ST-ALPHONSE |
City | LAC-AUX-SABLES |
Province | QC |
Postal Code | G0X 1M0 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3238903 Canada Inc. | 800 Buisson, Lac Aux Sables, QC G0X 1M0 | 1996-03-12 |
Les Entreprises Jean Marc Provencher Inc. | 380 Rang Price, Lac-aux-sables, QC G0X 1M0 | 1984-10-02 |
Les Entreprises Denis Legare Inc. | 800 Rue Buisson, Lac Aux Sables, QC G0X 1M0 | 1983-04-08 |
Studio Hochelaga Inc. | 480 Rue Ste-marie, Lac Aux Sables, QC G0X 1M0 | 1982-01-27 |
Poste D'essence Lapointe Ltee | 560 Rue Saint-alphonse, Lac-aux-sables, QC G0X 1M0 | 1979-08-20 |
La Chambre De Commerce Lac-aux-sables | 135 Rue Bourassa, Lac-aux-sables, QC G0X 1M0 | 1967-11-30 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Memorial Publishing Company Ltd. | 120, 2e Rue, Batiscan, QC G0X 1A0 | 2018-07-23 |
Jab Produits RÉcrÉatifs Inc. | 911, Rue Principale, Bureau 21, Batiscan, QC G0X 1A0 | 2008-04-23 |
4298543 Canada Inc. | 911 Rue Principale, Bureau 21, Batiscan, QC G0X 1A0 | 2005-05-02 |
Picardie International LtГ©e. | 122, Route Picardie, Batiscan, QC G0X 1A0 | 2005-04-18 |
Domaine Charco De GruyГ€re Inc. | 54 Rue Julien, Batiscan, QC G0X 1A0 | 2004-05-14 |
Gestion G.m. Lachapelle Ltee | 74 Rue Julien, Batiscan, QC G0X 1A0 | 1978-03-31 |
Memorial Edition Canada Ltd. | 120, 2e Rue, Batiscan, QC G0X 1A0 | 2018-07-23 |
Km Translogistics Inc. | Nolka, Wolinak, Wolinak, QC G0X 1B0 | 2018-12-15 |
Nation Waban-aki Inc. | 10175 Rue Kolipaio, Wolinak, QC G0X 1B0 | 1980-07-24 |
Guiltant Inc. | 3635 Boul Port-royal, St-gregoire, Becancour, QC G0X 1B0 | 1979-02-07 |
Find all corporations in postal code G0X |
Name | Address |
---|---|
JACQUES ST-AMANT | 750 ST-ALPHONSE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
MICHEL DEMERS | 165 DUPONT, NOTRE-DAME DE MONTAUBAN QC G0X 1W0, Canada |
C. CHAMPAGNE | 355 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
CLAUDE PRONOVOST | 157 5E AVENUE, GRAND'MERE QC G9T 2L8, Canada |
LEGER GRONDINES | NoAddressLine, NOTRE-DAME DE MONTAUBAN QC G0X 1W0, Canada |
SERGE BEAUPRE | 890 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
CHARLES BELANGER | 109 NOTRE-DAME, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
JACQUELIN BEAUPRE | 540 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
HAROLD BEDARD | 2141 ST-JOSEPH, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
JEAN LOUIS BELAND | 391 VILLENEUVE, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
DENIS PRONOVOST | 3870 MATTAWIN, ROUTE 155 QC G0X 2C0, Canada |
PAUL ST-AMANT | 353 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SABLES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
YVES ST-AMANT | 94 DES PINS, LAC-AUX-SALES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
MAURICE BEAUPRE | 891 PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SALES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
JACQUES RIVARD | 361 RUE PRINCIPALE, LAC-AUX-SALES QC G0X 1M0, Canada |
DOROTHEE PRONOVOST | 3870 MATTAWIN, ROUTE 155 QC G0X 2C0, Canada |
LUCIEN TOUSIGNANT | 881 RUE ST-JACQUES, STE-THECLE QC G0X 3G0, Canada |
City | LAC-AUX-SABLES |
Post Code | G0X1M0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
La Chambre De Commerce Lac-aux-sables | 135 Rue Bourassa, Lac-aux-sables, QC G0X 1M0 | 1967-11-30 |
Skyadvise Ltd. | 205 Sables St. E, Massey, ON P0P 1P0 | 2020-11-18 |
Autobus S. RomprГ© LtГ©e | 765 St-charles, Lac-aux-sables, QC G0X 1M0 | |
6894585 Canada Inc. | 60 Rue Des Sables, Gatineau, QC J8P 7C8 | 2007-12-20 |
Les Peintures Finaltouch Inc. | 101, Rue Des Sables, Gatineau, QC J8P 7C7 | 2007-03-14 |
Inspection Thomtech Inc. | 104 B Rue Des Sables, Gatineau, QC J8P 7H7 | 2020-02-10 |
Concassés De La Rive-sud Inc. | 333 Chemin Des Sables, LÉvis, QC G6C 1B5 | 1980-11-26 |
Supplyweb Inc. | 2109 Des Sables, St-lazare, QC J7T 2C6 | 2002-03-06 |
Dehbia Krikeb M.d. Inc. | 10, MontГ© Des Sables, DГ©lГ©age, QC J9E 3A8 | 2018-09-24 |
Culture Country Inc. | 974, Imp. Des Sables, Granby, QC J2J 2X2 | 2009-06-19 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GROUPE T.F. LAC-AUX-SABLES INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.