Baking Blind Incorporated (Corporation# 6656251) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 13, 2006.
Corporation ID | 6656251 |
Business Number | 836654764 |
Corporation Name | Baking Blind Incorporated |
Registered Office Address |
65 Sloan Avenue Toronto ON M4A 2A6 |
Incorporation Date | 2006-11-13 |
Dissolution Date | 2009-09-17 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
PENNY F. NEVIN | 65 SLOAN AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4A 2A6, Canada |
MICHEL TUSS | 65 SLOAN AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4A 2A6, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2006-11-13 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2006-11-13 | current | 65 Sloan Avenue, Toronto, ON M4A 2A6 |
Name | 2006-11-13 | current | Baking Blind Incorporated |
Status | 2009-09-17 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2009-04-17 | 2009-09-17 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2006-11-13 | 2009-04-17 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2009-09-17 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2006-11-13 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Vertuanim Inc. | 65, Sloane Avenue, Toronto, ON M4A 2A6 | 2017-03-24 |
Nettrius Solutions Inc. | 65 Sloane Avenue, Toronto, ON M4A 2A6 | 2004-08-06 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Ags Painters Inc. | 2-1776 O'connor Dr, Suite 315, Toronto, ON M4A 0A1 | 2008-01-04 |
Einzay Ventures Inc. | 17 Collip Place, North York, ON M4A 0A3 | 2019-10-02 |
Righteous Ends Inc. | 7 Collip Pl, North York, ON M4A 0A3 | 2016-04-18 |
Ruble Jewellery & Watch Inc. | 23a Hobson Avenue, Toronto, ON M4A 0A3 | 2011-07-13 |
Terrestrial Trading Company Ltd. | 7 Collip Pl, North York, ON M4A 0A3 | 2016-08-09 |
12399903 Canada Inc. | 25a Hobson Ave, North York, ON M4A 0A4 | 2020-10-07 |
H. Hashi Holdings Inc. | 39 Wakunda Place, Toronto, ON M4A 1A1 | 2010-08-15 |
Cadetrip Incorporated | 702-5 Wakunda, Toronto, ON M4A 1A2 | 2011-11-17 |
12365260 Canada Inc. | 8-30 Wakunda Place, Toronto, ON M4A 1A3 | 2020-09-24 |
10600334 Canada Inc. | 3-20 Wakunda Place, Toronto, ON M4A 1A3 | 2018-01-25 |
Find all corporations in postal code M4A |
Name | Address |
---|---|
PENNY F. NEVIN | 65 SLOAN AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4A 2A6, Canada |
MICHEL TUSS | 65 SLOAN AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4A 2A6, Canada |
City | Toronto |
Post Code | M4A 2A6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Totally Squared Baking Incorporated | 30 Lloydalex Crescent, Ottawa, ON K2S 2E7 | 2013-05-01 |
Risktender Risk Reporting Systems Inc. | 2492 Blind Bay Road, Blind Bay, BC V0E 1H1 | 2012-05-01 |
Copper Island Inspection Inc. | 2628 Blind Bay Rd, Blind Bay, BC V0E 1H1 | 2012-01-04 |
The Allied Trades of The Baking Industry Canada, Incorporated | 107 Mill Rd,markland Woods, Etobicoke, ON M9C 1X6 | 1932-05-11 |
Lav-a-blind Services De Nettoyage Inc. | 2811 Maurice Duplessis St, Vaudreuil-dorion, QC J7V 8P5 | 1997-05-16 |
Apothacure Incorporated | 95 Village Road, Blind River, ON P0R 1B0 | 2019-11-13 |
Immanuel Baptist Church (blind River) | 5 White Road, Blind River, ON P0R 1B0 | 2003-09-22 |
Blind River Development Corporation | 243 Causley Street, Blind River, ON P0R 1B0 | 2002-06-20 |
Les Logiciels Blind Apex Inc. | 966-300, Ch. Olivier, Levis, QC G7A 2N1 | 1999-03-10 |
Blind Apex Technologies Incorporated | 8-7080 Copenhagen Road, Mississauga, ON L5N 2C9 | 2018-09-20 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Baking Blind Incorporated.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.