Qurtoba Trading Corp. (Corporation# 6460453) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is October 11, 2005.
Corporation ID | 6460453 |
Business Number | 822561742 |
Corporation Name | Qurtoba Trading Corp. |
Registered Office Address |
1071 Speers Road Oakville ON L6L 2X5 |
Incorporation Date | 2005-10-11 |
Dissolution Date | 2014-08-15 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 12 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
FIRAS KHAIREDDIN | 1204 SHAGBARK CRES., MISSISSAUGA ON L5C 3P3, Canada |
Rasha Khaireddin | 185 Milkweed Way, Oakville ON L6L 0A4, Canada |
Talat Khaireddin | 351 River Oaks Boulevard West, Oakville ON L6H 5E8, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2005-10-11 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2017-03-23 | current | 1071 Speers Road, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 |
Address | 2005-10-11 | 2017-03-23 | 1204 Shagbark Cres., Mississauga, ON L5C 3P3 |
Name | 2005-10-11 | current | Qurtoba Trading Corp. |
Status | 2017-03-19 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2017-03-10 | 2017-03-19 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2015-04-17 | 2017-03-10 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2014-08-15 | 2015-04-17 | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-03-18 | 2014-08-15 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2010-03-23 | 2014-03-18 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2010-03-02 | 2010-03-23 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2005-10-11 | 2010-03-02 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Revival / Reconstitution | |
2014-08-15 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2005-10-11 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2011 | 2010-12-08 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2010 | 2010-12-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2009 | 2010-03-22 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Khair Brothers Holding Inc. | 1071 Speers Road, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2011-05-06 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
12354047 Canada Inc. | 1155 Speers Rd, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2020-09-19 |
Holy Way Inc. | 1439 Speers Road, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2020-08-11 |
Correct Auto Collision Corp. | 1135 Speers Rd., Unit 1, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2019-09-26 |
Kay 1 Import & Export Inc. | 22-1027 Speers Road, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2018-05-14 |
Ai Oceans Inc. | 1027 Speers Road Unit 27, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2018-05-06 |
Khairman Brothers Holding Inc. | 1071 Speers Rd, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2017-03-03 |
9746099 Canada Ltd. | 1123 Speers Road, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2016-05-09 |
Tofun Marine Supply Inc. | 1027 Speers Road, Unit 27, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2015-01-15 |
9040242 Canada Inc. | 1429 Speers Road, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2014-10-02 |
National One Design Sailing Academy Incorporated | 1429 Speers Road, Oakville, ON L6L 2X5 | 2013-03-28 |
Find all corporations in postal code L6L 2X5 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
FIRAS KHAIREDDIN | 1204 SHAGBARK CRES., MISSISSAUGA ON L5C 3P3, Canada |
Rasha Khaireddin | 185 Milkweed Way, Oakville ON L6L 0A4, Canada |
Talat Khaireddin | 351 River Oaks Boulevard West, Oakville ON L6H 5E8, Canada |
City | Oakville |
Post Code | L6L 2X5 |
Category | trading |
Category + City | trading + Oakville |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Bnp Paribas Energy Trading Canada Corp. | Suite 4300, 888 - 3rd Street S.w., Calgary, AB T2P 5C5 | |
F.g.h. Trading Corp. | 6999 Cote Des Neiges, Suite 35, Montreal, QC H3S 2B8 | 1979-02-05 |
Canadian Africa Development & Trading Corp. | 56-4325 Kingston Road, Toronto, ON M1E 2M9 | 2019-02-14 |
Commerce Nancy Woo Corp. | 2020 University, Suite 2440, Montreal, QC H3A 2L4 | 1994-12-07 |
Le Commerce Wongshan Corp. | 99 Chabanel Blvd. West, # 704, Montreal, QC H2C 1N3 | 1976-04-26 |
Corp. De Commerce Jordan | 5605 Redwood, Cote St-luc, QC H4W 1T8 | 1993-03-17 |
Joey B. Trading Corp. | 400 Quinn Boulevard, Longueuil, QC J4H 2N1 | 2003-01-24 |
Intracon Investments, Trading and Consultants Corp. | 2275 Jean-talon, Suite 313, Montreal, QC H2E 1V6 | 1989-09-20 |
Les Exploitations Hap Hing Shing Corp. | 750 Devey Street, Greenfield Park, QC J4V 1P4 | 1982-11-10 |
North Atlantic Mle Trading Corp. | 3896 Sir George Simpson, Lachine, QC H8T 1E3 | 1997-08-18 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Qurtoba Trading Corp..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.