Brandovers Inc. (Corporation# 6276148) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is August 23, 2004.
Corporation ID | 6276148 |
Business Number | 852158740 |
Corporation Name | Brandovers Inc. |
Registered Office Address |
239 Woodbine Avenue #2 Toronto ON M4L 3P3 |
Incorporation Date | 2004-08-23 |
Dissolution Date | 2008-06-20 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 1 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
ANDRIS JOHN PONE | 801A ST CLAIR AVE W, #3, TORONTO ON M6C 1B9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2004-08-23 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2006-05-10 | current | 239 Woodbine Avenue, #2, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 |
Address | 2004-08-23 | 2006-05-10 | 801a St Clair Ave W, #3, Toronto, ON M6C 1B9 |
Name | 2006-05-10 | current | Brandovers Inc. |
Name | 2005-11-23 | 2006-05-10 | Brandover, Inc. |
Name | 2004-08-23 | 2005-11-23 | Epiphany Marketing Communications Inc. |
Status | 2008-06-20 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2008-01-12 | 2008-06-20 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2004-08-23 | 2008-01-12 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2008-06-20 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2006-05-10 | Amendment / Modification |
Name Changed. RO Changed. |
2005-11-23 | Amendment / Modification | Name Changed. |
2004-08-23 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2005 | 2004-09-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
12180456 Canada Inc. | 321 Woodbine Avenue, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2020-07-07 |
11619187 Canada Corp. | 325 Woodbine Avenue, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2019-09-10 |
Peace and Tranquility Growth Inc. | 319 Woodbine Avenue, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2018-12-24 |
Intact Creatives Incorporated | 412-223 Woodbine Ave., Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2016-09-01 |
Rice & Fisherman Consulting Corp. | 223 Woodbine Avenue, Suite 403, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2013-08-19 |
Samartica Design Inc. | 307 Woodbine Avenue, Apt 2, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2012-01-03 |
7872151 Canada Incorporated | 223 Woodbine Avenue Apt. 412, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2011-05-24 |
Lavery Design Studios Inc. | 325 Woodbine Ave, Apt 1, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2008-06-13 |
Squigly Media Corporation | 229 Woodbine Avenue, Suite 101, Toronto, ON M4L 3P3 | 2000-07-07 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Wellinghall Consulting Incorporated | 11 Tompkins Mews, Toronto, ON M4L 0A1 | 2016-12-06 |
Guidanti Inc. | 218-66 Kippendavie Ave, Toronto, ON M4L 0A4 | 2018-03-28 |
10278777 Canada Limited | 315-66 Kippendavie Avenue, Toronto, ON M4L 0A4 | 2017-06-13 |
Mcs 33 Corp. | 66 Kippendavie Avenue, Suite 216, Toronto, ON M4L 0A4 | 2017-05-07 |
You Sell Cars Inc. | 66 Kippendavie Avenue, Suite 102, Toronto, ON M4L 0A4 | 2019-10-04 |
9422374 Canada Inc. | 5 Vince Ave, Toronto, ON M4L 0A6 | 2015-08-28 |
Reidmount Discovery Inc. | 13 Vince Avenue, Toronto, ON M4L 0A6 | 2015-04-20 |
Hero Capital Inc. | 32 Vince Ave, Toronto, ON M4L 0A6 | 2007-09-26 |
Hero Mortgage Services Inc. | 32 Vince Ave, Toronto, ON M4L 0A6 | 2008-01-14 |
10654027 Canada Inc. | 32 Vince Ave, Toronto, ON M4L 0A6 | 2018-02-27 |
Find all corporations in postal code M4L |
Name | Address |
---|---|
ANDRIS JOHN PONE | 801A ST CLAIR AVE W, #3, TORONTO ON M6C 1B9, Canada |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Brandovers Inc..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.