SECLAN INVESTMENTS LIMITED (Corporation# 593796) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is May 14, 1969.
Corporation ID | 593796 |
Business Number | 104769377 |
Corporation Name | SECLAN INVESTMENTS LIMITED |
Registered Office Address |
427 Shaftesbury Blvd. Winnipeg MB R3P 0M2 |
Incorporation Date | 1969-05-14 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 6 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
DAVID L. LEACH | 8605 E. PARASIO DR., SCOTTSDALE AZ 85255, United States |
CHRISTOPHER P.C. RADCLIFFE | 427 SHAFTESBURY BLVD., WINNIPEG MB R3P 0M2, Canada |
SARA LEACH | 38-5151 NITA LAKE DRIVE, WHISTLER BC V0N 1B5, Canada |
TANNIS A. LEACH | 278 QUEENSTON ST., WINNIPEG MB R3N 0W9, Canada |
AUGUSTUS S. LEACH | 1502-160 Tuxedo Avenue, WINNIPEG MB R3P 1B2, Canada |
LAWRENCE C. LEACH | 19860 N. TAPESTRY CT., SURPRISE AZ 85374-4944, United States |
LINDA A. RADCLIFFE | 82 SWINDON WAY, WINNIPEG MB R3P 1A7, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1979-10-18 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1979-10-17 | 1979-10-18 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1969-05-14 | 1979-10-17 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 2017-10-19 | current | 427 Shaftesbury Blvd., Winnipeg, MB R3P 0M2 |
Address | 2001-05-01 | 2017-10-19 | 387 Niagara Street, Winnipeg, MB R3N 0V3 |
Address | 1969-05-14 | 2001-05-01 | 139 Grenfell Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0B6 |
Name | 1969-05-14 | current | SECLAN INVESTMENTS LIMITED |
Status | 1979-10-18 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1979-10-18 | Continuance (Act) / Prorogation (Loi) | |
1969-05-14 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2019-07-31 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2019 | 2019-07-31 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2018 | 2018-08-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2017 | 2017-07-31 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Lanka Kids | 137 Chataway Blvd, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0A2 | 2014-12-01 |
Island - International Society of Law and Nuclear Disarmament | 117 Girton Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0A4 | 2019-02-15 |
Sugar Smac Labs Inc. | 205 Girton, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0A6 | 2018-08-14 |
Vital Functional Foods Inc. | 18 Devonport Blvd., Winnipeg, MB R3P 0A9 | 2016-10-25 |
Fortuna Asset Management Corp. | 205 Grenfell Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0B8 | 2007-09-19 |
Hoot Reading Inc. | 123 Handsart Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0C4 | 2018-02-15 |
Havwin Investments, Inc. | 130 Handsart Blvd, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0C5 | 2011-10-05 |
Lattice Trading Corporation Limitee | 22 Aldershot Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0C8 | 1974-03-05 |
Tetrem Capital Management Ltd. | 103 Lamont Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0E7 | |
Tismo.inc. | 225 Lamont Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0E8 | 2000-08-15 |
Find all corporations in postal code R3P |
Name | Address |
---|---|
DAVID L. LEACH | 8605 E. PARASIO DR., SCOTTSDALE AZ 85255, United States |
CHRISTOPHER P.C. RADCLIFFE | 427 SHAFTESBURY BLVD., WINNIPEG MB R3P 0M2, Canada |
SARA LEACH | 38-5151 NITA LAKE DRIVE, WHISTLER BC V0N 1B5, Canada |
TANNIS A. LEACH | 278 QUEENSTON ST., WINNIPEG MB R3N 0W9, Canada |
AUGUSTUS S. LEACH | 1502-160 Tuxedo Avenue, WINNIPEG MB R3P 1B2, Canada |
LAWRENCE C. LEACH | 19860 N. TAPESTRY CT., SURPRISE AZ 85374-4944, United States |
LINDA A. RADCLIFFE | 82 SWINDON WAY, WINNIPEG MB R3P 1A7, Canada |
City | WINNIPEG |
Post Code | R3P 0M2 |
Category | investment |
Category + City | investment + WINNIPEG |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Beswin Investments Limited | 427 Laurier Avenue West, Suite 900, Ottawa, ON K1R 7Y2 | |
Agrawest Investments Limited | 119 Kent Street, Suite 620, Charlottetown, PE C1A 1N3 | |
Afw Canada Investments Limited | 520-3rd Avenue Sw, Suite 1900, Calgary, AB T2P 0R3 | |
Red River International Investments Limited | 20 Elwood Street, Ottawa, ON K1J 1J4 | |
Somerville Investments Inc. | 1000 Sherbrooke Street West, Suite 1900, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 3G4 | |
Edoras Investments Limited | 1501, Mcgill College Avenue, 26th Floor, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 3N9 | |
Les Investissements Bingpipe Limited | 111 8th Avenue, Pincourt, QC J7V 5J4 | 1980-04-10 |
Min Investments Limited | 74 Victoria St, Toronto, ON | 1967-03-29 |
J.k. May Investments Limited | 149 Pioneer Ave., Winnipeg, MB R3C 2M8 | |
J.k. May Investments Limited | 149 Pioneer Ave, Winnipeg, MB R3C 2M8 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on SECLAN INVESTMENTS LIMITED.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.