PEREGRIN MARINE DESIGN LIMITED (Corporation# 575224) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is August 7, 1974.
Corporation ID | 575224 |
Corporation Name | PEREGRIN MARINE DESIGN LIMITED |
Registered Office Address |
110 Yonge St Ste 1800 Toronto QC M5C 1T5 |
Incorporation Date | 1974-08-07 |
Dissolution Date | 1980-12-16 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 4 - 4 |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1974-08-07 | current |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Act | 1974-08-06 | 1974-08-07 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 1974-08-07 | current | 110 Yonge St, Ste 1800, Toronto, QC M5C 1T5 |
Address | 1974-08-07 | current | 110 Yonge St, Ste 1800, Toronto, QC M5C 1T5 |
Name | 1974-08-07 | current | PEREGRIN MARINE DESIGN LIMITED |
Status | 1980-12-16 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1974-08-07 | 1980-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1980-12-16 | Dissolution | |
1974-08-07 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Groupe De Gestion De Placement Ct Inc. | 110 Yonge St, 18th Floor, Toronto, ON M5C 1T4 | |
Consolidated Centennial Services Limited | 110 Yonge St, Suite 1700, Toronto 210, ON | 1964-02-05 |
Hudnatcan Products Limited | 110 Yonge St, 16th Floor, Toronto 1, ON | 1966-05-27 |
Joy-proctor Ltd. | 110 Yonge St, Toronto 210, ON | 1962-10-05 |
Lfe-automatic Signal, Ltd. | 110 Yonge St, Toronto, ON M5C 1V2 | 1966-06-08 |
M C Marketing Communications Limited | 110 Yonge St, Suite 1501, Toronto 210, ON | 1967-12-14 |
Oshawa Raceway Limited | 110 Yonge St, Suite 905, Toronto, ON M5C 1V7 | 1971-07-05 |
Lydford Enterprises, Limited | 110 Yonge St, Suite 1800, Toronto 1, ON | 1952-05-19 |
Ruliff Grass Construction (canada) Limited | 110 Yonge St, Suite 1000, Toronto, ON M5C 1T4 | 1965-08-12 |
La Corporation T & D Du Developpement Medical Ltee | 110 Yonge St, Suite 1800, Toronto 210, ON M5C 1T5 | 1969-11-20 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Cigna Du Canada Compagnie D'assurance | 110 Yonge Street, Toronto, ON M5C 1T5 | 1977-12-06 |
Les Entreprises Drg Limitee | 110 Yonge Street, Toronto, ON M5C 1T5 |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5C1T5 |
Category | design |
Category + City | design + TORONTO |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
2x Conversion Design Ltd. | 450 Southwest Marine Drive, 18th Floor, Marine Gateway, Vancouver, BC V5X 4V2 | 2016-11-02 |
Peregrin House Inc. | 52 Norwood Terrace, Toronto, ON M4E 2H1 | 2020-02-11 |
Cigarette Marine & Magnum Marine Du Canada Limitee | 301 Bd Des Prairies, Laval, QC | 1975-02-21 |
Bg Marine Limitee | 110 Ouest Cremazie, Suite 1200, Montreal 351, QC H2P 1B9 | 1965-10-27 |
Compagnie Marine Generale Ltee | 5891 Gouin Blvd West, Montreal, QC H4J 1E5 | 1945-02-14 |
Shipshape Marine Design Ltd. | 280 Nelson Street, Ottawa, ON K1N 7S2 | 1984-03-29 |
Forest Flower Design Ltd. | 2250 Se Marine Dr, 102, Vancouver, BC V5P 2S2 | 2014-05-22 |
La Buanderie Atlantis Marine Ltee | 58 Birchhill Road, Baie D'urfe, QC H9X 3N1 | 1979-12-18 |
SociÉtÉ Commerciale Baldwin Marine LimitÉe | 1411 Rue Peel, 7e Etage, Montreal, QC H3A 1S5 | 1999-05-28 |
Distin Marine Limitee | 80 Les Chenaux Rd, Suite 3400, Vaudreuil, QC J7V 1G3 | 1971-01-18 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on PEREGRIN MARINE DESIGN LIMITED.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.