OAK-LANE PARK INVESTMENTS INC. (Corporation# 550124) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 6, 1966.
Corporation ID | 550124 |
Business Number | 105880330 |
Corporation Name | OAK-LANE PARK INVESTMENTS INC. |
Registered Office Address |
2094 Lakeshore Road East Oakville ON L6J 1M3 |
Incorporation Date | 1966-09-06 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Catherine Anne Sanci | 111 Forsythe Street, Suite 302, Oakville ON L6K 3T3, Canada |
Leonard J. Sanci | 570 Trafalgar Road, Oakville ON L6J 3J2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1980-02-13 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1980-02-12 | 1980-02-13 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1966-09-06 | 1980-02-12 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 2020-05-05 | current | 2094 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1M3 |
Address | 1980-02-13 | 2020-05-05 | 570 Trafalgar Rd, Oakville, ON L6J 3J2 |
Name | 1993-05-10 | current | OAK-LANE PARK INVESTMENTS INC. |
Name | 1984-08-27 | 1993-05-10 | 135142 CANADA LIMITED |
Name | 1969-09-26 | 1984-08-27 | OAK-LAND MERCURY SALES LIMITED |
Name | 1966-09-06 | 1969-09-26 | OAKVILLE MOTORS (1966) LIMITED |
Status | 2016-07-27 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2016-07-19 | 2016-07-27 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2013-07-19 | 2016-07-19 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2013-07-16 | 2013-07-19 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2008-07-24 | 2013-07-16 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2008-07-10 | 2008-07-24 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1980-02-13 | 2008-07-10 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Amendment / Modification | Section: 178 |
2001-02-22 | Amendment / Modification | |
1980-02-13 | Continuance (Act) / Prorogation (Loi) | |
1966-09-06 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2019-05-27 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2019 | 2018-08-14 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2018 | 2017-02-03 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
The Oakville Concierge Inc. | 2072 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1M3 | 2014-02-10 |
Techcraft Manufacturing Inc. | 2054 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1M3 | 1974-05-30 |
3003833 Canada Inc. | 2054 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1M3 | 1994-02-15 |
Selimco Investments Inc. | 2054 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1M3 | 1994-12-19 |
Macanom Developments Inc. | 2054 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1M3 | 2016-02-25 |
Tgd North America Furniture Inc. | 2054 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1M3 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Symack Capital Management (canada) Corporation | 115 George St., Suite 140, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-06-01 |
Value Bullion Inc. | 1515-115 George Street, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-05-18 |
Salesmonster Inc. | 616-115 George St, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-04-29 |
11828738 Canada Ltd. | 409 - 115 George Street, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2020-01-07 |
Redcup Inc. | 115 George Street, Suite 624, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2016-07-20 |
Luhvee Books Inc. | 115 George Street Suite 515, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2016-02-18 |
Drafting Star Incorporated | 115 George Street, Unit 139, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2016-01-19 |
Tettro Inc. | 108-115 George St, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2015-11-09 |
Canadian Croatian Choral Society | 115 George Street, Suite 631, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2015-03-06 |
8904502 Canada Inc. | Pmb117-115 George Street Pmb117, Oakville, ON L6J 0A2 | 2014-05-30 |
Find all corporations in postal code L6J |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Catherine Anne Sanci | 111 Forsythe Street, Suite 302, Oakville ON L6K 3T3, Canada |
Leonard J. Sanci | 570 Trafalgar Road, Oakville ON L6J 3J2, Canada |
City | Oakville |
Post Code | L6J 1M3 |
Category | investment |
Category + City | investment + Oakville |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
L'agence D'assurance-vie Et D'annuite Park Lane Ltee | 121 Kennedy Street, Toronto, ON | 1978-11-02 |
Placage Park Lane Ltee | 9785 Jeanne-mance St, Montreal, QC | 1968-02-26 |
Finglas Park Construction Corp. | 20 Park Glen Lane, Markham, ON L6C 0X9 | 2017-02-06 |
Jobin Video-action Inc. | 934 Park Lane, Greenfield Park, QC J4V 1A7 | 1987-02-17 |
John Lane Investments Inc. | 1070 Rue Ste-helene, Longueuil, QC J4K 3R9 | 1984-11-16 |
Les Investissements Headley Park Inc. | 4300 De Maisonneuve Blvd West #417, Westmount, QC H3Z 3C7 | 1993-07-09 |
Les Placements Ascot Park Inc. | 2757 Post Road, St-lazare, QC J0P 1H0 | 1981-01-19 |
Park-rise Investments Inc. | 645 51 Rue Ouest, Charlesbourg, QC G1H 7G5 | 1988-04-19 |
Bess Lyon Investments Inc. | 4036 Woodchuck Lane, Mississauga, ON L5L 2T5 | |
Ullathorne Investments Inc. | 639 Radcliffe Lane, Victoria, BC V8S 5B8 | 2007-12-04 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on OAK-LANE PARK INVESTMENTS INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.