LA CORPORATION DES MARCHANDS DES GALERIES DE HULL (Corporation# 527521) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is December 15, 1972.
Corporation ID | 527521 |
Business Number | 121922207 |
Corporation Name |
LA CORPORATION DES MARCHANDS DES GALERIES DE HULL THE MERCHANTS CORPORATION OF LES GALERIES DE HULL |
Registered Office Address |
320 Boul. St-joseph Hull QC J8X 3Y8 |
Incorporation Date | 1972-12-15 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-05-07 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 8 - 8 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
JOHANNE MARCOTTE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
MICHELLE VAIVE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
DENIS MORISSETTE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
MARLENE DUFOUR | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
GEORGE FIDDLER | 95 WELLINGTON WEST, SUITE 300, TORONTO ON M5J 2R2, Canada |
CAROLE ROBITAILLE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
MONICA SIBULKA | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
DANIEL VEZIMA | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
LINDA FRECHETTE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1972-12-15 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1972-12-14 | 1972-12-15 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1972-12-15 | current | 320 Boul. St-joseph, Hull, QC J8X 3Y8 |
Name | 1972-12-15 | current | LA CORPORATION DES MARCHANDS DES GALERIES DE HULL |
Name | 1972-12-15 | current | THE MERCHANTS CORPORATION OF LES GALERIES DE HULL |
Status | 2015-05-07 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-12-08 | 2015-05-07 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2014-12-08 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2004-12-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1972-12-15 | 2004-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Dissolution | Section: 222 |
1972-12-15 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1998 | 1997-05-27 | |
1997 | 1997-05-27 | |
1996 | 1997-05-27 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3844960 Canada Inc. | 320 Boul. St-joseph, Bureau 238, Hull, QC J8Y 3Y8 | 2000-12-20 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
7762119 Canada Inc. | 284 Rue Notre-dame-de-l'Г®le, UnitГ© 1001, Gatineau, QC J8X 0A2 | 2011-01-25 |
7564945 Canada Inc. | 404-284 Notre-dame De L'ile, Gatineau, QC J8X 0A2 | 2010-06-01 |
Rhea Technologies Lab Inc. | 30 Rue Victoria, Bureau 100, Gatineau, QC J8X 0A8 | 2019-12-20 |
Tsi Security Inc. | 30 Rue Victoria, Bureau 100, Gatineau, QC J8X 0A8 | 2008-06-24 |
Gestion Mj Carrier Inc. | 185 Rue Laurier, Appartement 1005, Gatineau, QC J8X 0B2 | 2017-09-27 |
9140883 Canada Inc. | 185, Rue Laurier, UnitГ© 706, Gatineau, QC J8X 0B2 | 2014-12-31 |
7724799 Canada Inc. | 1607-185 Laurier, Gatineau, QC J8X 0B2 | 2010-12-13 |
7724748 Canada Inc. | 185, Rue Laurier, App. 1607, Gatineau, QC J8X 0B2 | 2010-12-13 |
Corporation Medicale Professionnelle Dr. Christian Lareau | 1704-185 Rue Laurier, Gatineau, QC J8X 0B2 | 2007-04-05 |
6311962 Canada Inc. | 708-185 Rue Laurier, Gatineau, QC J8X 0B2 | 2004-11-18 |
Find all corporations in postal code J8X |
Name | Address |
---|---|
JOHANNE MARCOTTE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
MICHELLE VAIVE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
DENIS MORISSETTE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
MARLENE DUFOUR | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
GEORGE FIDDLER | 95 WELLINGTON WEST, SUITE 300, TORONTO ON M5J 2R2, Canada |
CAROLE ROBITAILLE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
MONICA SIBULKA | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
DANIEL VEZIMA | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
LINDA FRECHETTE | 320 BOUL. ST-JOSEPH, HULL QC J8Y 3Y8, Canada |
City | HULL |
Post Code | J8X 3Y8 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Galeries De Hull Limitee | 95 Wellington St W, Suite 300, Toronto, ON M5J 2R2 | 1994-12-15 |
Les Galeries Des Monts Retail Merchants' Association Inc. | 75 Avenue De La Gare, Bloc D-3 C.p. 364, St-sauveur Des Monts, QC J0R 1R6 | 1977-03-04 |
Les Galeries Brien Management Corporation | 14, Terrasse Van Gogh, Pointe-claire, QC H9R 6C1 | 1985-05-31 |
L'association Des Commerçants Des Galeries St. Laurent | 2103 Laurentien Boul., St-laurent, QC H4R 1K4 | 1977-06-15 |
L'association Des Commerçants Des Galeries Taschereau | 745 Boul. Taschereau, Greenfield Park, QC J4V 2H9 | 1977-06-15 |
La Corporation Des Marchands Du Carrefour Rimouski | 2932 Baseline Road, Station A Box 450, Ottawa, ON K1N 8R9 | 1978-11-22 |
Corporation De Gestion Cayman-hull | Rr 3, Schomberg, QC L0G 1T0 | 1985-02-20 |
La Corporation Des Marchands Du Centre Commercial Les Rivieres | 4125 Blvd Des Forges, Trois Rivieres, QC G8Y 1W1 | 1971-11-08 |
Hull Acceptance Corporation Ltd. | 65 R Maisonneuve, Hull, QC | 1959-05-26 |
La Corporation Des Marchands De Place Vertu | 3205 Cote Vertu, St-laurent, QC H4R 1Y8 | 1975-09-15 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LA CORPORATION DES MARCHANDS DES GALERIES DE HULL.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.