FRED L. MYERS RUMS LTD. (Corporation# 524719) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 30, 1960.
Corporation ID | 524719 |
Business Number | 885119180 |
Corporation Name | FRED L. MYERS RUMS LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
57 Erb Street West Waterloo ON N2J 1L7 |
Incorporation Date | 1960-09-30 |
Dissolution Date | 1994-08-24 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 2 - 20 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
GABOR JELLINEK | 175 COTE ST. ANTOINE ROAD, WESTMOUNT QC H3Y 3K7, Canada |
LAURA FALK SCOTT | 416 WOOD AVE., WESTMOUNT QC H3Y 3J2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1979-06-21 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1979-06-20 | 1979-06-21 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1960-09-30 | 1979-06-20 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 1960-09-30 | current | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 |
Name | 1960-09-30 | current | FRED L. MYERS RUMS LTD. |
Status | 1994-08-24 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1986-05-03 | 1994-08-24 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1986-02-17 | 1986-05-03 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1994-08-24 | Dissolution | |
1979-06-21 | Continuance (Act) / Prorogation (Loi) | |
1960-09-30 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1994 | 1994-05-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1993 | 1994-05-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1992 | 1994-05-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Distillers Corporation (1982) Limitee | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2L 6C2 | 1960-03-22 |
Les Distillateurs Thomas Adams Ltee | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | |
La Compagnie Seagram LtÉe | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | |
Les Commanditaires Seagram LtÉe | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2L 6C2 | 1993-03-31 |
La Distillerie De La Baie D'hudson Limitee | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | 1974-08-15 |
La Maison Seagram Ltee | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | 1955-11-24 |
Les Distillateurs De La Colombie-britannique (1990) Limitee | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | 1963-11-13 |
The Adams Distillers Group Ltd. | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | 1950-08-09 |
Duncan Harwood Distillers Ltd. | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2L 6C2 | 1961-05-25 |
Les Distillateurs Seagram Limitee | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | 1960-02-15 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Livramento Vineyards, Inc. | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 | 1988-12-02 |
Melchers Inc. | 57 Erb Street West, Waterloo, ON N2J 1L7 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
GABOR JELLINEK | 175 COTE ST. ANTOINE ROAD, WESTMOUNT QC H3Y 3K7, Canada |
LAURA FALK SCOTT | 416 WOOD AVE., WESTMOUNT QC H3Y 3J2, Canada |
City | WATERLOO |
Post Code | N2J1L7 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Fred C. Myers Limited | 125 Higgins Avenue, Winnipeg, MB R3C 0A5 | |
Conseillers En Gestion S. H. Myers Inc. | 3333 Blvd. Cavendish, Suite 345, Montreal, QC H4B 2M5 | 1983-06-29 |
Les Importateurs Myers-hall Ltee | 4033 Gertrude Street, Verdun, QC H4G 1R7 | 1983-03-22 |
La Compagnie De Photographie Arnold & Myers Limitee | 143 Pitt St, Cornwall, ON | 1975-04-16 |
La Compagnie De Tabac Liggett & Myers Du Canada Limitee | 3711 St. Antoine Street, Montreal, QC H4C 3P6 | 1927-04-04 |
Les Consultants Kenneth A. Myers Inc. | Place Du Canada, Suite 1020, Montreal, QC H3B 2N2 | 1990-11-20 |
Fred King & Fils Limitee | 1 Place Ville-marie, Suite 3725, Montreal, QC H3B 3P4 | 1951-01-04 |
Fred Duckett Agencies Inc. | 3859 De Chimay, St-louisde Terrebonne, QC J0N 1N0 | 1984-07-23 |
Fred Povitz Holdings Ltd. | 240 Chemin Bates, Outremont, QC H3S 1A3 | 1987-11-05 |
Fred Levi Investments Inc. | 4900 Cote Vertu Boulevard, St-laurent, QC H4S 1J9 | 2002-02-07 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on FRED L. MYERS RUMS LTD..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.