F. K. MORROW FOUNDATION (Corporation# 523224) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is December 29, 1944.
Corporation ID | 523224 |
Business Number | 101816197 |
Corporation Name | F. K. MORROW FOUNDATION |
Registered Office Address |
101 Thorncliffe Park Dr. Toronto ON M4H 1M2 |
Incorporation Date | 1944-12-29 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 3 - 3 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Anne Marie Marrin | 6 O'Connor Drive, Toronto ON M4K 2K1, Canada |
Anne Marie Meehan | 2008 Sage St., West Kelowna BC V4T 3C4, Canada |
JOAN BREECH | 16 Briar Dale Blvd., TORONTO ON M1N 1Z4, Canada |
Desmond Wilson | 12 Sutherland Drive, Toronto ON M4G 1H7, Canada |
MARY ANNE MCCARTHY | 6 O'Connor Drive, TORONTO ON M4K 2K1, Canada |
NIDA FE CHAVEZ | 35 Wynford Heights Cres., TORONTO ON M3C 1L1, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-02-27 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 1944-12-29 | 2014-02-27 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1944-12-28 | 1944-12-29 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2014-02-27 | current | 101 Thorncliffe Park Dr., Toronto, ON M4H 1M2 |
Address | 2012-03-31 | 2014-02-27 | 101 Thorncliffe Park Drive, Toronto, ON M4H 1M2 |
Address | 2007-03-31 | 2012-03-31 | 357 Bay St., Suite 402, Toronto, ON M5H 2T9 |
Address | 1944-12-29 | 2007-03-31 | 357 Bay St., Suite 402, Toronto, ON M5H 2T9 |
Name | 1944-12-29 | current | F. K. MORROW FOUNDATION |
Status | 2014-02-27 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 1944-12-29 | 2014-02-27 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | |
1944-12-29 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-03-05 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2019 | 2019-01-30 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2018-03-06 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Association of Treasurers of Religious Institutes | 151-101, Thorncliffe Park Drive, Toronto, ON M4H 1M2 | 2013-08-27 |
The Daly Foundation | 101 Thorncliffe Park Drive, Toronto, ON M4H 1M2 | 1999-05-04 |
Sisters of Service of Canada | 101 Thorncliffe Park Drive, Toronto, ON M4H 1M2 | 1925-02-18 |
National Association of Vocation/formation Directors (navfd) | 101 Thorncliffe Park Drive, Toronto, ON M4H 1M2 | 2009-10-28 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Touchless Inc. | 35 Brian Peck, St 1204, Toronto, ON M4H 0A5 | 2020-06-09 |
March of Dimes Canada Foundation | 10 Overlea Boulevard, Toronto, ON M4H 1A4 | 2001-04-05 |
Omod Independence Non-profit Corporation | 10 Overlea Blvd, Toronto, ON M4H 1A4 | 1997-03-18 |
March of Dimes Canada | 10 Overlea Blvd., Toronto, ON M4H 1A4 | |
March of Dimes Canada Non-profit Housing Corporation | 10 Overlea Boulevard, Toronto, ON M4H 1A4 | |
Boissons Gazeuses T.c.c. Inc. | 46 Overlea Boul., Toronto, ON M4H 1B6 | |
Boissons Gazeuses T.c.c. Inc. | 46 Overlea Boulevard, Toronto, ON M4H 1B6 | |
Boissons Gazeuses T.c.c. Inc. | 46 Overlea Boulevard, Toronto, ON M4H 1B8 | |
Compagnie D'embouteillage Canada Dry Ltee | 42 Overlea Boul., Toronto, ON M4H 1B8 | |
Embouteillage Coca-cola LtГ©e | 42 Overlea Boul, Toronto, ON M4H 1B8 | |
Find all corporations in postal code M4H |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Anne Marie Marrin | 6 O'Connor Drive, Toronto ON M4K 2K1, Canada |
Anne Marie Meehan | 2008 Sage St., West Kelowna BC V4T 3C4, Canada |
JOAN BREECH | 16 Briar Dale Blvd., TORONTO ON M1N 1Z4, Canada |
Desmond Wilson | 12 Sutherland Drive, Toronto ON M4G 1H7, Canada |
MARY ANNE MCCARTHY | 6 O'Connor Drive, TORONTO ON M4K 2K1, Canada |
NIDA FE CHAVEZ | 35 Wynford Heights Cres., TORONTO ON M3C 1L1, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M4H 1M2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Morrow Group Inc. | 2020 University, Suite 1920, Montreal, QC H3A 2A5 | 1979-09-19 |
Morrow Consulting & Training Inc. | 314 Pine Beach Blvd., Dorval, QC H9S 2W3 | 2020-05-04 |
Gestion Andre Morrow Inc. | 2020 University, Suite 1920, Montreal, QC H3A 2A5 | 1980-07-09 |
Publicite Andre Morrow Inc. | 1222 Mackay, Montreal, QC H3G 2H4 | 1980-07-03 |
Tag Environmental Inc. | 85 Morrow Road, Barrie, ON L4N 3V7 | |
7259131 Canada Inc. | 48 Morrow St., Peterborough, ON K9J 1X3 | 2009-10-14 |
11636910 Canada Inc. | 4 Morrow Bay Dr, Brampton, ON L6P 3K8 | 2019-09-19 |
7657781 Canada Inc. | 48 Morrow St., Peterborough, ON K9J 1X3 | 2010-09-23 |
R.j. Johnston Search Inc. | 70 Morrow St., Peterborough, ON K9J 1X3 | 2014-03-24 |
Webology Inc. | 23 Morrow Avenue, Suite 204, Toronto, ON M6R 2H9 | 2002-09-26 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on F. K. MORROW FOUNDATION.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.