GESTION IMMOBILIERE DOME LTEE (Corporation# 447994) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is April 16, 1971.
Corporation ID | 447994 |
Business Number | 884834888 |
Corporation Name |
GESTION IMMOBILIERE DOME LTEE DOME PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
222 Woodstock St. Lambert QC J4P 3R3 |
Incorporation Date | 1971-04-16 |
Dissolution Date | 1991-09-27 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 4 - 4 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
MITCHELL KLEIN | 250 CLARKE AVENUE, WESTMOUNT QC , Canada |
HYMAN POLANSKY | 222 WOODSTOCK, ST. LAMBERT QC , Canada |
LEA POLANSKY | 222 WOODSTOCK, ST. LAMBERT QC , Canada |
JOE LEWO | P.O. BOX 8913, NASSAU , United States |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1980-11-24 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1980-11-23 | 1980-11-24 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1971-04-16 | 1980-11-23 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 1971-04-16 | current | 222 Woodstock, St. Lambert, QC J4P 3R3 |
Name | 1977-03-11 | current | GESTION IMMOBILIERE DOME LTEE |
Name | 1977-03-11 | current | DOME PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LTD. |
Name | 1971-04-16 | 1977-03-11 | LES CONSTRUCTIONS GRUNCO LTEE |
Name | 1971-04-16 | 1977-03-11 | GRUNCO CONSTRUCTION LTD. |
Status | 1991-09-27 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1988-03-30 | 1991-09-27 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1988-03-05 | 1988-03-30 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1991-09-27 | Dissolution | |
1980-11-24 | Continuance (Act) / Prorogation (Loi) | |
1971-04-16 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1990 | 1990-10-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1989 | 1990-10-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1988 | 1990-10-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Address | 222 WOODSTOCK |
City | ST. LAMBERT |
Province | QC |
Postal Code | J4P 3R3 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Manoir Place Garland Inc. | 222 Woodstock, St-lambert, QC J4P 3R3 | 1980-08-29 |
133980 Canada Inc. | 222 Woodstock, Apt 916, St-lambert, QC J4P 3R3 | 1984-07-06 |
130885 Canada Inc. | 222 Woodstock, Suite 101, St-lambert, QC J4P 3R3 | 1984-10-29 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Le Condominium Montpetit Inc. | 222 Woodstock St, Suite 101, St-lambert, QC J4P 3R3 | 1987-07-28 |
Les Entreprises C. & J. Verdicchio Inc. | 218 Woodstock St., St Lambert, QC J4P 3R3 | 1982-11-30 |
Condominium Les Verts Inc. | 222 Woodstock Ave., St Lambert, QC J4P 3R3 | 1980-12-30 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
7199635 Canada Inc. | 585 Chemin Tiffin, Condo 504, Saint-lambert, QC J4P 0A3 | 2009-07-01 |
Rd Consult International Inc. | 585 Tiffin, App. 305, Saint-lambert, QC J4P 0A3 | 2009-03-20 |
7123680 Canada Inc. | 585, Chemin Tiffin, #605, Saint-lambert, QC J4P 0A3 | 2009-02-13 |
Angry Dev Inc. | 585 Chemin Tiffin, UnitГ© 406, Saint-lambert, QC J4P 0A3 | 2015-09-04 |
Diane Asselin Services Conseil Inc. | 685, Rue Du Docteur Chevrier, Suite 303, Saint-lambert, QC J4P 0A5 | 2013-11-14 |
Sommex Bedding Corporation | 685 Rue De Docteur Chevrier, Condo 502, St-lambert, QC J4P 0A5 | 2013-08-23 |
Norper Canada Inc. | 685, Rue Du Docteur-chevrier, App. 502, Saint-lambert, QC J4P 0A5 | 2009-11-16 |
2826976 Canada Inc. | 685 Rue Du Docteur-chevrier, Apt 502, St-lambert, QC J4P 0A5 | 1992-06-08 |
Carl Healey & Associates Inc. | 685 Rue Du Docteur-chevrier, Apt#502, Saint-lambert, QC J4P 0A5 | 1985-03-11 |
12410273 Canada Inc. | 608-975 Avenue St-charles, St Lambert, QC J4P 0B1 | 2020-10-12 |
Find all corporations in postal code J4P |
Name | Address |
---|---|
MITCHELL KLEIN | 250 CLARKE AVENUE, WESTMOUNT QC , Canada |
HYMAN POLANSKY | 222 WOODSTOCK, ST. LAMBERT QC , Canada |
LEA POLANSKY | 222 WOODSTOCK, ST. LAMBERT QC , Canada |
JOE LEWO | P.O. BOX 8913, NASSAU , United States |
City | ST. LAMBERT |
Post Code | J4P3R3 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Placements Dome Ltee | 390 Notre-dame West, Suite 425, Montreal, QC H2Y 1T9 | 1973-06-29 |
Les Patinoires Roulantes Le Dome Ltee | 111 Autoroute Laval, Chomedey, Laval, QC H7L 3W3 | 1977-10-25 |
Tecta Dome Property Management Inc. | 2 Bloor Street West Suite 700, Toronto, ON M4W 3R1 | 2015-02-05 |
Dome Security Systems Ltd. | 16425 County Rd. #15, Moose Creek, ON K0C 1W0 | 2004-10-18 |
Dome Design Group Inc. | 692 Boul. Guimond, Longueil, QC J4G 1T5 | 1984-02-23 |
Placer Dome (ks) LimitÉe | 161 Bay Street, Suite 3700 P.o. Box: 212, Toronto, ON M5J 2S1 | |
Placer Dome Canada Limitee | 1055 Dunsmuir Street, Suite 600 P.o. 49305, Vancouver, BC V7X 1L3 | 1993-11-05 |
Placer Dome Canada Limitee | 1055 Dunsmuir St, Suite 600 Box 49305, Vancouver, BC V7X 1L3 | |
Les Industries Photo-dome Inc. | 1350 Mazurette Street, 3rd Floor, Montreal, QC H4N 1H2 | 1982-05-05 |
Lounor Property Management Ltd. | 564 Rue Main, Gatineau, QC J8P 5L3 | 1986-01-27 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GESTION IMMOBILIERE DOME LTEE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.