TAYLOR STATTEN CAMPING BURSARY FUND (Corporation# 4166116) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is May 15, 2003.
Corporation ID | 4166116 |
Business Number | 886254705 |
Corporation Name | TAYLOR STATTEN CAMPING BURSARY FUND |
Registered Office Address |
9 Ottawa Street Toronto ON M4T 2B5 |
Incorporation Date | 2003-05-15 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 3 - 15 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
KATE BURRY | 54 PLAYTER BLVD, TORONTO ON M4K 2W3, Canada |
LYNDSAY BORSCHKE | 9 OTTAWA ST, TORONTO ON M4T 2B5, Canada |
JOHANNA MALLEY | 39 CASTLEFIELD AVE, TORONTO ON M4R 1G5, Canada |
ADAM NEWTON | 517 GLENLAKE AVE, TORONTO ON M6P 1H2, Canada |
ALLAN NORRIS | 48 WOODWAY TRAIL, BRANTFORD ON N3R 6G7, Canada |
EDWARD BROWN | 5 BROWNING AVE, TORONTO ON M4K 1V6, Canada |
Emily Watson | 225 Merton Street, Toronto ON M4S 3H1, Canada |
TIMOTHY WELSH | 21 MOUNTNOEL AVE, TORONTO ON M4J 1H7, Canada |
CHRISTOPHER PIGOTT | 9 OTTAWA ST, TORONTO ON M4T 2B5, Canada |
PETER LOVERING | 323 SUMACH STREET, TORONTO ON M5A 3K6, Canada |
TYLER RAY | 2409-18 HARBOUR STREET, TORONTO ON M5J 2Z6, Canada |
MARTHA COLLYER | 74 GARFIELD AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4T 1E9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-09-10 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 2003-05-15 | 2014-09-10 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2014-09-10 | current | 9 Ottawa Street, Toronto, ON M4T 2B5 |
Address | 2014-03-31 | 2014-09-10 | 77 King Street West, Td Centre Postal Station P.o. Box 1128, Toronto, ON M5K 1P2 |
Address | 2010-03-31 | 2014-03-31 | 77 King Street West, Td Centre Postal Station, Toronto, ON M5K 1P2 |
Address | 2008-03-31 | 2010-03-31 | 8 Price Street, 4th Floorhen, Toronto, ON M4W 1Z4 |
Address | 2003-05-15 | 2008-03-31 | 66 Wellington Street West, Td Tower, Suite 4700 P.o. Box 48, Toronto, ON M5K 1E6 |
Name | 2014-09-10 | current | TAYLOR STATTEN CAMPING BURSARY FUND |
Name | 2003-05-15 | 2014-09-10 | TAYLOR STATTEN CAMPING BURSARY FUND |
Status | 2014-09-10 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2003-05-15 | 2014-09-10 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | Jurisdiction: Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA-II) / Loi sur les corporations canadiennes, partie 2 (LCC-Partie 2) |
2003-05-15 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-10-28 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2019 | 2019-05-04 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2018-05-05 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2017 | 2017-05-27 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Slate Renovations Inc. | 6 Jackes Avenue, Unit 207, Toronto, ON M4T 0A5 | 2016-11-21 |
Stashmates Inc. | 88 Shaftesbury Ave, Toronto, ON M4T 1A2 | 2015-02-18 |
Joom Law Limited | 36 Shaftesbury Avenue, Toronto, ON M4T 1A2 | 2008-03-11 |
Comart International Corporation | 36 Shaftesbury Ave, Toronto, ON M4T 1A2 | 1995-02-02 |
Morrison Trading Inc. | 36 Shaftesbury Avenue, Toronto, ON M4T 1A2 | 2009-01-29 |
Smart Law Limited | 36 Shaftesbury Ave., Toronto, ON M4T 1A2 | 2014-11-10 |
The Moventa Group Incorporated | 58 Shaftesbury Avenue, Toronto, ON M4T 1A3 | 2019-01-31 |
Garde Design Ltd. | 70 Shaftesbury Ave, Townhouse 7, Toronto, ON M4T 1A3 | 2015-10-06 |
Kaeru Communications Inc. | 70 Shaftesbury Ave., Th - 7, Toronto, ON M4T 1A3 | 2009-12-30 |
Nexstream Limited | 94 Shaftesbury Avenue, Toronto, ON M4T 1A5 | 2013-05-17 |
Find all corporations in postal code M4T |
Name | Address |
---|---|
KATE BURRY | 54 PLAYTER BLVD, TORONTO ON M4K 2W3, Canada |
LYNDSAY BORSCHKE | 9 OTTAWA ST, TORONTO ON M4T 2B5, Canada |
JOHANNA MALLEY | 39 CASTLEFIELD AVE, TORONTO ON M4R 1G5, Canada |
ADAM NEWTON | 517 GLENLAKE AVE, TORONTO ON M6P 1H2, Canada |
ALLAN NORRIS | 48 WOODWAY TRAIL, BRANTFORD ON N3R 6G7, Canada |
EDWARD BROWN | 5 BROWNING AVE, TORONTO ON M4K 1V6, Canada |
Emily Watson | 225 Merton Street, Toronto ON M4S 3H1, Canada |
TIMOTHY WELSH | 21 MOUNTNOEL AVE, TORONTO ON M4J 1H7, Canada |
CHRISTOPHER PIGOTT | 9 OTTAWA ST, TORONTO ON M4T 2B5, Canada |
PETER LOVERING | 323 SUMACH STREET, TORONTO ON M5A 3K6, Canada |
TYLER RAY | 2409-18 HARBOUR STREET, TORONTO ON M5J 2Z6, Canada |
MARTHA COLLYER | 74 GARFIELD AVENUE, TORONTO ON M4T 1E9, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M4T 2B5 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Fund for The Advancement of Camping (canada) Inc. | R.r. 1, Huntsville, ON P0A 1K0 | 1983-01-17 |
Les Equipements De Camping Taj Ltee. | 450 Montee De Liesse, St-laurent, QC H4T 1N8 | 1987-01-16 |
Canadian Camping and Rv Council | 1100 Burloak Drive, #300, Burlington, ON L7L 6B2 | 2013-06-06 |
Les Produits De Camping Maba Ltee | 630 Dorchester Boulevard West, 22nd Floor, Montreal, QC H3B 1V7 | 1971-11-22 |
St.mathieu Paradise Camping Ltd. | 1594 Est Boul St.joseph, Montreal 177, QC | 1972-06-14 |
Camping Domaine Des Г‰rables Inc. | 1600-925 West Georgia Street, Vancouver, BC V6C 3L2 | |
Velsan Camping Ltd. | 956 Mcnaughton, Mont-royal (montreal), QC H3R 2A5 | 1973-12-31 |
Benny Camping Group Inc. | 6720 Rue Terrebonne, Montreal, QC H4B 1B9 | 2010-02-23 |
Auberge Et Camping Lac Chateauvert Inc. | 123 Norman Street, Lachine, QC H8S 1A4 | 2007-12-14 |
Camping Du Chasseur Ltee | Rr 2, Brownsburg, Pine Hill, QC J0V 1A0 | 1976-04-30 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on TAYLOR STATTEN CAMPING BURSARY FUND.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.