Democratic Representative Association (Corporation# 3943135) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 12, 2001.
Corporation ID | 3943135 |
Business Number | 876594318 |
Corporation Name |
Democratic Representative Association L'association dГ©mocratique reprГ©sentative |
Registered Office Address |
59 Queensline Drive Nepean ON K2H 7J4 |
Incorporation Date | 2001-09-12 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-04-25 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 4 - 4 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
MAURICE MURPHY | 59 QUEENSLINE DRIVE, OTTAWA ON K2H 7J4, Canada |
GORDON SHAW | 530 MARSETT PLACE, #57, VICTORIA BC V8Z 7J2, Canada |
HOLLY ALLEN | 212 SHAWNEE GARDENS S.W., CALGARY AB T2Y 2V1, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2001-09-12 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2001-09-12 | current | 59 Queensline Drive, Nepean, ON K2H 7J4 |
Name | 2001-09-12 | current | Democratic Representative Association |
Name | 2001-09-12 | current | L'association dГ©mocratique reprГ©sentative |
Status | 2015-04-25 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-11-26 | 2015-04-25 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2014-11-26 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2004-12-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2001-09-12 | 2004-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-04-25 | Dissolution | Section: 222 |
2001-09-12 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
8641978 Canada Inc. | 79 Graham Creek, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A1 | 2013-09-22 |
8244731 Canada Inc. | 100 Songbird Pvt, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A2 | 2012-07-06 |
Janus Grads Inc. | 98 Songbird Private, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A2 | 2012-02-19 |
7590318 Canada Inc. | 112, Songbird Private, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A2 | 2010-06-30 |
Ingenious Insurance Brokerage Ltd. | 98 Songbird Private, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A2 | 2015-11-13 |
Industry E11even Designs Ltd. | 69 Songbird Private, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A3 | 2018-08-09 |
Gerald Bush Management Services Inc. | 75 Songbird Private, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A3 | 2014-07-15 |
Tremblay Family Foundation Inc. | 50 Jay Street, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A4 | 2017-09-15 |
Nouville Associates Inc. | 50, Rue Jay, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A4 | 2008-12-29 |
Nouville Holdings Limited | 50 Rue Jay, Ottawa, ON K2H 0A4 | 2002-06-26 |
Find all corporations in postal code K2H |
Name | Address |
---|---|
MAURICE MURPHY | 59 QUEENSLINE DRIVE, OTTAWA ON K2H 7J4, Canada |
GORDON SHAW | 530 MARSETT PLACE, #57, VICTORIA BC V8Z 7J2, Canada |
HOLLY ALLEN | 212 SHAWNEE GARDENS S.W., CALGARY AB T2Y 2V1, Canada |
City | NEPEAN |
Post Code | K2H 7J4 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Association Canadienne D'aide Au DГ©veloppement Agricole En RГ©publique DГ©mocratique Du Congo | 455, Boulevard Roland-durand, RosemГЁre, QC J7A 4K2 | 2020-02-19 |
Vaping Industry Trade Association | 229 Yonge Street, Suite 500b, Toronto, ON M5B 1N9 | 2019-09-13 |
Association FГ©dГ©rale Des ReprГ©sentants De La SГ©curitГ© (afrs) | 934 Schooner Crescent, Ottawa, ON K1V 1Y6 | 1991-12-18 |
Citizen's Democratic Choice Enterprises Inc. | 859 4th Avenue, Verdun, QC H4G 2Y5 | 2009-11-02 |
Les ReprÉsentants De Manufacturiers De L'extreme Orient Lm Inc. | 400 Rue St-jacques Ouest, Suite 300, Montreal, QC H2Y 1S1 | 1982-10-12 |
Conseil DÉmocratique Mondial (international) | 4661 Rue De Borderaux, Montreal, QC H2H 1Z9 | 1998-06-01 |
L'association Des ReprÉsentants En Formation De L 'industrie PÉtrochimique Et Chimique Connexe Du QuÉbec Inc. | 10501 Sherbrooke Est, Montreal, QC H1P 1C3 | 1990-08-23 |
Canadian Institute for Democratic Reform Cidr | 1980 Rue Sherbrooke Ouest, Bureau 425, Montreal, QC H3H 1E8 | 2002-11-06 |
Panhellenic Democratic Association of Canada "makrygiannis" | 2257 Frenette Street, St. Laurent, QC H4R 1M3 | 1967-10-04 |
Association of Canadian Distillers | 81 Metcalfe Street, Ottawa, ON K1P 6K7 | 1980-11-19 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Democratic Representative Association.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.