Quorum Strategic Inc. (Corporation# 3933024) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is August 8, 2001.
Corporation ID | 3933024 |
Business Number | 861749869 |
Corporation Name | Quorum Strategic Inc. |
Registered Office Address |
7271 Warden Ave. Markham ON L3R 5X5 |
Incorporation Date | 2001-08-08 |
Dissolution Date | 2016-10-04 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 2 - 6 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
TIMOTHY MASON SHAW | 107-12 ST. NE, CALGARY AB T2E 4P5, Canada |
LOIS CAROL SHAW | 14 THATCHERS MILLWAY, MARKHAM ON L3P 3T3, Canada |
PATRICK ALLAN SHAW | 14 THATCHERS MILLWAY, MARKHAM ON L3P 3T3, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2001-08-08 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2014-02-03 | current | 7271 Warden Ave., Markham, ON L3R 5X5 |
Address | 2009-05-04 | 2014-02-03 | 15 Allstate Parkway, 6th Floor, Markham, ON L3R 5B4 |
Address | 2009-04-17 | 2009-05-04 | 99 Penny Crescent, Markham, ON L3P 5X7 |
Address | 2001-08-08 | 2009-04-17 | 99 Penny Crescent, Markham, ON L3P 5X7 |
Name | 2013-12-18 | current | Quorum Strategic Inc. |
Name | 2009-04-17 | 2013-12-18 | Quorum Strategic Inc. |
Name | 2001-08-08 | 2009-04-17 | Quorum Strategic Inc. |
Status | 2016-10-04 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-01-24 | 2016-10-04 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2014-01-08 | 2014-01-24 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2013-12-18 | 2014-01-08 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2012-06-09 | 2013-12-18 | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2012-01-11 | 2012-06-09 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2009-04-17 | 2012-01-11 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2008-01-12 | 2009-04-17 | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2007-08-13 | 2008-01-12 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2005-06-07 | 2007-08-13 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2005-05-06 | 2005-06-07 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2001-08-08 | 2005-05-06 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2016-10-04 | Dissolution | Section: 210(1) |
2013-12-18 | Revival / Reconstitution | |
2012-06-09 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2009-04-17 | Revival / Reconstitution | |
2008-01-12 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
2002-08-21 | Amendment / Modification | |
2001-08-08 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2014 | 2014-07-30 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2013 | 2013-11-30 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2012 | 2013-11-30 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
7025203 Canada Limited | 7271 Warden Ave., Markham, ON L3R 5X5 | 2008-08-11 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Renewable Energy Mobility Inc. | 7271 Warden Avenue, Markham, ON L3R 5X5 | 2016-09-13 |
Jacques Whitford Gruber Holdings Limited | 7271 Warden Ave, Markham, ON L3R 5X5 | 2008-07-17 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Daewoo Auto Canada Inc. | 160 Royal Crest Court, Markham, ON L3R 0A2 | 1998-06-01 |
9615440 Canada Inc. | 160 Royal Crest Court, Markham, ON L3R 0A2 | 2016-02-03 |
Concore Inc. | 160 Royal Crest Court, Markham, ON L3R 0A2 | 2016-03-30 |
10146536 Canada Inc. | 5 Seaforth Place, Markham, ON L3R 0A4 | 2017-03-15 |
Quanzhou Chamber of Commerce In Canada | 7 Seaforth Pl, Markham, ON L3R 0A4 | 2016-12-22 |
Celesse Inc. | 47 Braeside Sq, Markham, ON L3R 0A4 | 2015-05-11 |
Zl Oceansky International Inc. | 53 Braeside Sq., Markham, ON L3R 0A4 | 2011-11-01 |
Premier Tires Inc. | 52 Braeside Square, Markham, ON L3R 0A4 | 2009-11-02 |
3973387 Canada Inc. | 55 Braeside Square, Markham, ON L3R 0A4 | 2002-01-09 |
Jands Systems Inc. | 52 Braeside Square, Markham, ON L3R 0A4 | 1988-03-16 |
Find all corporations in postal code L3R |
Name | Address |
---|---|
TIMOTHY MASON SHAW | 107-12 ST. NE, CALGARY AB T2E 4P5, Canada |
LOIS CAROL SHAW | 14 THATCHERS MILLWAY, MARKHAM ON L3P 3T3, Canada |
PATRICK ALLAN SHAW | 14 THATCHERS MILLWAY, MARKHAM ON L3P 3T3, Canada |
City | MARKHAM |
Post Code | L3R 5X5 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Gestion Quorum Ltee | 50 Benjamin Hudon, St-laurent, QC H4N 1H8 | 1975-04-30 |
Quorum Travel Inc. | 1117 Ste-catherine O, Bur 507, Montreal, QC H3B 2H9 | 1992-09-29 |
Marques Strategic N.a. Inc. | 3300 Pitfield, St. Laurent, QC H4S 1K6 | 1988-08-26 |
Systemes Avertisseurs Strategic Inc. | 300 Leo Pariseau, Suite 2000, Montreal, QC H2W 2N1 | 1987-05-01 |
Groupe Conseil Anova-strategic Inc. | 4485 Rue Sherbrooke Ouest, Westmount, QC H3Z 1E7 | 1999-02-04 |
Strategic Transworld Importing Inc. | 307 Malcolm-beaton Street, Beaconsfield, QC H9W 6E4 | 2010-06-25 |
Strategic Languages Inc. | 1367 Alberni Street, Suite 1005, Vancouver, BC V6E 4R9 | |
Quorum Inoculants Inc. | 2525, Route 132, Saint-anicet, QC J0S 1M0 | 2019-03-28 |
Quorum Iq Inc. | 2610-15 Fort York Blvd, Toronto, ON M5V 3Y4 | 2020-05-04 |
Quorum Marine Corporation | 1720 Rue Morin, Shawinigan, QC G0X 2V0 | 1992-05-07 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Quorum Strategic Inc..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.