Kashruth Council of Canada (Corporation# 3784967) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 10, 2000.
Corporation ID | 3784967 |
Business Number | 863251526 |
Corporation Name |
Kashruth Council of Canada Le Conseil Cacherout du Canada |
Registered Office Address |
3200 Dufferin Street Suite 308 Toronto ON M6A 3B2 |
Incorporation Date | 2000-07-10 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 3 - 36 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Eli Mandel | 30 Roberta Ave, Toronto ON M6A 2J5, Canada |
YEHOSHUA CZERMAK | 112 RANEE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6A 1N2, Canada |
NEIL COHEN | 49 BEVSHIRE CIRCLE, THORNHILL ON L4J 5B4, Canada |
ROBERT BENMERGUI | 58 LISA CRES, THORNHILL ON L4J 2N3, Canada |
IRA MARDER | 99 DALEMOUNT AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 4J7, Canada |
DAVID WOOLF | 130 FISHERVILLE ROAD, TORONTO ON M2R 3C2, Canada |
MARK HALPERN | 600 COCHRANE DR, SUITE 210, MARKHAM ON L3R 5K3, Canada |
RONALD RUTMAN | 182 HILLHURST BLVD, TORONTO ON M5N 1P2, Canada |
SIMON SCHONBLUM | 74 SHELBORNE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M5N 1Z3, Canada |
Larry Froom | 50 Faye Court, Vaughan ON L4J 5B5, Canada |
JERROLD LANDAU | 38 ROBBIE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M3H 1Y4, Canada |
NAFTALI WINTER | 1 ST. CLAIR AVENUE E, SUITE 801, TORONTO ON M4T 2V7, Canada |
SRULY KAROLY | 91 OVERBROOK PLACE, TORONTO ON M3H 4P5, Canada |
NATHAN BLEEMAN | 970 LAWRENCE AVENUE W, SUITE 304, TORONTO ON M6A 3B6, Canada |
MEYER FELDMAN | 240 THORNWAY AVENUE, THORNHILL ON L4J 7X8, Canada |
Pinny Kaufman | 101 Caribou Ave, Toronto ON M5N 2B1, Canada |
ALLAN GUTENBERG | 116 ROSEDALE HEIGHTS DRIVE, THORNHILL ON L4J 4V9, Canada |
Shea Miller | 411 Lawrence Avenue West, Toronto ON M5M 1C1, Canada |
Shimshon Katz | 150 Viewmount Avenue, Toronto ON M6B 1T7, Canada |
Cyril Braude | 7601 Bathurst Street, Vaughan ON L4J 4H5, Canada |
MOSHE SIGLER | 3625 DUFFERIN ST, SUITE 150, TORONTO ON M3K 1Z2, Canada |
ARI MESSINGER | 12 REDDICK COURT, TORONTO ON M6B 2S2, Canada |
DANIEL BITTON | 55 HEFHILL COURT, THORNHILL ON L4J 7L9, Canada |
SHMUEL ZIMMERMAN | 63 DELL PARK AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 2T7, Canada |
ELIE MAMANN | 12 MCALLISTER ROAD, TORONTO ON M3H 2M9, Canada |
JACK FEINTUCH | 73 BEVSHIRE CIRCLE, THORNHILL ON L4J 5C6, Canada |
MOSHE KESTEN | 329 HILLHURST BLVD, TORONTO ON M6B 1M9, Canada |
AVRUM WAISBROD | 122 BARSE ST, TORONTO ON M5M 4L4, Canada |
Yossi Marder | 597 Coldstream Avenue, Toronto ON M6B 2L1, Canada |
MICHOEL KLUGMANN | 44 HILLMOUNT AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 1X4, Canada |
BRIAN LASS | 478 COLDSTREAM AVENUE, TORONTO ON M5N 1Y5, Canada |
DAVID KLEINER | 329 JOICEY BLVD, TORONTO ON M5M 2V8, Canada |
SHIMSHON GROSS | 22 ST CLAIR AVENUE EAST, SUITE 1501, TORONTO ON M4T 2S3, Canada |
PAUL JACOBS | 5 YOR DOWNS DR, TORONTO ON M3H 1H7, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-01-06 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 2000-07-10 | 2014-01-06 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2014-01-06 | current | 3200 Dufferin Street, Suite 308, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 |
Address | 2008-03-31 | 2014-01-06 | 3200 Dufferin Street, #308, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 |
Address | 2007-03-31 | 2008-03-31 | 3200 Dufferin Street, #308, Toronto, ON M6A 2B3 |
Address | 2000-11-16 | 2007-03-31 | 4600 Bathurst Street, Suite 240, Toronto, ON M2R 3V2 |
Address | 2000-07-10 | 2000-11-16 | 620 Wilson Ave., Suite 501, Toronto, ON M3K 1Z3 |
Name | 2000-09-27 | current | Kashruth Council of Canada |
Name | 2000-09-27 | current | Le Conseil Cacherout du Canada |
Name | 2000-07-10 | 2000-09-27 | KASHRUTH COUNCIL OF CANADA |
Status | 2014-01-06 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2000-07-10 | 2014-01-06 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-10-27 | Amendment / Modification | Section: 201 |
2014-01-06 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | Jurisdiction: Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA-II) / Loi sur les corporations canadiennes, partie 2 (LCC-Partie 2) |
2011-12-13 | Ordinary By-Laws Filing / DГ©pГґt de rГЁglement ordinaire | |
2006-11-21 | Ordinary By-Laws Filing / DГ©pГґt de rГЁglement ordinaire | |
2004-02-09 | Ordinary By-Laws Filing / DГ©pГґt de rГЁglement ordinaire | |
2004-01-12 | Ordinary By-Laws Filing / DГ©pГґt de rГЁglement ordinaire | |
2003-10-01 | Amendment / Modification | |
2000-09-27 | Amendment / Modification |
Name Changed. Directors Changed. |
2000-07-10 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2019-01-14 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2019 | 2019-01-14 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2017-05-10 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Matan Foundation | 3200 Dufferin Street, Suite 308, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2003-09-10 |
Evolver Canada Corporation | 3200 Dufferin Street, Suite 300 Box 22, Toronto, ON M6A 2T3 | 2003-08-14 |
6770487 Canada Ltd. | 3200 Dufferin Street, Unit#10, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2007-05-11 |
Tap Technical Fighting Inc. | 3200 Dufferin Street, Unit 28b, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2008-09-18 |
Halacha Institute of Toronto | 3200 Dufferin Street, Suite 308, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2014-04-11 |
Anacee Cleaning Services Inc. | 3200 Dufferin Street, Suite 340, Toronto, ON M6A 0A1 | 2014-06-04 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Cryptometry Canada Inc. | 3200 Dufferin Street, Unit 401, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2017-11-07 |
Fullintel Canada Inc. | 283 Dalhousie Street, Suite 201, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2017-02-14 |
Once-a-week Bookkeeper Inc. | 410-3200 Dufferin Street, North York, ON M6A 3B2 | 2015-08-28 |
Teixem Corp. | 3200 Dufferin Street Suite #401, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2013-12-02 |
M Square Espresso Bar Inc. | 307-3200 Dufferin Street, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2013-11-21 |
North American Management Inc. | 3200 Dufferin Street, Suite 503, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2010-02-17 |
A-1 Credit Recovery & Collection Services Inc. | 3200 Dufferin St. Suite 205, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2006-11-30 |
6605842 Canada Inc. | 3200 Dufferin Street Suite 10b, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2006-07-31 |
6589499 Canada Inc. | 3200 Dufferin St. Suite 407, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2006-06-26 |
Perfume Destination Ltd. | 3250 Dufferin Street, Unit 2, Toronto, ON M6A 3B2 | 2005-10-17 |
Find all corporations in postal code M6A 3B2 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Eli Mandel | 30 Roberta Ave, Toronto ON M6A 2J5, Canada |
YEHOSHUA CZERMAK | 112 RANEE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6A 1N2, Canada |
NEIL COHEN | 49 BEVSHIRE CIRCLE, THORNHILL ON L4J 5B4, Canada |
ROBERT BENMERGUI | 58 LISA CRES, THORNHILL ON L4J 2N3, Canada |
IRA MARDER | 99 DALEMOUNT AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 4J7, Canada |
DAVID WOOLF | 130 FISHERVILLE ROAD, TORONTO ON M2R 3C2, Canada |
MARK HALPERN | 600 COCHRANE DR, SUITE 210, MARKHAM ON L3R 5K3, Canada |
RONALD RUTMAN | 182 HILLHURST BLVD, TORONTO ON M5N 1P2, Canada |
SIMON SCHONBLUM | 74 SHELBORNE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M5N 1Z3, Canada |
Larry Froom | 50 Faye Court, Vaughan ON L4J 5B5, Canada |
JERROLD LANDAU | 38 ROBBIE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M3H 1Y4, Canada |
NAFTALI WINTER | 1 ST. CLAIR AVENUE E, SUITE 801, TORONTO ON M4T 2V7, Canada |
SRULY KAROLY | 91 OVERBROOK PLACE, TORONTO ON M3H 4P5, Canada |
NATHAN BLEEMAN | 970 LAWRENCE AVENUE W, SUITE 304, TORONTO ON M6A 3B6, Canada |
MEYER FELDMAN | 240 THORNWAY AVENUE, THORNHILL ON L4J 7X8, Canada |
Pinny Kaufman | 101 Caribou Ave, Toronto ON M5N 2B1, Canada |
ALLAN GUTENBERG | 116 ROSEDALE HEIGHTS DRIVE, THORNHILL ON L4J 4V9, Canada |
Shea Miller | 411 Lawrence Avenue West, Toronto ON M5M 1C1, Canada |
Shimshon Katz | 150 Viewmount Avenue, Toronto ON M6B 1T7, Canada |
Cyril Braude | 7601 Bathurst Street, Vaughan ON L4J 4H5, Canada |
MOSHE SIGLER | 3625 DUFFERIN ST, SUITE 150, TORONTO ON M3K 1Z2, Canada |
ARI MESSINGER | 12 REDDICK COURT, TORONTO ON M6B 2S2, Canada |
DANIEL BITTON | 55 HEFHILL COURT, THORNHILL ON L4J 7L9, Canada |
SHMUEL ZIMMERMAN | 63 DELL PARK AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 2T7, Canada |
ELIE MAMANN | 12 MCALLISTER ROAD, TORONTO ON M3H 2M9, Canada |
JACK FEINTUCH | 73 BEVSHIRE CIRCLE, THORNHILL ON L4J 5C6, Canada |
MOSHE KESTEN | 329 HILLHURST BLVD, TORONTO ON M6B 1M9, Canada |
AVRUM WAISBROD | 122 BARSE ST, TORONTO ON M5M 4L4, Canada |
Yossi Marder | 597 Coldstream Avenue, Toronto ON M6B 2L1, Canada |
MICHOEL KLUGMANN | 44 HILLMOUNT AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 1X4, Canada |
BRIAN LASS | 478 COLDSTREAM AVENUE, TORONTO ON M5N 1Y5, Canada |
DAVID KLEINER | 329 JOICEY BLVD, TORONTO ON M5M 2V8, Canada |
SHIMSHON GROSS | 22 ST CLAIR AVENUE EAST, SUITE 1501, TORONTO ON M4T 2S3, Canada |
PAUL JACOBS | 5 YOR DOWNS DR, TORONTO ON M3H 1H7, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M6A 3B2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Canadian 4-h Council | 960 Carling Avenue, Building 106, Ottawa, ON K1A 0C6 | 1933-09-13 |
Canadian Pallet Council | 239 Division Street, Cobourg, ON K9A 3P9 | 1982-03-29 |
Fisheries Council of Canada | 610-170 Laurier Ave. West, Ottawa, ON K1P 5V5 | 1966-05-10 |
Conseil Unitarien Du Canada | 302-192 Spadina Avenue, Toronto, ON M5T 2C2 | 1968-04-01 |
Le Conseil Canadien Du Nouveau Millenaire | 208 John St., Belleville, ON K8N 3G1 | 1997-03-03 |
Standards Council of Canada | 600-55 Metcalfe Street, Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5 | 1984-06-04 |
Conseil Canadien De L'energie | 805b-350 Sparks St., Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8 | 1984-04-18 |
Canadian Airports Council | 706-350 Sparks Street, Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8 | 1991-05-16 |
The Composting Council of Canada | 16 Northumberland Street, Toronto, ON M6H 1P7 | 1991-05-15 |
Conseil Canadien De L'aviculture P.i.c. | 574 Laurier Ave. West, Ottawa, ON | 1976-02-16 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Kashruth Council of Canada.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.