Larry Kinlin & Associates Inc. (Corporation# 3685110) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 18, 1999.
Corporation ID | 3685110 |
Business Number | 870099785 |
Corporation Name |
Larry Kinlin & Associates Inc. Larry Kinlin et AssociГ©s inc. |
Registered Office Address |
213 Sunset Blvd. Thornbury ON N0H 2P0 |
Incorporation Date | 1999-11-18 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 5 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Janis Kinlin | 68 Tallwood Road, London ON N5X 2S1, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1999-11-18 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2019-12-04 | current | 213 Sunset Blvd., Thornbury, ON N0H 2P0 |
Address | 2017-11-21 | 2019-12-04 | 68 Tallwood Road, London, ON N5X 2S1 |
Address | 2017-01-09 | 2017-11-21 | 680 Waterloo Street, Suite 202, London, ON N6A 3V8 |
Address | 2007-01-24 | 2017-01-09 | 379 Southdale Road West, Suite 202, London, ON N6J 4G8 |
Address | 2005-04-07 | 2007-01-24 | 440 Boler Road, Suite 202, London, ON N6K 4L2 |
Address | 2001-10-12 | 2005-04-07 | 575 Wharncliffe Rd., S. #7, London, ON N6J 2N6 |
Address | 2000-02-10 | 2001-10-12 | 575 Wharncliffe Rd., S. #6, London, ON N6J 2N6 |
Address | 1999-11-18 | 2000-02-10 | 568 N.christina Street, Sarnia, ON N7T 5W6 |
Name | 2000-06-16 | current | Larry Kinlin & Associates Inc. |
Name | 2000-06-16 | current | Larry Kinlin et AssociГ©s inc. |
Name | 2000-06-16 | current | Larry Kinlin ; Associates Inc. |
Name | 1999-11-18 | 2000-06-16 | LARRY KINLIN & ASSOCIATES INC. |
Name | 1999-11-18 | 2000-06-16 | LARRY KINLIN ; ASSOCIATES INC. |
Status | 1999-11-18 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2000-06-16 | Amendment / Modification | Name Changed. |
2000-02-10 | Amendment / Modification |
RO Changed. Directors Changed. |
1999-11-18 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-11-18 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2019 | 2019-11-15 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2005 | 2006-03-03 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2004 | 2005-03-03 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Radtrax Inc. | 91 Duncan Street, Thornbury, Thornbury, ON N0H 2P0 | 2020-12-11 |
Riverside Osteopathy Inc. | 53 Arthur Street West, Unit 3, Thornbury, ON N0H 2P0 | 2020-09-30 |
12276038 Canada Inc. | 41 Bruce St South, Blue Mountains, ON N0H 2P0 | 2020-08-18 |
Diosvax Inc. | 15 Harbour Street, The Blue Mountains, ON N0H 2P0 | 2020-07-24 |
11941763 Canada Ltd. | 41 Bruce St. South, Blue Mountains, ON N0H 2P0 | 2020-03-04 |
11883348 Canada Inc. | 7 Limestone Lane, Thornbury, ON N0H 2P0 | 2020-02-03 |
11559486 Canada Inc. | 46 - 100 Alice Street West, The Blue Mountains, ON N0H 2P0 | 2019-08-08 |
10458783 Canada Inc. | 10 Louisa Street West, Suite 4, The Blue Mountains, ON N0H 2P0 | 2017-10-20 |
Events for Life Centre Inc. | 67547 33rd Sideroad, Thornbury, ON N0H 2P0 | 2015-11-17 |
Denison Capital Management Inc. | 129 Leming Street, Thornbury, ON N0H 2P0 | 2014-12-03 |
Find all corporations in postal code N0H 2P0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Janis Kinlin | 68 Tallwood Road, London ON N5X 2S1, Canada |
City | Thornbury |
Post Code | N0H 2P0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Design Et Photographique Larry Williams Et Associes Inc. | 155 Dalhousie Street, Suite 1103, Toronto, ON M5B 2P7 | 1980-12-09 |
Larry Presse Inc. | 4180 De Courtrai Avenue, Suite 103, Montreal, QC H3S 1C3 | 1982-09-10 |
Larry L.r. Holdings Inc. | 125 Chabanel St W, 4th Floor, Montreal, QC H2N 1E4 | 1994-08-23 |
Larry Eldridge and Associates-sports Consultants Inc. | 440 Place Jacques Cartier, Suite 300, Montreal, QC H2Y 3A3 | 1978-09-08 |
La Compagnie De Gestion Larry Ltee | 4 Place Ville Marie, Suite 411, Montreal, QC | 1974-12-23 |
Larry David & Sons Machinery Inc. | 589 St-louis, St-basile-le-grand, QC J3N 1L1 | 1993-11-01 |
Larry Caplan Ltee | 1155 Dorchester Boulevard West, Suite 3406, Montreal, QC H3B 3T3 | 1974-05-28 |
Agence D'assurances Larry Jardine & Ass. Inc. | 11 Brock Ave S, Montreal West, QC H4X 2E4 | 1980-08-29 |
Larry Katz Holdings Inc. | 1455 Sherbrooke Street West, Apt. 2604, Montreal, QC H3G 1L2 | 1979-06-01 |
Gestion Famille Larry Walfish Inc. | 1700 Dr. Penfield Avenue, Apt. 56, Montreal, QC H3H 1B4 | 1979-01-19 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Larry Kinlin & Associates Inc..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.