CANADIAN BRAIN TUMOUR CONSORTIUM (Corporation# 3677605) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 3, 1999.
Corporation ID | 3677605 |
Business Number | 881374326 |
Corporation Name | CANADIAN BRAIN TUMOUR CONSORTIUM |
Registered Office Address |
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite 402 Toronto ON M4N 3M5 |
Incorporation Date | 1999-11-03 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 3 - 12 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
ARJUN SAHGAL | 2075 BAYVIEW AVE., T2-126, TORONTO ON M4N 3M5, Canada |
MARK HAMILTON | 29TH STREET NW, 12TH FLOOR 1403, CALGARY AB T2N 2T9, Canada |
DAVID EISENSTAT | 11405-87 AVENUE, ROOM 3-518, EDMONTON AB T6G 2H7, Canada |
ERIC BOUFFET | 555 UNIVERSITY AVENUE, ROOM 10423, TORONTO ON M5G 1X8, Canada |
JAMES PERRY | 234 JOICEY BLVD., TORONTO ON M5M 2V7, Canada |
KEN ALDAPE | 200 ELIZABETH STREET, 11TH FLOOR, TORONTO ON M5G 2C4, Canada |
ALEJANDRO TORRES-TREJO | 699 CONCESSION ST, HAMILTON ON L8V 5C2, Canada |
THIERRY MUANZA | STE G-002, 3755 COTE STE CATHERINE, MONTREAL QC H3T 1E2, Canada |
NORMAND LAPERRIERE | 610 UNIVERSITY AVE., SUITE 5-961, TORONTO ON M5G 2M9, Canada |
JACOB EASAW | 1331-29 ST NW, CALGARY AB T2N 4N2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-08-28 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 1999-11-03 | 2014-08-28 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2014-08-28 | current | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite 402, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 |
Address | 2009-03-31 | 2014-08-28 | 2075 Bayview Avenue, A402, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 |
Address | 2000-06-14 | 2009-03-31 | 2075 Bayview Avenue, A442, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 |
Address | 1999-11-03 | 2000-06-14 | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Room C-408, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 |
Name | 2014-08-28 | current | CANADIAN BRAIN TUMOUR CONSORTIUM |
Name | 1999-11-03 | 2014-08-28 | CANADIAN BRAIN TUMOUR CONSORTIUM |
Status | 2014-08-28 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 1999-11-03 | 2014-08-28 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | Jurisdiction: Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA-II) / Loi sur les corporations canadiennes, partie 2 (LCC-Partie 2) |
1999-11-03 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
"canadian Society for Surgery of The Hand" | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 1972-02-14 |
Canadian Urology Research Consortium | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Room A304, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2001-01-15 |
Canadian Als Research Network | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Room Ug35, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2009-03-11 |
Neuroperformance, Inc. | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2004-08-23 |
Sunnybrook Research Academy | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2010-09-03 |
International Arrhythmia School | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite D377, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2013-11-22 |
Canadian Glaucoma Society | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Room M1 225 / Attn: Peggy Manos, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2016-08-11 |
Shared Hospital Laboratory | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | |
Ontario Association of Craniofacial Trauma Surgeons | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite M1-524, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2020-11-11 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Canadian Burn Association | 2075 Bayview Ave., Room D704, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2018-05-02 |
The Bayview Trustee Corp. | 2075 Bayview Ave, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2011-03-08 |
Dignitas International | 2075 Bayview Avenue G106, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 2003-01-17 |
Sunnybrook Shsc Corporation | 2075 Bayview Avenue, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 | 1998-05-27 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
ARJUN SAHGAL | 2075 BAYVIEW AVE., T2-126, TORONTO ON M4N 3M5, Canada |
MARK HAMILTON | 29TH STREET NW, 12TH FLOOR 1403, CALGARY AB T2N 2T9, Canada |
DAVID EISENSTAT | 11405-87 AVENUE, ROOM 3-518, EDMONTON AB T6G 2H7, Canada |
ERIC BOUFFET | 555 UNIVERSITY AVENUE, ROOM 10423, TORONTO ON M5G 1X8, Canada |
JAMES PERRY | 234 JOICEY BLVD., TORONTO ON M5M 2V7, Canada |
KEN ALDAPE | 200 ELIZABETH STREET, 11TH FLOOR, TORONTO ON M5G 2C4, Canada |
ALEJANDRO TORRES-TREJO | 699 CONCESSION ST, HAMILTON ON L8V 5C2, Canada |
THIERRY MUANZA | STE G-002, 3755 COTE STE CATHERINE, MONTREAL QC H3T 1E2, Canada |
NORMAND LAPERRIERE | 610 UNIVERSITY AVE., SUITE 5-961, TORONTO ON M5G 2M9, Canada |
JACOB EASAW | 1331-29 ST NW, CALGARY AB T2N 4N2, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M4N 3M5 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Buchanan Brain Tumour Run | 58 Orchard View Blvd- 806, Toronto, ON M4R 0A2 | 2017-01-18 |
Canadian Neuroendocrine Tumour Society | 102-333 Pitt Street, Cornwall, ON K6J 3R1 | 2007-03-06 |
Consortium Canadien Pour La Tnl Inc. | 350 Palladium Drive, Suite 208, Kanata, ON K2V 1A8 | 1997-06-24 |
Canadian Photonics Consortium | 100-80 Aberdeen Street, Ottawa, ON K1S 5R5 | 1992-06-18 |
Le Consortium Industriel Canadien Cic Inc. | 127 Drummond, Br0mont, QC J2L 2C1 | 1986-09-12 |
Canadian Rheumatology Research Consortium | 60 Murray St., Room 2-006, Box 4, Toronto, ON M5T 3L9 | 2002-12-23 |
Canadian Stroke Consortium | 1131 A Leslie Street, Suite 205, Toronto, ON M3C 3L8 | 1996-09-17 |
Consortium Canadien Des Ecoles De Gestion | Carleton University, Ottawa, ON K1S 5B6 | 1990-11-23 |
Canadian Media Elections Consortium Inc. | 36 King Street East, Toronto, ON M5C 2L9 | 2011-03-28 |
Consortium De Gestion De La Numerotation Canadienne Inc. | Unit 21, 5480 Canotek Road, Ottawa, ON K1J 9H7 | 1998-06-05 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on CANADIAN BRAIN TUMOUR CONSORTIUM.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.