Community Association for Riders with Disabilities (Corporation# 361712) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 27, 1969.
Corporation ID | 361712 |
Business Number | 118870138 |
Corporation Name | Community Association for Riders with Disabilities |
Registered Office Address |
4777 Dufferin Street Toronto ON M3H 5T3 |
Incorporation Date | 1969-11-27 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 9 - 99 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Mark Greenberg | 148 Ranleigh Avenue, Toronto ON M4N 1W9, Canada |
Lynsey Turchet | 5116 Aberdeen St., Upper Unit, Vancouver BC V5R 4M3, Canada |
Ariana Shour | 1019 Leger Way, Milton ON L9T 8B4, Canada |
Alexandra Eakins | 225 Dovercourt Road, Toronto ON M6J 3C9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-06-30 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 1969-11-27 | 2014-06-30 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1969-11-26 | 1969-11-27 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2014-06-30 | current | 4777 Dufferin Street, Toronto, ON M3H 5T3 |
Address | 2009-03-31 | 2014-06-30 | 4777 Dufferin Street, Toronto, ON M3H 5T3 |
Address | 2007-03-31 | 2009-03-31 | 4777 Dufferin Street, North York, ON M3H 5T3 |
Address | 1969-11-27 | 2007-03-31 | 4777 Dufferin Street, North York, ON M3H 5T3 |
Name | 2014-06-30 | current | Community Association for Riders with Disabilities |
Name | 1981-07-13 | 2014-06-30 | COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION FOR RIDING FOR THE DISABLED |
Name | 1980-05-05 | 1981-07-13 | CANADIAN ASSOCIATION FOR RIDING FOR THE DISABLED |
Name | 1969-11-27 | 1980-05-05 | COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION FOR RIDING FOR THE DISABLED |
Status | 2014-06-30 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 1969-11-27 | 2014-06-30 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | Jurisdiction: Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA-II) / Loi sur les corporations canadiennes, partie 2 (LCC-Partie 2) |
1969-11-27 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2019-06-02 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2019 | 2019-06-02 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2018-06-16 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
2017 | 2017-01-15 | Soliciting Ayant recours Г la sollicitation |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
12049651 Canada Corp. | 4610 Dufferin Street, Unit 212, Toronto, ON M3H 5T3 | 2020-05-08 |
A Z K International General Trading Corp. | 4630 Dufferin St, North York, ON M3H 5T3 | 2019-07-30 |
12049694 Canada Corp. | 4610 Dufferin Street, Suite 212, Toronto, ON M3H 5T3 | 2020-05-08 |
Inabs Corp. | 4610 Dufferin Street, Suite 212, Toronto, ON M3H 5T3 | 2020-05-08 |
Cannremedy, Inc. | 4610 Dufferin Street, Unit 212, Toronto, ON M3H 5T3 | 2020-09-10 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
11894293 Canada Inc. | 1881 Steeles Ave W, Suite # 602, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2020-02-08 |
Trizone Trading Inc. | 610-1881 Steeles Ave. W., Dufferin & Steeles, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2019-07-10 |
11214993 Canada Inc. | 1881 Steeles Avenue West, Suite 609, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2019-01-24 |
Hvlp Spraying Inc. | Suite 333, 1881 Steeles Avenue West, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2018-09-13 |
Magic Wand Consulting Group Inc. | 1881 Steeles Avenue West Unit 356, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2017-12-01 |
Cw Claims & Risk Management Services Inc. | 1881 Steeles Ave., W Suite # 334, Suite 334, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2017-10-03 |
10412309 Canada Inc. | 352- 1881 Steeles Ave West, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2017-09-19 |
10192791 Canada Inc. | 1881 Steeles Avenue West, Suite 169, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2017-04-13 |
9439587 Canada Corp. | 1881 Steeles Avenue W., Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2015-09-14 |
9165525 Canada Inc. | 1881 Steeles Ave. W., Suite 345, Toronto, ON M3H 0A1 | 2015-01-26 |
Find all corporations in postal code M3H |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Mark Greenberg | 148 Ranleigh Avenue, Toronto ON M4N 1W9, Canada |
Lynsey Turchet | 5116 Aberdeen St., Upper Unit, Vancouver BC V5R 4M3, Canada |
Ariana Shour | 1019 Leger Way, Milton ON L9T 8B4, Canada |
Alexandra Eakins | 225 Dovercourt Road, Toronto ON M6J 3C9, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M3H 5T3 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Canadian Association of Professionals With Disabilities | 714 Warder Place, Victoria, BC V9A 7H6 | 2003-03-26 |
Ase Community Foundation, for Black Canadians With Disabilities | 3 Booth Crescent, Ajax, ON L1Z 1H6 | 2020-08-06 |
Learning Disabilities Association of Canada (ldac) | 2420 Bank Street, Suite 20, Ottawa, ON K1V 8S1 | 1971-03-22 |
Canadian Association of Muslims With Disabilities | 9-6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle, Suite 191, Mississauga, ON L5N 2V7 | 2006-04-12 |
Canadian Association for Research and Education In Intellectual Disabilities (care-id) | 1001 Queen St. West, Unit 4-502, Toronto, ON M6J 1H4 | 2006-02-16 |
Canadian Association of Physicians With Disabilities | 1328 Clover Ave., Victoria, BC V8S 1A6 | 2005-03-30 |
Winter Sports for Canadians With Disabilities Association | 2446 Bank Street, Suite 621, Ottawa, ON K1V 1A8 | 1996-06-03 |
Mormons On Bikes Riders Association | 204 Regent Road, General Delivery, Turner Valley, AB T0L 2A0 | 2016-05-06 |
Universal Riders Incorporated | 80 Mcbride Drive, St Catharines, ON L2S 3Z3 | 2017-11-22 |
Ottawa Rough Riders Players Alumni Association Inc. | 1015 Bank St., Coliseum Building, Ottawa, ON K1S 3W7 | 1985-09-05 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Community Association for Riders with Disabilities.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.