ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DES CONSEILLERS EN ADMINISTRATION (Corporation# 344079) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 4, 1963.
Corporation ID | 344079 |
Business Number | 102497997 |
Corporation Name |
ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DES CONSEILLERS EN ADMINISTRATION CANADIAN ASSOCIATION OF MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS |
Registered Office Address |
45 Charles Street East Suite 303 Toronto ON M4Y 1S2 |
Incorporation Date | 1963-07-04 |
Dissolution Date | 2001-11-05 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 19 - 19 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
WAYNE HANNAH | -, BOX 299, LIONS BAY BC V0N 2E0, Canada |
RICHARD HARRIS | 199 BAY STREET, SUITE 3300, TORONTO ON M5L 1B2, Canada |
AUBREY STEADMAN | 122 FIRST AVENUE, #400, SASKATOON SK S7K 7E5, Canada |
MARK NESBITT | 14 DUNDONALD STREET, TORONTO ON M4Y 1K2, Canada |
ROBERT KENT | 18 CHATSWORTH PLACE, WINNIPEG MB R2J 3K9, Canada |
JOHN HERZOG | 99 BANK ST., SUITE 800, OTTAWA ON K1P 1E4, Canada |
DENNIS YOUNG | 199 BAY STREET, SUITE 3300, TORONTO ON M5L 1B2, Canada |
JANE SOMERVILLE | 10130 103 ST., EDMONTON AB T5J 3N9, Canada |
CHRIS GREEN | TD CENTRE, BOX 251, TORONTO ON M5K 1J7, Canada |
LUC PINARD | 1130 RUE SHERBROOKE OUEST, MONTREAL QC H3A 2M8, Canada |
RAMESH GUPTA | 49 HYANNIS AVENUE, NEPEAN ON K2J 2W9, Canada |
HENRY PANKRATZ | E & Y TOWER, 30TH FLOOR, BOX 251, TORONTO ON M5K 1J7, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1963-07-04 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1963-07-03 | 1963-07-04 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1963-07-04 | current | 45 Charles Street East, Suite 303, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S2 |
Name | 1963-07-04 | current | ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DES CONSEILLERS EN ADMINISTRATION |
Name | 1963-07-04 | current | CANADIAN ASSOCIATION OF MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS |
Status | 2001-11-05 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1963-07-04 | 2001-11-05 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2001-11-05 | Dissolution | Section: Part II of CCA / Partie II de la LCC |
1963-07-04 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1999 | 1998-10-23 | |
1998 | 1998-01-31 | |
1997 | 1998-01-31 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Le Groupe De Gestion En Assurance Img Ltee | 45 Charles Street East, Suite 800, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S8 | 1978-02-06 |
Hallcon Cleaning Ltd. | 45 Charles Street East, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S2 | 1991-07-10 |
Le Groupe International Symons Ltee | 45 Charles Street East, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S8 | 1981-12-10 |
International Underwriting Managers Limited | 45 Charles Street East, Suite 800, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S8 | |
Les Gerants De Souscription Symons Ltee | 45 Charles Street East, Suite 800, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S8 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3280462 Canada Inc. | 45 Charles St East, Suite 702, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S2 | 1996-07-22 |
Symons Compagnie D'assurances Generales | 45 Charles St. East, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S2 | 1978-12-27 |
Murray Graphics Ltd. | 45 Charles St. East, Ground Fl., Toronto, ON M4Y 1S2 | 1980-11-27 |
Dowsett Management Limited | 45 Charles St. East, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S2 | 1981-06-15 |
Linhoff-lafitte Investments Inc. | 45 Charles St. East, 4th Floor, Toronto, ON M4Y 1S2 | 1982-03-08 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
WAYNE HANNAH | -, BOX 299, LIONS BAY BC V0N 2E0, Canada |
RICHARD HARRIS | 199 BAY STREET, SUITE 3300, TORONTO ON M5L 1B2, Canada |
AUBREY STEADMAN | 122 FIRST AVENUE, #400, SASKATOON SK S7K 7E5, Canada |
MARK NESBITT | 14 DUNDONALD STREET, TORONTO ON M4Y 1K2, Canada |
ROBERT KENT | 18 CHATSWORTH PLACE, WINNIPEG MB R2J 3K9, Canada |
JOHN HERZOG | 99 BANK ST., SUITE 800, OTTAWA ON K1P 1E4, Canada |
DENNIS YOUNG | 199 BAY STREET, SUITE 3300, TORONTO ON M5L 1B2, Canada |
JANE SOMERVILLE | 10130 103 ST., EDMONTON AB T5J 3N9, Canada |
CHRIS GREEN | TD CENTRE, BOX 251, TORONTO ON M5K 1J7, Canada |
LUC PINARD | 1130 RUE SHERBROOKE OUEST, MONTREAL QC H3A 2M8, Canada |
RAMESH GUPTA | 49 HYANNIS AVENUE, NEPEAN ON K2J 2W9, Canada |
HENRY PANKRATZ | E & Y TOWER, 30TH FLOOR, BOX 251, TORONTO ON M5K 1J7, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M4Y1S2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Association Canadienne De L'administration Des Sports | Station "b", P.o.box 1168, Ottawa, ON K1P 5R2 | 1975-10-28 |
Canadian Association of Genetic Counsellors | Po Box 52083, Oakville, ON L6J 7N5 | 1990-01-16 |
Association Canadienne Des Conseillers En Assurance Et En Finance | 41 Lesmill Rd, Don Mills, ON M3B 2T3 | 1924-07-19 |
L'association Canadienne Des Conseillers Élus EuropÉens - Accee | 603-19 Dundonald St., Toronto, ON M4Y 1K3 | 2007-02-06 |
Canadian Certified Crop Advisor Association | 39 William Street, Elmira, ON N3B 1P3 | 2009-11-17 |
Association Canadienne Des Consultants En Telecommunication | 1329 York Road, St. Davids, ON L0S 1P0 | 1985-02-21 |
L'association Canadienne De Formation En Gestion Des Arts | 10045 - 156 St., Edmonton, AB T5P 2P7 | 1986-01-15 |
Association of Canadian Counsellors In Immigration (a.c.c.i.) | 6988 A St-hubert, Montreal, QC H2S 2M9 | 1995-03-09 |
Canadian Financing Consultants Association | 407 St-laurent, Suite 401, Montreal, QC H2Y 2Y5 | 1990-09-25 |
Canadian Association of Exposition Management | 3012 Salerno Crescent, Mississauga, ON L5N 1T6 | 1983-11-04 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DES CONSEILLERS EN ADMINISTRATION.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.