BEING GROUPS LIMITED (Corporation# 3317846) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 21, 1996.
Corporation ID | 3317846 |
Business Number | 888596285 |
Corporation Name | BEING GROUPS LIMITED |
Registered Office Address |
2785 Ariane Brossard QC J4Z 3N9 |
Incorporation Date | 1996-11-21 |
Dissolution Date | 1999-07-12 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 2 - 2 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
CHI WAN CHE | 2785 ARIANE, BROSSARD QC J4Z 3N9, Canada |
HONG WAN CHE | 2785 ARIANE, BROSSARD QC J4Z 3N9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1996-11-21 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1996-11-20 | 1996-11-21 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1996-11-21 | current | 2785 Ariane, Brossard, QC J4Z 3N9 |
Name | 1996-11-21 | current | BEING GROUPS LIMITED |
Status | 1999-07-12 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1996-11-21 | 1999-07-12 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1999-07-12 | Dissolution | Section: 210 |
1996-11-21 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1998 | 1998-10-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1997 | 1997-11-15 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Tianshanguoye Canada Inc. | 5790 Rue De La Cigogne, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A1 | 2018-05-18 |
Manaquiche Inc. | 5821 Rue De La Cigogne, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A1 | 2009-04-15 |
Gestion Marketing Lamontagne Inc. | 5920 De La Cigogne, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A1 | 2008-08-25 |
Villabet Enterprises Inc. | 5810 De La Cigogne, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A1 | 2007-01-10 |
SystГ€me Maeva Inc. | 5625, Rue Du Condor, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A4 | 2018-06-19 |
Mediathor Canada Inc. | 5675 Rue Condor App 7, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A5 | 2015-12-04 |
Mili Consulting Inc. | 16-6925 Rue Du Chardonneret, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A7 | 2020-09-30 |
10456969 Canada Inc. | 6895 # 24, Rue Du Chardonneret, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A7 | 2017-10-19 |
Overseas Things Inc. | 6951 Chardonneret St, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A7 | 2016-07-24 |
8152128 Canada Inc. | 3-6895, Rue Du Chardonneret, Brossard, QC J4Z 0A8 | 2012-03-28 |
Find all corporations in postal code J4Z |
Name | Address |
---|---|
CHI WAN CHE | 2785 ARIANE, BROSSARD QC J4Z 3N9, Canada |
HONG WAN CHE | 2785 ARIANE, BROSSARD QC J4Z 3N9, Canada |
City | BROSSARD |
Post Code | J4Z3N9 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
R.m.g.a Groups Ltd. | 1517 Edgecliffe Ave, Ottawa, ON K1Z 8G2 | 2019-12-25 |
R.h.r.s.s. Groups Corporation | 63 Via Romano Way, Brampton, ON L6P 1P2 | 2008-04-01 |
M. K. Y Groups Inc. | 5153 Canuck Cr, Regina, SK S4W 0H1 | 2009-08-19 |
Jrv Groups Inc. | 370 Steeles Avenue East, Brampton, ON L6W 1A1 | 2020-04-16 |
Aihiki Groups Inc. | 55 Wishing Well Crescent, Caledon, ON L7C 3R3 | 2018-04-04 |
Kb Groups Canada Inc. | 22 Meadowcrest Lane, Brampton, ON L7A 0S5 | 2019-03-18 |
Holhol Holding Groups Ltd. | 104-11915 162 Ave, Edmonton, AB T5X 3R1 | 2020-05-11 |
Cleantario Groups Inc. | 641 Langholm Street, Milton, ON L9T 8Z8 | 2019-07-31 |
Bl Groups Inc. | 92 Barlow Place, Paris Brant, ON N3L 0H1 | 2016-06-01 |
Khalistan Groups of Companies Inc. | 16523 57 St. Nw, Edmonton, AB T5Y 0A2 | 2020-10-07 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on BEING GROUPS LIMITED.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.