FRIR - Fondation De Recherche Sur Les Investissements Responsables (Corporation# 3308014) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is January 7, 1997.
Corporation ID | 3308014 |
Business Number | 893129767 |
Corporation Name |
FRIR - Fondation De Recherche Sur Les Investissements Responsables SIRF - Social Investment Research Foundation |
Registered Office Address |
366 Adelaide Street East Suite 443 Toronto ON M5A 3X9 |
Incorporation Date | 1997-01-07 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-05-16 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 7 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
TIM DRAIMIN | 220 CAMBIE STREET, SUITE 680, VANCOUVER BC V6B 2M9, Canada |
FRANCOIS MELOCHE | 615 BOUL. RENE LEVESQUE OUEST, SUITE 1120, MONTREAL QC H3B 1P5, Canada |
KAI ANDERSON | 1166 ALBERT STREET, SUITE 801, VANCOUVER BC V6K 3Z3, Canada |
BLAIR FELTMATE | 77 KING STREET WEST, #4200, TORONTO ON N2P 2H8, Canada |
KEVIN PERKINS | 1007 GERDARD STREET EAST, TORONTO ON M4M 1Z4, Canada |
TESSA HEBB | 159 SUNNYSIDE AVENUE, OTTAWA ON K1S 0R2, Canada |
KEN THORPE | 4150 RUE STE-CAHERINE, SUITE 510, WESTMOUNT QC H3Z 2X7, Canada |
HELENE GAGNE | 1 COMPLEXE DESJARDINS, P.O.BOX 34, MONTREAL QC H3B 1E4, Canada |
ALLAN DAY | 194 PIONEER TOWER ROAD, KITCHENER ON N2P 2H8, Canada |
STEVEN CRAWFORD | 65 QUEEN STREET, SUITE 1800, TORONTO ON M5H 2M5, Canada |
JOE HENZLIK | 2 NORTHFIELD PLAZA, #211, NORTHFIELD IL 60093, United States |
BRIAN BARSNESS | 410 HESPELER RD, UNIT 5, LAMBRIDGE ON N1R 6J6, Canada |
CHRISTINA MCLEOD | 999 WEST HASTINGS, #1690, VANCOUVER BC V6C 2W2, Canada |
RENEE ARNOLD | 875 N. MICHIGAN, SUITE 3640, CHICAGO IL 60611, United States |
ROB GROSS | 372 BAY STREET, TORONTO ON M5H 2W9, Canada |
SUCHETA RAJAGOPAL | 200 KING STREET WEST, 6TH FLOOR BOX 72, TORONTO ON M5H 3Z8, Canada |
TIM JOHNSON | 550 PARKSIDE DRIVE, C1, WATERLOO ON N2L 5V4, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1997-01-07 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1997-01-06 | 1997-01-07 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1997-01-07 | current | 366 Adelaide Street East, Suite 443, Toronto, ON M5A 3X9 |
Name | 1997-01-07 | current | FRIR - Fondation De Recherche Sur Les Investissements Responsables |
Name | 1997-01-07 | current | SIRF - Social Investment Research Foundation |
Status | 2015-05-16 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-12-17 | 2015-05-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2014-12-17 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2004-12-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1997-01-07 | 2004-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Dissolution | Section: 222 |
1997-01-07 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2002 | 2002-01-28 | |
2000 | 1998-11-12 | |
1999 | 1998-11-12 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Canada-el Salvador Education and Development Association | 366 Adelaide Street East, Suite 342, Toronto, ON N5A 3X9 | 1991-04-24 |
The Canadian Theatre Research Institute Inc. | 366 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5A 3X9 | 1980-11-07 |
Ses (distributing) Inc. | 366 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5A 3X9 | |
Electronic Desktop Publishing Association | 366 Adelaide Street East, Suite 130, Toronto, ON M5A 9Z9 | 1987-02-19 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3270254 Canada Inc. | 366 Adelaide St East, Suite 411, Toronto, ON M5A 3X9 | 1996-06-14 |
Newad Media Inc. | 366 Adelaide East, Suite 411, Toronto, ON M5A 3X9 | 1995-02-08 |
The Idea Bank for Technology Transfer | 366 Adelaide St East, Suite 437, Toronto, ON M5A 3X9 | 1997-03-25 |
Canadian Design Service Co. Limited | 366 Adelaide St. East, Suite 34, Toronto, ON M5A 3X9 | 1973-08-30 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
12069946 Canada Inc. | 807-1 Oak Street, Toronto, ON M5A 0A1 | 2020-05-19 |
Reclaim Yourself Inc. | 1 Oak Street, Apt. #307, Toronto, ON M5A 0A1 | 2019-08-02 |
Giftora Inc. | 1 Oak Street, Suite 509, Toronto, ON M5A 0A1 | 2019-01-23 |
9917136 Canada Inc. | 509-1 Oak Street, Toronto, ON M5A 0A1 | 2016-09-22 |
Bangladesh Awami League of Canada | 302-1 Oak Street, Toronto, ON M5A 0A1 | 1992-03-12 |
G.i.c. Travel Inc. | 183 Wellington Street West, Suite 3403, Toronto, ON M5A 0A1 | 1980-09-17 |
Ryket Incorporated | 35 Oak Street, Toronto, ON M5A 0A2 | 2015-01-30 |
6284922 Canada Inc. | 9 Oak Street, Toronto, ON M5A 0A2 | 2004-09-14 |
Splash Bros Ecommerce Group Inc. | 59 Oak Street, Toronto, ON M5A 0A7 | 2020-12-05 |
10643289 Canada Inc. | 57 Oak St., Toronto, ON M5A 0A7 | 2018-02-21 |
Find all corporations in postal code M5A |
Name | Address |
---|---|
TIM DRAIMIN | 220 CAMBIE STREET, SUITE 680, VANCOUVER BC V6B 2M9, Canada |
FRANCOIS MELOCHE | 615 BOUL. RENE LEVESQUE OUEST, SUITE 1120, MONTREAL QC H3B 1P5, Canada |
KAI ANDERSON | 1166 ALBERT STREET, SUITE 801, VANCOUVER BC V6K 3Z3, Canada |
BLAIR FELTMATE | 77 KING STREET WEST, #4200, TORONTO ON N2P 2H8, Canada |
KEVIN PERKINS | 1007 GERDARD STREET EAST, TORONTO ON M4M 1Z4, Canada |
TESSA HEBB | 159 SUNNYSIDE AVENUE, OTTAWA ON K1S 0R2, Canada |
KEN THORPE | 4150 RUE STE-CAHERINE, SUITE 510, WESTMOUNT QC H3Z 2X7, Canada |
HELENE GAGNE | 1 COMPLEXE DESJARDINS, P.O.BOX 34, MONTREAL QC H3B 1E4, Canada |
ALLAN DAY | 194 PIONEER TOWER ROAD, KITCHENER ON N2P 2H8, Canada |
STEVEN CRAWFORD | 65 QUEEN STREET, SUITE 1800, TORONTO ON M5H 2M5, Canada |
JOE HENZLIK | 2 NORTHFIELD PLAZA, #211, NORTHFIELD IL 60093, United States |
BRIAN BARSNESS | 410 HESPELER RD, UNIT 5, LAMBRIDGE ON N1R 6J6, Canada |
CHRISTINA MCLEOD | 999 WEST HASTINGS, #1690, VANCOUVER BC V6C 2W2, Canada |
RENEE ARNOLD | 875 N. MICHIGAN, SUITE 3640, CHICAGO IL 60611, United States |
ROB GROSS | 372 BAY STREET, TORONTO ON M5H 2W9, Canada |
SUCHETA RAJAGOPAL | 200 KING STREET WEST, 6TH FLOOR BOX 72, TORONTO ON M5H 3Z8, Canada |
TIM JOHNSON | 550 PARKSIDE DRIVE, C1, WATERLOO ON N2L 5V4, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5A3X9 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Fondation De Recherche MÉdicale Tav | 958 Rue Pratt, Outremont, QC H2V 2V1 | 1993-05-07 |
J.h.h. Medical Research Foundation | 5725 Ave. Victoria, MontrÉal, QC H3W 3H6 | 2002-10-11 |
Edemocracy Research Foundation | 107 - 131 Water Street, Vancouver, BC V6B 4M3 | 2018-08-26 |
X Factor Research Foundation | 222 Bay Street, Suite 3000, Toronto, ON M5K 1E7 | 2018-06-14 |
Fondation De Recherche J.r.h. | 3205 Place Alton Goldbloom, Chomedey, Laval, QC H7V 1R2 | 1983-10-27 |
Research Foundation On Subliminal Stimulations | 4765 Lacombe, Laval, QC H3W 1R4 | 1979-11-13 |
Nitric Oxide Research Foundation (f.r.n.o.) | 1560 Rue Sherbrooke Est, Montreal, QC H2L 4M1 | 1996-02-13 |
Rx&d Health Research Foundation | 55 Metcalfe Street, Suite 1220, Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5 | 1991-03-01 |
Canadian Foundation for Dietetic Research | 99 Yorkville Avenue, Second Floor, Toronto, ON M5R 1C1 | 1991-01-14 |
Canadian Financial Executives Research Foundation | 300-116 Simcoe Street, Toronto, ON M5H 4E2 | 2006-03-16 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on FRIR - Fondation De Recherche Sur Les Investissements Responsables.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.