Merrill Lynch Benefits Ltd. (Corporation# 3084876) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 7, 1994.
Corporation ID | 3084876 |
Business Number | 877421610 |
Corporation Name | Merrill Lynch Benefits Ltd. |
Registered Office Address |
181 Bay Street Suite 400 Toronto ON M5J 2V8 |
Incorporation Date | 1994-11-07 |
Dissolution Date | 2020-11-30 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 15 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
ADAM H. HOWARD | 61 LYNDHURST DRIVE, TORONTO ON M5R 2Z8, Canada |
GORDON H. WEIR | 181 BAY STREET, SUITE 400, TORONTO ON M5J 2V8, Canada |
Jeffrey Armitage | 181 Bay Street, 4th Floor, Toronto ON M5J 2V8, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1994-11-07 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1994-11-06 | 1994-11-07 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1994-11-07 | current | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 |
Name | 2001-01-09 | current | Merrill Lynch Benefits Ltd. |
Name | 1996-11-26 | 2001-01-09 | MIDLAND WALWYN REALTY INC. |
Name | 1994-11-07 | 1996-11-26 | Gestion du Capital Atlas Inc. |
Name | 1994-11-07 | 1996-11-26 | Atlas Capital Management Inc. |
Status | 2020-11-30 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1994-11-07 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 1994-11-07 | 2020-11-30 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Dissolution | Section: 210(2) |
2001-01-09 | Amendment / Modification | Name Changed. |
1994-11-07 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2013 | 2013-06-24 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2011 | 2011-05-02 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2010 | 2010-06-30 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Stp Scientifically Tested Products of Canada Limited | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2100, Toronto, ON M5J 2T3 | |
Ketza River Mines Limited | 181 Bay Street, Suite 1800, Toronto, ON M5J 2T9 | 1960-12-14 |
Ames Crosta Mills (canada) Limited | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2500, Toronto, ON M5J 2T7 | 1958-03-03 |
Monotype Imaging and Communication Systems Ltd. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2500, Toronto, ON M5J 2T7 | 1988-11-08 |
164783 Canada Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2500, Toronto, ON M5J 2T7 | 1988-11-08 |
2739046 Canada Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2500, Toronto, ON M5J 2T7 | 1991-07-31 |
A.m.j. Campbell Van Lines Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2500, Toronto, ON M5J 2T7 | 1988-07-28 |
Les Produits Forestiers Daishowa Ltee | 181 Bay Street, Suite 1540 P.o. Box 822, Toronto, ON M5J 2T3 | 1988-08-15 |
Middup Moving & Storage Ltd. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 2500, Toronto, ON M5J 2T7 | |
164370 Canada Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 1800, Toronto, ON M5J 2T9 | 1988-10-24 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3401677 Canada Inc. | 181 Bay St., Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | 1997-08-14 |
Corporation D'hypotheques Midland | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Midland Walwyn Leasing Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Gestion Du Fonds Mondial Finsco Inc. | 181 Bay St, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | 1989-07-24 |
Jarislowsky Finsco LimitÉe | 181 Bay St, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | 1989-09-01 |
Midland Walwyn Leasing Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Capital Midland Walwyn Inc. | 181 Bay St, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Gestion De L'actif Atlas Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Gestion De L'actif Atlas Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | 1984-07-27 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
ADAM H. HOWARD | 61 LYNDHURST DRIVE, TORONTO ON M5R 2Z8, Canada |
GORDON H. WEIR | 181 BAY STREET, SUITE 400, TORONTO ON M5J 2V8, Canada |
Jeffrey Armitage | 181 Bay Street, 4th Floor, Toronto ON M5J 2V8, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5J2V8 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Merrill Lynch Investment Managers Canada Corp. | 20 Bay Street,waterpark Pl., Suite 1402, Toronto, ON M5J 2N8 | 1997-08-14 |
Merrill Lynch Canada Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Merrill Lynch Canada Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Merrill Lynch Canada Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | |
Merrill Lynch Financial Assets Inc. | 181 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5J 2V8 | 1995-03-13 |
Merrill Lynch Canada Inc. | 200 King Street West, Toronto, ON M5H 3W3 | |
Merrill Lynch International Services Limited | 129 Water Street, Box 38, Charlottetown, PE C1A 1A8 | 1964-06-16 |
Animal Registry of Canada Ltd. | 10205 101 Street, 1310 Merrill Lynch Tower, Edmonton, AB T5J 2Z2 | 1997-02-12 |
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith International Limited | 129 Water Street, Box 38, Charlottetown, PE C1A 1A8 | 1960-05-04 |
Merrill Lynch & Co., Canada Ltd. | Toronto-dominion Bank Tower, Suite 4100 P.o.box 31, Toronto, ON | 1953-12-22 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Merrill Lynch Benefits Ltd..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.