NORMAN WELLS FINANCIAL CORPORATION (Corporation# 2987694) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is June 23, 1994.
Corporation ID | 2987694 |
Business Number | 892589995 |
Corporation Name | NORMAN WELLS FINANCIAL CORPORATION |
Registered Office Address |
9 Woodland Drive Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0 |
Incorporation Date | 1994-06-23 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 3 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
SHERRY HODGSON | 334 Mackenzie Drive, Box 178, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
HEIDI DESCHENE | 330A Mackenzie Drive, P.O. Box 501, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Lisa McDonald | 9 Woodland Drive, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Laurel McDonald | 7 Lynx Avenue, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Ethel Blondin-Andrew | 412 Mackenzie Drive, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
JACQUELINE MCDONALD | 5A Tulita Street, PO Box 274, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Harvey Pierrot | 9 Woodland Drive, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-11-10 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 1994-06-23 | 2014-11-10 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1994-06-22 | 1994-06-23 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2019-09-23 | current | 9 Woodland Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 |
Address | 2015-11-23 | 2019-09-23 | 9 Woodland Drive, Box 69, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 |
Address | 2014-11-10 | 2015-11-23 | 2 Mackenzie Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 |
Address | 2010-03-31 | 2014-11-10 | Lot 236, Plan 1405, 69, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 |
Address | 1994-06-23 | 2010-03-31 | Lot 236, Plan 1405, 69, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 |
Name | 2014-11-10 | current | NORMAN WELLS FINANCIAL CORPORATION |
Name | 2006-01-25 | 2014-11-10 | NORMAN WELLS FINANCIAL CORPORATION |
Name | 1994-06-23 | 2006-01-25 | HIB HODGSON FINANCIAL CORPORATION |
Status | 2014-11-10 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 1994-06-23 | 2014-11-10 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-11-10 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | Jurisdiction: Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA-II) / Loi sur les corporations canadiennes, partie 2 (LCC-Partie 2) |
2006-01-25 | Amendment / Modification | Name Changed. |
2002-07-09 | Ordinary By-Laws Filing / DГ©pГґt de rГЁglement ordinaire | |
2002-07-09 | Amendment / Modification | |
1994-06-23 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2019 | 2019-11-29 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2018-09-04 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2017 | 2017-09-09 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
Address | 9 WOODLAND DRIVE |
City | NORMAN WELLS |
Province | NT |
Postal Code | X0E 0V0 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Norman Wells Land Corporation | 9 Woodland Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 1993-12-23 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Borealis Communications Inc. | 55 Mackenzie Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 2012-08-06 |
Sahtu Aviation Museum | 413 Mackenzie Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 2011-10-13 |
Sahtu Canadian Helicopters Limited | P.o. Box:24, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 2003-11-19 |
Sahtu Contractors Ltd. | 3 Lynx Road, P. O. Box 471, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 1988-03-15 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Aklavik Community Corporation | Lot 305, Plan 1503, P. O. Box 119, Aklavik, NT X0E 0A0 | 1985-01-29 |
Kitikmeot Business Development Centre | P O Box 2020, Cambridge Bay, NT X0E 0C0 | 1999-02-23 |
Kitikmeot Camp Solutions Limited | 30 Mitik St, Box 18, Cambridge Bay, NT X0E 0C0 | 1997-08-13 |
Aurizon Investments Ltd. | 25 Mitik Street, P.o. Box 1052, Cambridge Bay, NU X0E 0C0 | 1997-03-18 |
Fort Good Hope MГ©tis Nation Local #54 Land Corporation | Lto 37, Lot 16 Ptn, 302-sk-032, Fort Good Hope, NT X0E 0H0 | 1993-10-19 |
Fort Good Hope Development Corporation | Po Box 16, Fort Good Hope, NT X0E 0H0 | 1984-02-27 |
Arctic Indigenous Innovations Inc. | 429 Peter Thompson Drive, Fort Mcpherson, NT X0E 0J0 | 2017-11-10 |
Fort Norman Metis Financial Corporation | Lot No. 17-1, Plan 52784, Box 36, Hamlet of Tulita, NT X0E 0K0 | 1994-06-23 |
Fort Norman Metis Community | Lot No 17-1 Plan 52784, Box 36, Hamlet of Tulita, NT X0E 0K0 | 1993-11-10 |
9831495 Canada Inc. | 2100 Northern Way, Fort Providence, NT X0E 0L0 | 2016-07-14 |
Find all corporations in postal code X0E |
Name | Address |
---|---|
SHERRY HODGSON | 334 Mackenzie Drive, Box 178, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
HEIDI DESCHENE | 330A Mackenzie Drive, P.O. Box 501, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Lisa McDonald | 9 Woodland Drive, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Laurel McDonald | 7 Lynx Avenue, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Ethel Blondin-Andrew | 412 Mackenzie Drive, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
JACQUELINE MCDONALD | 5A Tulita Street, PO Box 274, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
Harvey Pierrot | 9 Woodland Drive, Norman Wells NT X0E 0V0, Canada |
City | NORMAN WELLS |
Post Code | X0E 0V0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Norman Wells Land Corporation | 9 Woodland Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 1993-12-23 |
Sahtu Canadian Helicopters Limited | P.o. Box:24, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 2003-11-19 |
Corridor Flight Services Ltd. | P.o.box 113, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 1974-04-11 |
Borealis Communications Inc. | 55 Mackenzie Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 2012-08-06 |
Sahtu Contractors Ltd. | 3 Lynx Road, P. O. Box 471, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 1988-03-15 |
Winter Lennie Outfitter Inc. | #4 Birch Crescent, Norman Wells, NT X1A 3S9 | 2000-08-16 |
Sahtu Aviation Museum | 413 Mackenzie Drive, Norman Wells, NT X0E 0V0 | 2011-10-13 |
Fort Norman Metis Financial Corporation | Lot No. 17-1, Plan 52784, Box 36, Hamlet of Tulita, NT X0E 0K0 | 1994-06-23 |
La Societe De Commercialisation Norman Norman Ltee | 2 Complexe Desjardins, Suite 2320, Montreal, QC H5B 1B3 | 1976-02-27 |
Services Financiers Norman Burns Inc. | 3685, Rue Goulet, Trois-riviГ€res, QC G9B 2B6 | 2005-04-18 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on NORMAN WELLS FINANCIAL CORPORATION.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.