LAU'S MANAGEMENT AND TRADING CORPORATION (Corporation# 298557) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 13, 1978.
Corporation ID | 298557 |
Corporation Name | LAU'S MANAGEMENT AND TRADING CORPORATION |
Registered Office Address |
100 Wellesley Street East Apt 1211 Toronto ON |
Incorporation Date | 1978-07-13 |
Dissolution Date | 2002-09-24 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
THOMAS LAU | 100 WELLESLEY STREET EAST APT 1211, TORONTO ON M4Y 1H5, Canada |
AMY LAU | 100 WELLESLEY STREET EAST APT 1211, TORONTO ON M4Y 1H5, Canada |
MARY LAU | 100 WELLESLEY STREET EAST APT 1211, TORONTO ON M4Y 1H5, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1978-07-13 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1978-07-12 | 1978-07-13 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1978-07-13 | current | 100 Wellesley Street East, Apt 1211, Toronto, ON |
Name | 1978-07-13 | current | LAU'S MANAGEMENT AND TRADING CORPORATION |
Status | 2002-09-24 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1984-05-14 | 2002-09-24 | Active - Intent to Dissolve Filed / Actif - Intention de dissolution dГ©posГ©e |
Status | 1983-06-03 | 1984-05-14 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1978-07-13 | 1983-06-03 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2002-09-24 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
1978-07-13 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Address | 100 WELLESLEY STREET EAST |
City | TORONTO |
Province | ON |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
2759136 Canada Inc. | 100 Wellesley Street East, Suite 505, Toronto, QC M4Y 1H5 | 1991-10-02 |
The Travel Bank (canada) Ltd. | 100 Wellesley Street East, Unit 105, Toronto, ON M4Y 1H5 | 1992-04-16 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Remodel Canada Paints & Decor Inc. | 75 Torbarrie Rd, Toronto, ON M3L 1G5 | 2020-12-15 |
12572184 Canada Inc. | 1 Yonge St. 1801, Toronto, ON M5E 1W7 | 2020-12-15 |
12573890 Canada Inc. | 57 Red Robin Way, Toronto, ON M2R 3K6 | 2020-12-15 |
The Merchant Pro Incorporated | 193 Kingston Road, Toronto, ON M4L 1T4 | 2020-12-15 |
12573491 Canada Inc. | 839 Manning Avenue, Toronto, ON M6G 2X1 | 2020-12-15 |
12572630 Canada Inc. | 137 Sandyhook Square, Toronto, ON M1W 3N6 | 2020-12-15 |
12572885 Canada Inc. | 25 Saint Paul Street, Toronto, ON M5A 3H2 | 2020-12-15 |
Glamor Healthcare Provider Inc. | 611-4400 Jane Street, Toronto, ON M3N 2K4 | 2020-12-15 |
12572494 Canada Inc. | 707 - 37 Grosvenor St, Toronto, ON M4Y 3G5 | 2020-12-15 |
Turon Construction Inc. | 103-5 Crown Hill Place, Toronto, ON M8Y 4C1 | 2020-12-15 |
Find all corporations in TORONTO |
Name | Address |
---|---|
THOMAS LAU | 100 WELLESLEY STREET EAST APT 1211, TORONTO ON M4Y 1H5, Canada |
AMY LAU | 100 WELLESLEY STREET EAST APT 1211, TORONTO ON M4Y 1H5, Canada |
MARY LAU | 100 WELLESLEY STREET EAST APT 1211, TORONTO ON M4Y 1H5, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Category | trading |
Category + City | trading + TORONTO |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Corporation MontrГ©al Plastique Trading | 5815 Rue Evreux, St-leonard, QC H1T 2H4 | 1999-12-24 |
Gilav Trading Corporation | 1440 Saint Catherine West, Suite 730, Montreal, QC H3G 1R8 | 1999-12-14 |
Off The Hook Trading Corporation | 1117 Ste-catherine Street West, Suite 303, Montreal, QC H3B 1H9 | 2000-02-04 |
Lattice Trading Corporation Limitee | 22 Aldershot Boulevard, Winnipeg, MB R3P 0C8 | 1974-03-05 |
Corporation S2g Management Groupe Conseil | 271 Des Rochers, Boischatel, QC G0A 1H0 | 2019-06-14 |
First Class Trading Corporation | 8175 George Street Suite 102, Lasalle, QC H8P 3W4 | 2003-11-11 |
Quantum Leap Trading Corporation | C/o J. Douglas Jevning Law Corporation, #1503 - 100 West Pender Street, Vancouver, BC V6B 1R8 | 2011-10-12 |
Astute Trading Management Inc. | 210 Rue Du Domaine, Laval, QC H7X 3R9 | 2016-02-08 |
Remillard Property Management Corporation | 1700 - 360 Main Street, Winnipeg, MB R3C 3Z3 | |
Corporation De Restauration Rapide & Commerce Tai Ka Lee | 2020 University, Suite 2450, Montreal, QC H3A 2A5 | 1993-01-18 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LAU'S MANAGEMENT AND TRADING CORPORATION.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.