CORPORATION DE LA VOIE NAVIGABLE DE L'OUTAOUAIS (Corporation# 2971992) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 10, 1993.
Corporation ID | 2971992 |
Business Number | 140616939 |
Corporation Name |
CORPORATION DE LA VOIE NAVIGABLE DE L'OUTAOUAIS THE OTTAWA RIVER NAVIGABLE WATERWAY CORPORATION |
Registered Office Address |
90 Sparks St 4th Floor Ottawa ON K1P 1E2 |
Incorporation Date | 1993-11-10 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-05-16 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
GARY WISEMAN | 45 HADLEY CIRCLE, NEPEAN ON K2H 6P2, Canada |
ROBIN A. RITCHIE | 405 LAURIER AVENUE EAST, PH 2, OTTAWA ON K1N 6R4, Canada |
JEAN-PIERRE LEDOUX | RR 4, CHAPEAU QC J0X 1M0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1993-11-10 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1993-11-09 | 1993-11-10 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1993-11-10 | current | 90 Sparks St, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 |
Name | 1996-07-26 | current | CORPORATION DE LA VOIE NAVIGABLE DE L'OUTAOUAIS |
Name | 1996-07-26 | current | THE OTTAWA RIVER NAVIGABLE WATERWAY CORPORATION |
Name | 1993-11-10 | 1996-07-26 | COMITE DE LA VOIE NAVIGABLE DE L'OUTAOUAIS |
Name | 1993-11-10 | 1996-07-26 | THE OTTAWA RIVER NAVIGABLE WATER COMMITTEE |
Status | 2015-05-16 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-12-17 | 2015-05-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2014-12-17 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2004-12-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1993-11-10 | 2004-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Dissolution | Section: 222 |
1993-11-10 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1997 | 1996-07-11 | |
1996 | 1996-07-11 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
La Prudentielle-service De RÉinstallation Canada LtÉe | 90 Sparks St, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1996-01-04 |
Fels Canadian Ski Company Ltd. | 90 Sparks St, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1996-03-27 |
V.l. Frye & Associates of Canada, Inc. | 90 Sparks St, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1996-12-09 |
Volex Canada Inc. | 90 Sparks St, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1997-01-24 |
L'institut Canadien De Photographie | 90 Sparks St, Suite 500, Ottawa, ON K1P 5B4 | 1963-11-26 |
Century 21 Real Estate Corporation (canada) Ltd. | 90 Sparks St, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1973-05-22 |
Flennerst Consultants Limited | 90 Sparks St, Suite 500, Ottawa, ON K1P 5B4 | 1972-07-14 |
Andrew German Limited | 90 Sparks St, Rm 440, Ottawa, ON | 1965-08-13 |
Hoverwork Canada Limited | 90 Sparks St, Suite 440, Ottawa, ON K1P 5B4 | 1966-10-11 |
Robco Investments Limited | 90 Sparks St, 4th Floor Ottawa, 0ttawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1960-12-29 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3567567 Canada Inc. | 90 Sparks Street, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1998-12-28 |
Cantec Syntonic Buildings Inc. | 90 Sparks St., 4th Fl., Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1991-11-19 |
Tele-pen Inc. | 90 Sparks Street, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1996-01-17 |
Isican Integrated Systems (canada) Inc. | 90 Sparks St., 4th Fl., Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1996-03-01 |
Pergola International Holdings (u.s.) Corporation | 90 Sparks St., Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1996-05-15 |
Rcg Renal Care Group of Canada Inc. | 90 Sparks St., 4th Fl., Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1996-06-11 |
Orbistar Technologies Inc. | 90 Sparks Street, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1997-04-24 |
Systium Computers Incorporated | 90 Sparks Street, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1997-05-02 |
Careerquest Management Inc. | 90 Sparks Street, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1997-04-30 |
Pergola International Holdings Canada Limited | 90 Sparks Street, 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 1E2 | 1997-07-09 |
Find all corporations in postal code K1P1E2 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
GARY WISEMAN | 45 HADLEY CIRCLE, NEPEAN ON K2H 6P2, Canada |
ROBIN A. RITCHIE | 405 LAURIER AVENUE EAST, PH 2, OTTAWA ON K1N 6R4, Canada |
JEAN-PIERRE LEDOUX | RR 4, CHAPEAU QC J0X 1M0, Canada |
City | OTTAWA |
Post Code | K1P1E2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Conseil Pour La Voie Navigable Champlain Inc. | P. O. Box 553, Pembroke, ON K8A 6X7 | 1983-03-08 |
Corporation Des Pilotes Du Fleuve Et De La Voie Maritime Du Saint-laurent | 153 Rue De L'Г‰cluse, Saint-lambert, QC J4R 2V6 | 1956-04-19 |
Ottawa River Waterway Inc. | 70 Madawaska Blvd, Arnprior, ON K7S 1S5 | 1996-03-28 |
The St. Lawrence Seaway Management Corporation | 200 Pitt Street, Cornwall, ON K6J 3P7 | 1998-07-09 |
Sanibec Corporation (outaouais) Ltd. | 20 Ouest Rue King, Sherbrooke, QC J1H 1N8 | 1971-05-13 |
Temiskawa Waterway Corporation | 602 Route 301 North, Campbell's Bay, QC J0X 1K0 | 1999-05-11 |
Waterway Marine Management Inc. | 100 Alexis-nihon, Suite 460, Montreal, QC H4M 2P5 | 2001-09-25 |
La Corporation Du Pont International De La Voie Maritime, Ltee | 200 Akwesasne International Road, Akwesasne, ON K6H 5R7 | 1962-11-13 |
Green River Corporation | 651 Notre Dame West, Montreal, QC H3C 1J1 | 1999-09-10 |
Ressources Humaines - VallГ©e De La RiviГЁre Des Outaouais Inc. | 378 Jean Talon, Ottawa, ON K1L 6T9 | 2008-04-15 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on CORPORATION DE LA VOIE NAVIGABLE DE L'OUTAOUAIS.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.